Gonzales v. Cain

Petitioner: Robert Gonzales
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv00830
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (Boyd, Kristen)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (Larsen, Lynn)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 9/20/2019. Signed on 7/22/19 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance/Acknowledgement Form, #2 2254 Petition)**16 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (kf)
July 9, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 84575 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (re)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 . Filing Fee must be paid within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed on 6/20/19 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (kf)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: The U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to Standing Orders 2017-9 and 2018-5, participation in the E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all unrepresented inmate litigants incarcerated at the Snake River Correctional Institute. Please comply by submitting documents to be filed with this Court to the library coordinator for scanning. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (dsg)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (dsg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Robert Gonzales against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (dsg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Robert Gonzales.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Gonzales, Prisoner ID: 18465826) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?