Grimsley v. Cain

Petitioner: Robert Grimsley
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv00881
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Exhibit E. Filed by Robert Grimsley. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Should Petitioner wish to proceed with this case, he must show cause within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order why his Petition should not be denied, and this proceeding dismissed without prejudice, on the ground that he failed to exhaust his state remedies. Petitioner is advised that failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this proceeding with prejudice. Petitioners Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #4 is denied as moot where he paid the $5.00 filing fee. I reserve recommendation on Petitioners recently filed Motion for Federal Marshal Extraction #5 and Motion for Restraining Order #7 pending his compliance with this Order to Show Cause. Signed on 7/26/19 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
July 9, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 84573 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (re)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Restraining Order Against ODOC. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Exhibits. Titled, "Petitioners Formal Introduction Sheet for Exhibit Navigation." Filed by Robert Grimsley. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Order. Titled, "Motion for Federal Marshal Extraction." Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner shall submit a filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this order. Petitioner's failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed on 6/26/2019 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Robert Grimsley against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimsley v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?