Nepomuceno v. Cain

Petitioner: Daniel Nepomuceno
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv00920
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristina Hellman is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Daniel Nepomuceno. (Hellman, Kristina)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain. (Aaron, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain. (Larsen, Lynn)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 9/10/2019. Signed on 7/10/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. See 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B). Signed on 7/10/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Daniel Nepomuceno, Prisoner ID: 18101806) (Petition #2 and this Order sent to FPD via interoffice mail on 7/12/2019.) (joha)
July 8, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 84502 issued. (fp) **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Daniel Nepomuceno, Prisoner ID: 18101806)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is DENIED. Petitioner shall submit the requisite filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed on 6/27/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Nepomuceno, Prisoner ID: 18101806) (dsg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daniel Nepomuceno. Filed by Daniel Nepomuceno. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Daniel Nepomuceno, Prisoner ID: 18101806) (dsg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daniel Nepomuceno, Prisoner ID: 18101806) (joha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Daniel Nepomuceno.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Daniel Nepomuceno, Prisoner ID: 18101806) (joha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Daniel Nepomuceno against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Daniel Nepomuceno, Prisoner ID: 18101806) (joha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Daniel Nepomuceno.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Daniel Nepomuceno, Prisoner ID: 18101806) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nepomuceno v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Nepomuceno
Represented By: Kristina S. Hellman
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?