Gunter v. Bowser

Petitioner: Chester L. Gunter, Jr.
Respondent: Troy Bowser
Case Number: 2:2019cv00928
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Should Petitioner wish to continue with this case, he must submit a filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner's failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed on 7/29/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/30/2019.) (kms)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Chester L. Gunter, Jr. with updated SID number regarding Notice of Case Assignment #3 . (joha)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Notice of Case Assignment #3 sent to Chester L. Gunter, Jr. returned as undeliverable. (joha)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/13/2019.) (dsg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Chester L. Gunter, Jr. (dsg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Chester L. Gunter, Jr against Troy Bowser. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunter v. Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chester L. Gunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?