Melampy v. Cain

Petitioner: Jan L. Melampy
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv00955
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristina Hellman is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Jan L. Melampy. (Hellman, Kristina)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nick M. Kallstorm is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain. (Kallstrom, Nicholas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain. (Larsen, Lynn)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Motion for Appointment of Counsel #2 . Federal Public Defender appointed to represent petitioner Jan L. Melampy. Signed on 6/24/19 by Judge Michael J. McShane. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jan Melampy, Prisoner ID: 9613122) (kf)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254, #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 8/26/2019. Signed on 6/24/19 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance/Acknowledgement Form, #2 2254 Petition)**15 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jan Melampy, Prisoner ID: 9613122 ) (kf)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: The U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-7, participation in the E-Filing Program is mandatory for all unrepresented inmate litigants incarcerated at the Snake River Correctional Institution. Please comply by submitting documents to be filed with this Court to the library coordinator for scanning. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jan Melampy, Prisoner ID: ) (dsg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jan Melampy, Prisoner ID: ) (dsg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Jan L. Melampy.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jan Melampy, Prisoner ID: ) (dsg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 84227 issued. (Received via USPS). Filed by Jan L. Melampy against Brad Cain. (dsg) **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jan Melampy, Prisoner ID: )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melampy v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jan L. Melampy
Represented By: Kristina S. Hellman
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Nicholas M. Kallstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?