Jewell v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: Victor Jewell
Defendant: Brad Cain and Dr. Gullick
Case Number: 2:2019cv00970
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Partial Filing fee in amount of $12.54 collected; Receipt No. 84793 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (sb)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to file Waiver #9 . Waiver of Service is due by 8/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (ck)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Declaration of Andrew Hallman In Support of Motion to Extend Time to File Waiver. Filed by Brad Cain, Gullick. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #9 .)**PRINT ALL**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (Hallman, Andrew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to file Waiver. Filed by Brad Cain, Gullick.**PRINT ALL**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (Hallman, Andrew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #7 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (dsg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to SRCI for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 7/24/2019.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (Copy emailed, along with complaint to DOJ.) (kf)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 and to Collect Filing Fee; Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 . Signed on 6/24/19 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (Copy mailed to ODOC) (kf)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (dsg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Victor Jewell.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (dsg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Victor Jewell against Brad Cain, Gullick (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (dsg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Victor Jewell.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Victor Jewell, Prisoner ID: 5921820) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jewell v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Cain
Represented By: Andrew D. Hallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gullick
Represented By: Andrew D. Hallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?