Lagunas G. v. Bowser
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Lagunas G.
Respondent: Troy Bowser
Case Number: 2:2019cv00991
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (#1 ) is DENIED. Petitioner shall submit the requisite filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Petitioner is advised that failure to submit the fee shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 7/31/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/1/2019.) (joha)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/25/19.) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Juan Carlos Lagunas-Garcia in Support of Motion. Filed by Juan Carlos Lagunas G.. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel #3 .) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Juan Carlos Lagunas G.. (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Juan Carlos Lagunas G. against Troy Bowser. (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Juan Carlos Lagunas G.. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagunas G. v. Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Lagunas G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?