Sol v. Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Sol
Defendant: Central Trust and Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv00992
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to Amend. Filed by Tyler Sol. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document 1, #2 Proposed Document 2) (dsg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extraordinary Expenses for Depositions of Expert Witnesses. Filed by Tyler Sol. (joha)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Exhibits. Filed by Tyler Sol. (joha)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in support of Complaint #2 . Filed by Tyler Sol. (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 . Filing and Administrative Fee must be paid within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed on 7/1/19 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/1/19.) (kf)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/25/19.) (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Tyler Sol against Central Trust, Department of Corrections (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (dsg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Tyler Sol. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sol v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Sol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?