Durham v. Cain
Petitioner: David Glynn Durham
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv01038
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #10 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (dsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to SRCI for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (dsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of David Durham. Filed by David Glynn Durham. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #8 .)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (dsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by David Glynn Durham.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (dsg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nick M. Kallstrom is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (Kallstrom, Nicholas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (Larsen, Lynn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 9/30/2019. Petitioner's Application to Proceed IFP (#1 ) is denied as moot where he paid the filing fee for this case on July 11, 2019. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (#3 ) is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed on 7/29/2019 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition)**12 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (joha)
July 11, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 84622 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (re)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by David Glynn Durham.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by David Glynn Durham against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by David Glynn Durham.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(David Durham, Prisoner ID: 17465712) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durham v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Nicholas M. Kallstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Glynn Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?