Powell et al v. Rasmussen et al
Plaintiff: Debra Powell
Defendant: Ian Rasmussen, Colton Sylvan Rasmussen, John Dennis Rasmussen, Heidi Rasmussen and Colton Rasmussen
Nominal Defendant: Terra-Magic Seeds, Ltd. and Terra-Magic, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01077
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Scheduling Order: Rule 16 Conference is set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1(a)(b) require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. Filed by Debra Powell. (Pitzer, Jeff)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Terra-Magic, Inc., Terra-Magic Seeds, Ltd.. (Trauman, Alex)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #15 is GRANTED. Answer is due by 8/27/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Terra-Magic, Inc., Terra-Magic Seeds, Ltd.. (Erickson, Aurelia)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint. Filed by Heidi Rasmussen. (jn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint. Filed by Ian Rasmussen. (jn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint. Filed by Colton Rasmussen. (jn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint. Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (jn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service upon Terra-Magic Seeds, Ltd. served on 7/23/2019 Filed by Debra Powell. (Grabiel, Peter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service upon Terra-Magic, Inc. served on 7/23/2019 Filed by Debra Powell. (Grabiel, Peter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Heidi Rasmussen served on 7/23/2019 Filed by Debra Powell. (Grabiel, Peter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Ian Rasmussen served on 7/23/2019 Filed by Debra Powell. (Grabiel, Peter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon Colton Rasmussen served on 7/23/2019 Filed by Debra Powell. (Grabiel, Peter)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service upon John Dennis Rasmussen served on 7/23/2019 Filed by Debra Powell. (Grabiel, Peter)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Colton Rasmussen, Heidi Rasmussen, Ian Rasmussen, John Dennis Rasmussen, Terra-Magic Seeds, Ltd., Terra-Magic, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/9/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/9/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (jn)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (jn)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5922746 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Debra Powell against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons). (Pitzer, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell et al v. Rasmussen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton Sylvan Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dennis Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Terra-Magic Seeds, Ltd.
Represented By: Alex C. Trauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Terra-Magic, Inc.
Represented By: Alex C. Trauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Powell
Represented By: Peter M. Grabiel
Represented By: Jeff S. Pitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?