McClung v. Shivas Hotel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kim Christine McClung
Defendant: Shivas Hotel, Inc., John Doe #1, Shiva Hotels, LLC, John Doe #3, John Doe #2 and Shiva Hotel Property 6, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01220
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Shiva Hotel Property 6, LLC, Shivas Hotel, Inc.. (Bennett, Philip)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #7 upon Shivas Hotel, Inc. served on 9/1/2019 Filed by Kim Christine McClung. (Helfrich, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #7 upon Shivas Hotel, Inc. served on 8/22/2019 Filed by Kim Christine McClung. (Helfrich, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #7 upon Shiva Hotel Property 6, LLC served on 8/22/2019 Filed by Kim Christine McClung. (Helfrich, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #7 upon Shiva Hotels, LLC served on 8/22/2019 Filed by Kim Christine McClung. (Helfrich, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #8 is GRANTED. Answer is due by 9/26/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Shiva Hotel Property 6, LLC, Shivas Hotel, Inc., Shiva Hotels, LLC. ( Gilbert, Bruce)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Shiva Hotel Property 6, LLC, Shiva Hotels, LLC, Shivas Hotel, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons, #2 issued summons, #3 issued summons) (ecp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Shiva Hotels LLC Filed by Kim Christine McClung. (Helfrich, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Shiva Hotel Property 6, LLC Filed by Kim Christine McClung. (Helfrich, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Shivas Hotel, Inc. Filed by Kim Christine McClung. (Helfrich, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Shivas Hotel, Inc. Filed by Kim Christine McClung. (Helfrich, Timothy)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/4/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/3/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/3/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5952793 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kim Christine McClung against John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Shiva Hotel Property 6, LLC, Shiva Hotels, LLC, Shivas Hotel, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Helfrich, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClung v. Shivas Hotel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivas Hotel, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce R. Gilbert
Represented By: Philip R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiva Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Bruce R. Gilbert
Represented By: Philip R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiva Hotel Property 6, LLC
Represented By: Bruce R. Gilbert
Represented By: Philip R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Christine McClung
Represented By: Timothy John Helfrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?