Strom v. Cain
Petitioner: Craig Lee Strom
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv01245
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(Craig Strom, Prisoner ID: 5451619) (Boyd, Kristen)
August 23, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 85246 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Strom, Prisoner ID: 5451619) (ljc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(Craig Strom, Prisoner ID: 5451619) (Larsen, Lynn)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Petitioner's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (#1 ) is granted. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (#3 ) is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Answer is due by 10/21/2019. Signed on 8/21/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition)**9 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Craig Strom, Prisoner ID: 5451619) (joha)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Craig Strom, Prisoner ID: 5451619) (dsg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Craig Lee Strom.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Strom, Prisoner ID: 5451619) (dsg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Craig Lee Strom against Brad Cain. (dsg) **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Craig Strom, Prisoner ID: 5451619)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Craig Lee Strom. (dsg) **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Craig Strom, Prisoner ID: 5451619)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strom v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig Lee Strom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?