Steltz v. Cain
Petitioner: Adam Steltz
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv01246
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Samuel A. Kubernick is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (Kubernick, Samuel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of E-Mailing to Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party #11 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (joha) Corrected Docket Text from Mailing to E-Mailing on 9/26/2019 (joha).
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to SRCI for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (joha)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain.**PRINT ALL**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (Larsen, Lynn)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 11/22/2019. Petitioner's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (#8 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (#3 ) is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed on 9/23/2019 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition)**13 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (joha)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Adam Steltz.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #6 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to SRCI for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (kms)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #1 is DENIED.Petitioner may file an amended application curing the deficiency within thirty days of the date of this Order. The amended application must bear the Case No. 2:19-cv-01246-SU. Petitioner is advised that failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding for lack of prosecution. Signed on 8/20/19 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Adam Steltz.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Adam Steltz against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Adam Steltz.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Adam Steltz, Prisoner ID: 11973368) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steltz v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam Steltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Samuel A. Kubernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?