Sandoval v. Cain
Petitioner: Leonard Contreras Sandoval
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv01278
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Susan F. Wilk is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Leonard Contreras Sandoval. (Wilk, Susan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain. (Aaron, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain. (Larsen, Lynn)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 10/21/2019. Signed on 8/21/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (#3 ) is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. See 18 U.S. C. 3006A {a) (2) (B). The Clerk is directed to send the Federal Public Defender a copy of the Petition. Counsel shall ensure that the pro se Petition clearly states all grounds for relief that will be argued in this case. Petitioner's pending Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (#1 ) is denied as moot where he paid the filing fee for this case on August 19, 2019. Signed on 8/21/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Leonard Sandoval, Prisoner ID: 14205210) (Petition #2 and this Order sent via interoffice mail to FPD on 8/22/2019.) (joha)
August 19, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 85198 issued. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Leonard Sandoval, Prisoner ID: 14205210) (re)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Leonard Sandoval, Prisoner ID: 14205210) (dsg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Leonard Contreras Sandoval.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Leonard Sandoval, Prisoner ID: 14205210) (dsg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Leonard Contreras Sandoval against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Leonard Sandoval, Prisoner ID: 14205210) (dsg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Leonard Contreras Sandoval.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Leonard Sandoval, Prisoner ID: 14205210) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonard Contreras Sandoval
Represented By: Susan F. Wilk
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?