Pohlman v. Frost et al
Petitioner: Marlin Brandt Pohlman
Respondent: Brad Cain, State of Oregon, Sarah Frost and Multnomah County Department of Community Justice
Case Number: 2:2019cv01431
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Stay titled "Petition to hold filing of Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody appeal process in order to maintain court standing in Abeyance". Filed by Marlin Brandt Pohlman. (joha)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 ADA Accommodation Request and Motion to Amend Petition. Filed by Marlin Brandt Pohlman. (joha)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254). Filed by Marlin Brandt Pohlman against Sarah Frost, Multnomah County Department of Community Justice. (joha)
October 4, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 85780 issued. (fp)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Petitioners Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (#2) is denied, and his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (#1) is summarily dismissed. Should Petitioner wish to continue with this case, he must: (1) pay a $5.00 filing fee; and (2) file an amended petition curing the deficiencies noted above. Petitioner is advised that any amended petition must be on the form provided by the Court, and cannot incorporate any part of his prior pleading by reference. Petitioners failure to comply with this Order within 30 days will result in the dismissal of his case, without prejudice. Petitioners pending Motion (#5) to hold his Petition in abeyance is denied as moot. Signed on 10/1/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed Order and form to Pro Se party on 10/1/2019.) (kms)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to hold filing of Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody in abeyance. Filed by Marlin Brandt Pohlman. (kms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/2019.) (ecp)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Marlin Brandt Pohlman. (ecp)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Marlin Brandt Pohlman. (ecp)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Marlin Brandt Pohlman against Brad Cain, State of Oregon. (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pohlman v. Frost et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marlin Brandt Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sarah Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Multnomah County Department of Community Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?