Tindall-Martin v. Amsberry
Petitioner: Jayson Tindall-Martin
Respondent: Brigette Amsberry
Case Number: 2:2019cv01441
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brigette Amsberry. (Aaron, James)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brigette Amsberry. Filed by Brigette Amsberry. (Larsen, Lynn)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 11/26/2019. Petitioner's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (#1) is GRANTED. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (#3) is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed on 9/27/2019 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment Form, #2 Petition) (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/30/2019.) (gw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/2019.) (kms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Jayson Andrew Tindall-Martin in Support of Motion. Filed by Jayson Tindall-Martin. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel #3 .) (kms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Jayson Tindall-Martin. (kms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). (IFP pending) Filed by Jayson Tindall-Martin against Brigette Amsberry. (kms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jayson Tindall-Martin. (kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tindall-Martin v. Amsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jayson Tindall-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brigette Amsberry
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?