Motley v. Keith et al
Plaintiff: Deshatin NaJhee Motley
Defendant: John Doe, Dennis Keith and John Doe/TRCI Medical et al
Case Number: 2:2019cv01442
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed Filed by Dennis Keith. (Riemersma, Nathan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 10/23/2019. (Mailed to Pro Se party and E-mailed with complaint to Andrew Hallman on 9/23/19.) (kf)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Proceed IFP and to Collect Filing Fee; Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) granted, and plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel denied (ECF No. #3 ) with leave to renew. Signed on 9/23/19 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/23/19.) (kf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/2019.) (kms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Deshatin NaJhee Motley. (kms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. (IFP Pending) Filed by Deshatin NaJhee Motley against John Doe, John Doe/TRCI Medical et al, Dennis Keith (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (kms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Deshatin NaJhee Motley. (kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motley v. Keith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe/TRCI Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshatin NaJhee Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?