Nutt v. Collecto, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erin Nutt
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01560
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (dsg)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #5 Notice of Settlement. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Settlement Filed by Erin Nutt. (Cousineau, Sharon) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/22/2019) (cw).
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Collecto, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due on 10/23/2019. (Cousineau, Sharon)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Collecto, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/27/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/27/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (ecp)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6020935 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Erin Nutt against Collecto, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Cousineau, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutt v. Collecto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Nutt
Represented By: Sharon D. Cousineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?