Lewis v. Cain
Petitioner: Quinton Lewis
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2020cv00668
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #7 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Quinton Lewis, Prisoner ID: 7078737) (rsm)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Quinton Lewis.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Quinton Lewis, Prisoner ID: 7078737) (joha)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Service Mailing and Exhibits. Filed by Quinton Lewis. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Quinton Lewis, Prisoner ID: 7078737) (dsg)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Within 30 days of the date of this order, petitioner must submit the $5.00 filing fee or the required certification of his trust account as described above. Petitioner is advised that failure to file the $5.00 filing fee or the required certification will result in the dismissal of this proceeding without prejudice. Signed on 5/15/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Quinton Lewis, Prisoner ID: 7078737) (joha)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Quinton Lewis, Prisoner ID: 7078737) (dsg)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Quinton Lewis.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Quinton Lewis, Prisoner ID: 7078737) (dsg)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Quinton Lewis against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Quinton Lewis, Prisoner ID: 7078737) (dsg)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Quinton Lewis.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Quinton Lewis, Prisoner ID: 7078737) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Quinton Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?