Swinney v. Cain
Petitioner: Craig Alan Swinney
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2020cv00736
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Anthony D. Bornstein is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Craig Alan Swinney. (Bornstein, Anthony)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain. (Aaron, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain. (Larsen, Lynn)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 7/20/2020. Signed on 5/18/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND APPOINTING COUNSEL: Petitioner's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP (ECF No. #1 ) and his Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #3 ) are GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main St., Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent petitioner in this proceeding. See 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B). The Clerk is directed to send the Federal Public Defender a copy of this Order. Signed on 5/18/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Craig Swinney, Prisoner ID: 17735793) (joha) (Emailed to FPD on 5/19/2020.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Craig Swinney, Prisoner ID: 17735793) (dsg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Craig Alan Swinney.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Swinney, Prisoner ID: 17735793) (dsg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Craig Alan Swinney against Brad Cain.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Swinney, Prisoner ID: 17735793) (dsg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Craig Alan Swinney.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Craig Swinney, Prisoner ID: 17735793) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swinney v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig Alan Swinney
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Anthony D. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?