Grimsley v. Cain
Plaintiff: Robert Grimsley
Defendant: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2020cv01382
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Action is dismissed, without prejudice. Signed on 10/1/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (joha)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Plaintiff did not file a Second Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed on 10/1/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (joha)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Orders (ECF #14 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (mja)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Robert Grimsley. Filed by Robert Grimsley. (Related document(s): Motion #14 .)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 Motion for Relief from Orders. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Order (ECF #11 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (mja)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration of Robert Grimsley. Filed by Robert Grimsley. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #11 .)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for Relief from Order. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The court DENIES plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Order #8 and DENIES plaintiff's original and amended Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF Nos. #1 and #7 ). Plaintiff may file a second amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file a second amended application including his prison trust account statement (or institutional equivalent) as required by 1915(a)(2) will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 9/1/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 Declaration of Robert Grimsley. Filed by Robert Grimsley. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #8 .)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Relief from Order. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to the prison for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff must file an Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file an amended applicationwithin 30 days of the date of this order. Signed on 8/20/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta.**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (dsg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #1 IFP Application) (dsg).
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (joha)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Declaration of Robert Grimsley in Support of Injunctive Relief. Filed by Robert Grimsley. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (joha)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Robert Grimsley against Brad Cain (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (joha)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Robert Grimsley.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Grimsley, Prisoner ID: 21089091) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimsley v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?