Sinclair v. Blewett et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Allen Sinclair
Defendant: Stuart Young, Dennis Holmes, Chaplain Hodney, Colette Peters, A. Enyon, Kate Brown, H. Rossi, TRCI Executive Management Team, Tyler Blewett and Captain Rumsey
Case Number: 2:2020cv01397
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #6 . Waiver of Service is due by 10/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Sinclair, Prisoner ID: 18737927) (rsm)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Shannon Vincent In Support of Motion to Extend Time (First). Filed by Stuart Young. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #6 .)**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Sinclair, Prisoner ID: 18737927) (Vincent, Shannon)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time (First). Filed by Stuart Young.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Sinclair, Prisoner ID: 18737927) (Vincent, Shannon)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 9/30/2020.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Sinclair, Prisoner ID: 18737927) (Email to Andrew Hallman, & trialcaserequest- Ntc of Lawsuit w/complaint) (jkm)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 . Signed on 8/31/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Sinclair, Prisoner ID: 18737927) (jkm) Modified on 8/31/2020 (jkm). (Copy to Oregon Dept.Corrections) No NEF copy previously sent.
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Sinclair, Prisoner ID: 18737927) (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Joshua Allen Sinclair against Tyler Blewett, Kate Brown, A. Enyon, Chaplain Hodney, Dennis Holmes, Colette Peters, H. Rossi, Rumsey, TRCI Executive Management Team, Stuart Young (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Sinclair, Prisoner ID: 18737927) (dsg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Joshua Allen Sinclair.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Sinclair, Prisoner ID: 18737927) (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinclair v. Blewett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Allen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Young
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Hodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colette Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Enyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRCI Executive Management Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Blewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Rumsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?