Lathrop-Vance v. Croft et al
Plaintiff: Johnathon Lee Lathrop-Vance
Defendant: Dr. Garth Gulick, Brad Cain, Wagner and Dr. Ashley Croft
Case Number: 2:2020cv01926
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: The Court DENIES plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #9 . Signed on 1/4/2021 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (dsg)
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Johnathon Lee Lathrop-Vance.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (dsg)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO DISMISS: The Court DISMISSES plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint, curing the deficiencies noted above, within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is advised that the amended complaint will operate as a complete substitute for the present complaint, not as a supplement. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to file an amended complaint shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 12/21/2020 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (dsg)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that or his designee shall collect payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 12/21/2020 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (Mailed order to ODOC.) (dsg)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365 regarding Magistrate Consent by Party, #5 . **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (dsg)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. **PRINT NEF ONLY. The Court will e-mail a PDF of the Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge form filed in this case to the prison for delivery to the inmate litigant.**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (dsg)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Supplement to Complaint #2 . Filed by Johnathon Lee Lathrop-Vance. (Related document(s): Complaint #2 .)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (joha)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Johnathon Lee Lathrop-Vance against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (joha)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Johnathon Lee Lathrop-Vance.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Johnathon Lathrop-Vance, Prisoner ID: 21935365) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lathrop-Vance v. Croft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Garth Gulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ashley Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathon Lee Lathrop-Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?