Meek v. Ward et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Meek
Defendant: Louie's Cattle Service LLC, Cameron Lee Molt, CVS, Inc., Elijah Michael Ward, Louis P. Molt and Silvies Valley Ranch LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00216
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 28 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Louie's Cattle Service LLC, Cameron Lee Molt, Elijah Michael Ward, Louis P. Molt. (Webster, Ronald)
April 9, 2021 Filing 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Silvies Valley Ranch LLC, CVS, Inc.. (Taaffe, William)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Scheduling Order: Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/16/2021 at 02:30PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1(a)(b) require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #24 is GRANTED. Answer is due by 4/9/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (dsg)
March 18, 2021 Filing 24 First Motion for Extension of Time to File First Responsive Pleadings. Filed by All Defendants. (Taaffe, William)
March 12, 2021 Filing 23 Return of Service (Hansen, Martin)
March 12, 2021 Filing 22 Return of Service (Hansen, Martin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance of Ronald F. Webster appearing on behalf of Louie's Cattle Service LLC, Cameron Lee Molt, Louis P. Molt, Elijah Michael Ward Filed by on behalf of Louie's Cattle Service LLC, Cameron Lee Molt, Louis P. Molt, Elijah Michael Ward. (Webster, Ronald)
March 10, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of William P. Taaffe appearing on behalf of CVS, Inc., Silvies Valley Ranch LLC Filed by on behalf of CVS, Inc., Silvies Valley Ranch LLC. (Taaffe, William)
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 Return of Service (Hansen, Martin)
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 Return of Service (Hansen, Martin)
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 Return of Service (Hansen, Martin)
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 Return of Service (Hansen, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to Silvies Valley Ranch LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to CVS, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Louie's Cattle Service LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Louis P. Molt. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cameron Lee Molt. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Elijah Michael Ward. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons Silvies Valley Ranch LLC Filed by Shannon Meek. (Hansen, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons CVS Inc. Filed by Shannon Meek. (Hansen, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Louie's Cattle Service LLC Filed by Shannon Meek. (Hansen, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Louis P. Molt Filed by Shannon Meek. (Hansen, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Cameron Lee Molt Filed by Shannon Meek. (Hansen, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Elijah Michael Ward Filed by Shannon Meek. (Hansen, Martin)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/10/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/12/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (rs)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Shannon Meek. (Hansen, Martin)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7878003 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Shannon Meek against All Defendants. (Hansen, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meek v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louie's Cattle Service LLC
Represented By: Ronald F. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Lee Molt
Represented By: Ronald F. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie A. Gillette
Represented By: William P. Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elijah Michael Ward
Represented By: Ronald F. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis P. Molt
Represented By: Ronald F. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvies Valley Ranch LLC
Represented By: Melanie A. Gillette
Represented By: William P. Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Meek
Represented By: Martin E. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?