Sands v. State of Oregon, et al,.
Plaintiff: Daniel Sands
Defendant: State of Oregon, Mike Gower, Colette Peters, Mark Nooth, Tyler Blewett and Oregon Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2021cv00631
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Referring Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference (set as a Rule 16 conference) held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 6/21/2021. Case management deadlines will be reset after resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify the Class (ECF No. 203 ) in Maney et al v. Brown et al, 6:20-cv-00570-SB. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. (The consent form is attached.) For more information regarding the role of Magistrate Judges and consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, see ord.uscourts.gov/consent. The parties are advised that a telephone conference must be scheduled with Judge Beckerman before any discovery motion is filed. John D. Burgess and Carl Lee Post present as counsel for plaintiff. R. Kyle Busse, Molly K. Honore and Kerry J. Shepherd present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway, (503) 326-8188. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Kerry J. Shepherd appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by Tyler Blewett, Mike Gower, Mark Nooth, Oregon Department of Corrections, Colette Peters, State of Oregon. (Shepherd, Kerry)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Association of Attorney R. Kyle Busse,R. Kyle Busse,R. Kyle Busse for Colette Peters,R. Kyle Busse,R. Kyle Busse for Mike Gower,R. Kyle Busse,R. Kyle Busse for State of Oregon,R. Kyle Busse,R. Kyle Busse for Mark Nooth,R. Kyle Busse,R. Kyle Busse for Tyler Blewett,R. Kyle Busse,R. Kyle Busse for Oregon Department of Corrections. Filed by All Defendants. (Busse, R.)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Jermaine Brown appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by Tyler Blewett, Mike Gower, Mark Nooth, Oregon Department of Corrections, Colette Peters, State of Oregon, Tyler Blewett, Mike Gower, Mark Nooth, Oregon Department of Corrections, Colette Peters, State of Oregon. (Brown, Jermaine)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Molly K. Honore appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by Tyler Blewett, Mike Gower, Mark Nooth, Oregon Department of Corrections, Colette Peters, State of Oregon. (Honore, Molly)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Anna Marie Joyce appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by Tyler Blewett, Mike Gower, Mark Nooth, Oregon Department of Corrections, Colette Peters, State of Oregon. (Joyce, Anna)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice by e-mail to defense counsel of Scheduling Order (ECF No. 5). (gw) Modified on 6/4/2021 (gw).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Monday, June 21, 2021, at 9:30 AM by telephone. (Conference call information to follow by separate sealed entry.) Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon on June 18, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) Modified on 6/4/2021 (gw).
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Karin J. Immergut to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sss)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon Department of Corrections, State of Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8058748 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Daniel Sands against Tyler Blewett, Mike Gower, Mark Nooth, Oregon Department of Corrections, Colette Peters, State of Oregon (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Post, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sands v. State of Oregon, et al,.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon
Represented By: R. Kyle Busse
Represented By: Jermaine Brown
Represented By: Molly K. Honore
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Kerry J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gower
Represented By: R. Kyle Busse
Represented By: Jermaine Brown
Represented By: Molly K. Honore
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Kerry J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colette Peters
Represented By: R. Kyle Busse
Represented By: Jermaine Brown
Represented By: Molly K. Honore
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Kerry J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Nooth
Represented By: R. Kyle Busse
Represented By: Jermaine Brown
Represented By: Molly K. Honore
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Kerry J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Blewett
Represented By: R. Kyle Busse
Represented By: Jermaine Brown
Represented By: Molly K. Honore
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Kerry J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Corrections
Represented By: R. Kyle Busse
Represented By: Jermaine Brown
Represented By: Molly K. Honore
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Kerry J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Sands
Represented By: Carl Lee Post
Represented By: John D. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?