Doe v. Holy See et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: John V Doe
Defendant: Archdiocese of Portland In Oregon, Catholic Bishop of Chicago, Holy See, Order of the Friar Servants of Mary and Roman Catholic Archbishop Of Portland In Oregon
Case Number: 3:2002cv00430
Filed: April 3, 2002
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Mosman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2010 Filing 228 Answer to Amended Complaint. Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (Ernst, David)
March 3, 2010 Filing 227 Case Management Order For Discovery and Dispositive Motions Involving Plaintiff And Defendant Order Of The Friar Servants of Mary. Signed on 3/2/10 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib)
February 19, 2010 Filing 226 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Lodged Case Management Order for Discovery and Dispositive Motions Involving Plaintiff and Defendant Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. Filed by John V Doe. (Finnegan, Michael)
February 8, 2010 Filing 225 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Rule 16 Conference held. The Court adopts Defendant Holy See's Litigation Plan Proposal (#218). The case is stayed with respect to the Holy See until the Supreme Court reaches a decision on the Holy See's petition for writ of certiorari. Discovery and motions practice will proceed with respect to Defendant Province. Plaintiff and the Province are to submit a joint case management schedule to the Court no later than February 19, 2010. Kevin K. Strever, Michael G Finnegan and Jeffrey R. Anderson present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Alexis Haller, Jeffrey S. Lena, Thomas M Christ, David Ernst, and James C Geoly present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls)
February 3, 2010 Filing 224 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Rule 16 Conference is set for 2/8/2010 at 04:00PM in Telephone before Judge Michael W. Mosman. The court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
February 2, 2010 Filing 223 Brief DEFENDANT HOLY SEE'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY RE: HOLY SEE'S LITIGATION PLAN PROPOSAL. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Sur-Reply to Motion 222 .) (Haller, Alexis)
February 2, 2010 Filing 222 Sur-Reply to Holy See's Litigation Plan. Filed by John V Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Michael Finnegan in Support of Plaintiff's Surreply to Holy See's Litigation Plan) (Finnegan, Michael)
February 1, 2010 Filing 221 Brief (Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Holy See's Litigation Plan Proposal. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Status Report, 220 .) (Haller, Alexis)
January 27, 2010 Filing 220 Status Report Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Holy See's Litigation Plan by John V Doe. Filed by John V Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Finnegan in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Holy See's Litigation Plan) (Finnegan, Michael)
January 21, 2010 Filing 219 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Lena in support of Defendant Holy See's Litigation Plan Proposal. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Status Report 218 .) (Haller, Alexis)
January 21, 2010 Filing 218 Status Report re Defendant Holy See's Litigation Plan Proposal by Holy See. Filed by Holy See. (Haller, Alexis)
January 21, 2010 Filing 217 Joint Status Report , Joint Discovery Plan Statement. Filed by all parties. (Haller, Alexis)
January 14, 2010 Filing 216 Record of Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Order GRANTING the parties 1/14/2010 email request to extend the Discovery Plan FROM January 14, 2009, due by 1/21/2010. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
January 6, 2010 Filing 215 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record regarding Order on motion for extension of time 214 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a), the Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and to notify all parties accordingly. CORRECTION: The Discovery Plan is due by January 14, 2010 instead of January 14, 2009. (cib)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER: GRANT Stipulation of the Parties to Extend Time to File Discovery Plan With Court 213 . Discovery Plan is due by January 14, 2009. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 23, 2009 Filing 213 Stipulation of the Parties to Extend Time to File Discovery Plan with Court by John V Doe. Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/4/2010 (dls).
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER: DENYING Motion for Stay 209 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 24, 2009 Filing 211 Declaration of JEFFREY S. LENA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HOLY SEE'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay 209 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H) (Haller, Alexis)
November 24, 2009 Filing 210 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay 209 .) (Haller, Alexis)
November 24, 2009 Filing 209 Motion for Stay. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Holy See. (Haller, Alexis)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, I DENY Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 195 . Signed on 10/19/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Leave TO FILE SUR-REPLY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT 204 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
September 23, 2009 Filing 206 Status Report Regarding Proceedings Before the United States Supreme Court by Holy See. Filed by Holy See. (Haller, Alexis)
September 2, 2009 Filing 205 Order. This action is designated as a Complex Case. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
August 24, 2009 Filing 204 Motion for Leave TO FILE SUR-REPLY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT. Filed by Holy See. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Haller, Alexis)
August 17, 2009 Filing 203 Reply to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition 195 . Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2009 Filing 202 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Lena in Support of Defendant Holy See's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition 201 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M) (Haller, Alexis)
August 7, 2009 Filing 201 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition 195 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Holy See. (Haller, Alexis)
August 6, 2009 Filing 200 Order- Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexis Haller for Holy See. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 28358 issued. Signed on 8/6/2009 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. 197 . Response is due by 8/7/2009. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (mjp)
July 21, 2009 Filing 198 Declaration of Wendy M. Margolis. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 197 .) (Margolis, Wendy)
July 21, 2009 Filing 197 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. Filed by Holy See. (Margolis, Wendy)
July 15, 2009 Filing 196 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition 195 .) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Document Ex. A Second Amended Complaint) (Anderson, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2009 Filing 195 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition. Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2009 Filing 194 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael G. Finnegan for John V Doe. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 27473 issued. Signed on 6/13/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ljl)
June 15, 2009 Filing 193 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marci Hamilton for John V Doe. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 27473 issued. Signed on 6/13/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ljl)
June 15, 2009 Filing 192 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference. The Mandate discussed and cert discussed. Order GRANTING Plaintiff's oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint. The Motion for Amended Complaint will be due 7/15/2009. Responses according to the local rules. Kevin Strever, Jeffrey Anderson, Mike Finnegan, and Marci Hamilton present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jeffrey Lena, Thomas Christ, David Ernst and Susan Horner present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls)
June 12, 2009 Filing 191 Notice Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marci Hamilton.Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2009 Filing 190 Notice Application for Special Admission pro hac vice.Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
June 9, 2009 Filing 189 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Status Conference is set for 6/15/2009 at 04:00PM in Telephone before Judge Michael W. Mosman. The court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
April 6, 2009 Filing 188 MANDATE of USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 06-35563 159 and CA 06-35587 164 : (In appeal no. CA 06-35563) The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED in part; REVERSED in part; and REMANDED. The cross-appeal (CA 06-35587) is DISMISSED. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Opinion) (tomg)
February 25, 2009 Filing 187 Status Report by John V Doe. Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2008 Filing 186 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Report is due by 2/26/2009. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 21, 2008 Filing 185 Status Report by John V Doe. Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2008 Filing 184 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Report is due by 11/26/2008. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
August 26, 2008 Filing 183 Fifth Status Report by John V Doe. Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2008 Filing 182 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Report is due by 8/29/2008. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
May 29, 2008 Filing 181 Fourth Status Report by John V Doe. Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2008 Filing 180 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Wendy M. Margolis is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Christine Coers-Mitchell.Filed by Holy See. (Margolis, Wendy)
March 7, 2008 Filing 179 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Report is due by 6/6/2008. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
February 27, 2008 Filing 178 Third Status Report by John V Doe. Filed by John V Doe. (Anderson, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2008 Filing 177 Third Status Report by Holy See. Filed by Holy See. (Coers-Mitchell, Christine)
February 1, 2008 Record on Appeal (entire original file) sent to the 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 06-35563 159 . (tomg)
February 1, 2008 Filing 176 Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Cross-Appeal CA 06-35587 164 filed by John V. Doe on 6/22/06. (tomg)
February 1, 2008 Filing 175 Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 06-35563 159 filed by Hole See on 6/8/06. (tomg)
December 17, 2007 Filing 174 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Report is due by 3/3/2008. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 3, 2007 Filing 173 Second Status Report by Holy See. Filed by Holy See. (Coers-Mitchell, Christine)
October 30, 2007 Filing 172 Transcript Designation and Order Form . Filed by Holy See. (Coers-Mitchell, Christine)
September 10, 2007 Filing 171 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Report is due by 12/3/2007. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
September 6, 2007 Filing 170 The document, Status Report 169 , was conventionally filed in our court after the mandatory electronic filing deadline of September 1, 2006. Local Rule 100.1 clearly requires the electronic filing of all pleadings, documents, and other papers in all pending civil and criminal cases. The document(s) referenced above should not be re-filed electronically, but we ask that you conform to the requirements of LR 100.1 in future submissions to the court. Please refer to LR 100.4 for documents which must be filed conventionally. To learn more about this requirement and the CM/ECF system, visit the court's Internet website at: ord.uscourts.gov. There you will find links to rules and resources designed to assist you and your staff in quickly learning how to electronically file. If you have any questions or concerns regarding this matter, please contact any member of the Clerk's Office staff.. (pvh)
September 6, 2007 Filing 169 Plaintiff's Status Report by John V Doe. Filed by John V Doe. (pvh)
September 4, 2007 Filing 168 Status Report by Holy See. Filed by Holy See. (Coers-Mitchell, Christine)
June 18, 2007 Filing 167 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Report is due by 9/4/2007. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
July 21, 2006 Notifiction from USCA 9th Circuit of appeal number CA 06-35587 for Notice of Cross-Appeal 164 filed by John Doe on 6/22/06. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal 164 ) (tomg, )
July 11, 2006 Filing 166 Notification from USCA 9th Circuit of appeal number CA 06-35563 for Notice of Appeal 159 filed by Holy See on 6/8/06, including Briefing Schedule. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal 159 ) (tomg, )
June 30, 2006 Filing 165 Joint Notice REGARDING DESIGNATION OF RECORD. Filed by Christine Coers-Mitchell appearing on behalf of all parties.(Coers-Mitchell, Christine)
June 29, 2006 Notification of Cross-Appeal from Notice of Cross-Appeal 164 sent to USCA for the 9th Circuit and counsel along with a copy of the docket sheet. (CADS sent also). (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal 164 ) (ljl, )
June 22, 2006 Filing 164 Cross-Appeal Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit from Order on motion to dismiss 158 . Filing fee in amount of $455 collected; Receipt No. 10097 issued. Filed by John V Doe. (Related Document(s): Order on motion to dismiss 158 ) (cib, )
June 19, 2006 Notification of Appeal 159 sent to USCA for the 9th Circuit and to counsel along with a copy of the docket sheet. (CADS mailed directly to Court of Appeals by appellant). (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal 159 ) (tomg, )
June 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. DENYING WITH LEAVE TO REFILE Motion to Dismiss 135 , DENYING WITH LEAVE TO REFILE Motion for Leave 142 . (dls, )
June 14, 2006 Filing 162 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference. The parties filed an appeal in this matter, and a cross-appeal will be filed. This case will remain pending until resolution at the court of appeals. Kevin Strever, William Barton, Jeffrey Anderson, and Mike Finnegan present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jeffrey Lena, Thomas Christ, David Ernst, and Stephen English present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Grube. Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls, )
June 13, 2006 Filing 161 Notice Defendant Holy See's Status Conference Statement. Filed by Christine Coers-Mitchell appearing on behalf of Holy See.(Coers-Mitchell, Christine)
June 12, 2006 Filing 160 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Conference is set for 6/14/2006 at 11:30AM in Telephone before Judge Michael W. Mosman. The court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls, )
June 8, 2006 USCA Appeal Fees re Notice of Appeal 159 : Received Fee in amount of $ 455.00. Receipt number 9881 issued. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal 159 ) (tomg, )
June 8, 2006 Filing 159 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Filed by Holy See. (Coers-Mitchell, Christine)
June 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION AND ORDER: The Holy See's motion to dismiss 133 for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is DENIED. The commercial activity exception to the FSIA is inapplicable because the gravamen of plaintiff's complaint is not commercial in nature. However, plaintiff's complaint contains factual allegations sufficient to establish the applicability of the tortious activity exception to the FSIA such that plaintiff survives the Holy See's facial attack in this motion to dismiss. Moreover, because the challenged conduct is not the type of judgment the discretionary function exception was designed to shield, and because the record is devoid of any policy-based rationale for the challenged conduct, the Holy See did not meet its burden to demonstrate its entitlement to the safe harbor under the tortious activity exception to sovereign immunity. Signed on 6/7/06 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls, )
February 16, 2006 Filing 157 Certificate of Service by Holy See re Response to Motion 156 . Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
February 16, 2006 Filing 156 Opposition To Plaintiff's Request For Discovery on The Issue Of Personal Jurisdiction Over The Holy See 142 . Filed by Holy See.(cib, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 155 Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition(s) regarding the Holy See's Jurisdictional Challenge. Filed by Jeffrey R. Anderson appearing on behalf of all plaintiffs.(dls, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 154 Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents regarding the Holy See's Jurisdicational Challenge. Filed by Jeffrey R. Anderson appearing on behalf of all plaintiffs.(dls, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 153 Plaintiff's Interragatories regarding the Holy See's Jurisdicational Challenge. Filed by Jeffrey R. Anderson appearing on behalf of all plaintiffs.(dls, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 152 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in support of Discovery on the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction over the Holy See. Filed by Jeffrey R. Anderson appearing on behalf of all plaintiffs.(dls, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 151 Certificate of Service by Holy See re Reply to Motion 150 . Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 150 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition To Motion to Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jursidiction 133 . Filed by Holy See.(cib, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 149 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference. Order GRANTING Motion To Sequence Defenses and Motion For Leave To File Memorandum In Support of Motion To Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim Following Adjudication of Jurisdictional Defenses (#131). Order GRANTING IN PART Unopposed Motion for Order Enlarging Time for Holy See to File Responses (#146). Defendant's Reply Brief on the issue of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (#133) is due February 2, 2006. Personal Jurisdiction Issue - Plaintiff shall submit the specific discovery requests it seeks as well as briefing on why such requests are allowed under Ninth Circuit law by February 2, 2006. Defendant shall file a responsive brief to the propriety of plaintiff's discovery requests by February 16, 2006. The court will conduct, if necessary, other status conferences to address briefing schedules regarding personal jurisdiction and the 12(b)(6) motion after the subject matter jurisdiction issue is adjudicated. All other motions and requests for extension of deadlines not discussed in this minute order are held in abeyance until further notice. Kevin Strever, Jeffrey Anderson, and Mike Finnegan present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jeffrey Lena, Thomas Christ, David Ernst, and James Geoly present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Alexander. Michael W. Mosman presiding. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss 133 .) (dls, )
January 12, 2006 Filing 148 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Status Conference is set for 1/18/2006 at 10:00AM in Telephone before Judge Michael W. Mosman, regarding Unopposed Motion for Order Enlarging Time for Holy See to File Responses (#146). The court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls, )
January 3, 2006 Filing 147 Affidavit of Christine Coers-Mitchell in Support of Motion. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion for Order 146 .)(ntm, )
January 3, 2006 Filing 146 Unopposed Motion for Order Enlarging Time for Holy See to File Responses. Filed by Holy See. (ntm, )
December 28, 2005 Filing 145 Memorandum in Opposition To The Holy See's Challenge To This Court's Subject Matter Jurisdiction Based On Plaintiff's Complaint (#133). Filed by John V Doe.(cib, ) Modified on 1/12/2006 (dls, ). Modified on 1/12/2006 (dls, ).
December 23, 2005 Filing 144 Response to Motion to Sequence Defenses 131 . Filed by John V Doe.(ntm, )
December 23, 2005 Filing 143 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave 142 .)(ntm, )
December 23, 2005 Filing 142 Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery or Alternatively for Leave to File an Additional Brief if this Court Examines Any Issue Outside of the Sufficiency of the Complaint Under the FSIA Filed by John V Doe. (ntm, )
December 23, 2005 Filing 141 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to the Holy See's Challenge to this Courts Subject Matter Jurisdiction Based on Plaintiff's Complaint (#135). Filed by John V Doe.(ntm, ) Modified on 1/12/2006 (dls, ). Modified on 1/12/2006 (dls, ).
November 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 137 . Response is due by 12/23/2005, for the following motions: Motion To Sequence Defenses and Motion For Leave To File Memorandum In Support of Motion To Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim Following Adjudication of Jurisdictional Defenses (#131), ?Motion to Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction And Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1)-(2) (#133), and Motion to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (#135). (dls, )
November 29, 2005 Filing 139 Certificate of Service by John V Doe re Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss 133 , Motion to Dismiss 135 , Motion for Leave, 131 137 , Affidavit in Support of Motion 138 . Filed by John V Doe. (cib, )
November 29, 2005 Filing 138 Affidavit of Michael G. Finnegan in Support of Motion. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion 137 .)(cib, )
November 29, 2005 Filing 137 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond To The Holy See's Motions To Dismiss and To Sequence Defenses. 133 , 135 , 131 . Filed by John V Doe. (cib, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 136 Certificate of Service by Holy See re Motion to Dismiss 133 , Motion to Dismiss 135 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 134 , Motion for LeaveMotion 131 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 132 . Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 135 Motion to Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Oral Argument requested Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 134 Memorandum in Support. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss 133 .)(cib, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 133 Motion to Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction And Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1)-(2). Oral Argument requested Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 132 Memorandum in Support. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave, 131 and Motion To Sequence.)(cib, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 131 Motion To Sequence Defenses and Motion For Leave To File Memorandum In Support of Motion To Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim Following Adjudication of Jurisdictional Defenses. Oral Argument Requested. Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
October 11, 2005 Filing 130 Affidavit of Christine Coers-Mitchell in Support of Stipulated Motion for an Order to Enlarge Time for Holy See to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. Filed by Holy See. (ntm, )
October 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 127 . Answer due 11/9/2005. (dls, )
September 30, 2005 Filing 128 Affidavit of Christine Coers-Mitchell in Support of Motion. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition 127 .)(ntm, )
September 30, 2005 Filing 127 Stipulated Motion for Order to Enlarge Time for Holy See to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint 86 . Filed by Holy See. (ntm, )
August 24, 2005 Filing 126 Return of Service (with attachments) executed upon The Holy See on 8/2/2005. (ntm, )
June 14, 2005 Filing 125 Request for Removal from Service List. Filed by The Archdiocese Of Portland In Oregon. (ntm, )
June 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. GRANTING Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed with Service through The Department of State 118 . (dls, )
May 27, 2005 Filing 123 Reply To Defendant Holy See's Opposition to Service Through The Department of State. Filed by all plaintiffs.(cib, )
May 16, 2005 Filing 122 Certificate of Service by Holy See re Response to Motion 121 . Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
May 16, 2005 Filing 121 Response to Motion 118 . Filed by Holy See.(cib, )
May 4, 2005 Filing 120 Affidavit of Michael G. Finnegan in Support of Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed with Service through The Department of State. Filed by plaintiff. (peg, )
May 4, 2005 Filing 119 Memorandum of Law in Support of Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed with Service Through The Department of State. Filed by plaintiff. (peg, )
May 4, 2005 Filing 118 Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed with Service through The Department of State. Filed by plainitff. (peg, )
May 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. DENYING Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed with Service Through the State Department 114 , for Failure to Confer pursuant to LR 7.1. and with leave to re-file after plaintiff's confer with opposing counsel. (dls, )
March 28, 2005 Filing 116 Affidavit of Michael G. Finnegan in Support of Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed With Service Through The State Department. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s): Motion 114 .)(peg, )
March 28, 2005 Filing 115 Memorandum of Law in Support of Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed With Service Through The Department of State. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s): Motion 114 .)(peg, )
March 28, 2005 Filing 114 Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed with Service Through the State Department. Filed by John V. Doe. (peg, )
January 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Order DENYING Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And For Insufficient Service Of Process 101 and quashing Plaintiff's service of process. Plaintiff has 60 days from the date of this order to effectuate proper service of process under the FSIA. Failure by Plaintiff to effectuate proper service of process may result in dismissal. (dls, )
October 26, 2004 Filing 111 Declaration of Charles J. Reid Jr. In Support. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Reply In Support to Motion 110 .)(cib, )
October 26, 2004 Filing 110 Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition to Second Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 101 . Filed by Holy See.(cib, )
October 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply for Second Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 107 . Reply due by 10/26/2004 101 . (dls, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 108 Affidavit of Christine Coers-Mitchell in Support of Motion. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion 107 .)(cib, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 107 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To The Holy See's Second Motion To Dismiss. Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
September 30, 2004 Filing 112 Affidavit of Professor George A. Sheets. Filed by all plaintiffs. (cib, )
September 30, 2004 Filing 106 Certificate of Service by John V Doe re Memorandum, 104 , Affidavit 105 . Filed by John V Doe. (cib, )
September 30, 2004 Filing 105 Affidavit of Michael G. Finnegan In Opposition To Motion To Dismiss. Filed by John V Doe. (cib, )
September 30, 2004 Filing 104 Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendant Holy See's Second Motion To Dismiss For Insufficient Service Of Process And Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction. Oral Argument Requested. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction 101 .)(cib, )
September 21, 2004 Filing 103 Stipulated Judgment Of Dismissal With Prejudice And Without Costs. Signed on 9/21/04 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 102 Affidavit of Christine Coers-Mitchell In Support in Support of Motion. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction 101 .)(cib, )
August 31, 2004 Filing 101 Second Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Defendant Holy See. (peg, )
August 31, 2004 Filing 100 Certificate of Service by Holy See re Motion 96 , Memorandum in Support 97 , Declaration 98 , Declaration 99 . Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
August 31, 2004 Filing 99 Declaration of Charles J. Reid, Jr., In Support Of The Holy See's Second Motion To Dismiss For Insufficient Service Of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction.(not an original signature) Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
August 31, 2004 Filing 98 Declaration of Byron H. Done In Support Of The Holy See's Second Motion To Dismiss For Insufficient Service Of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
August 31, 2004 Filing 97 Memorandum in Support Of Second Motion To Dismiss For Insufficient Service Of Process and Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
August 31, 2004 Filing 96 Request For Judicial Notice Pursuant To Fed. R. Evid. 201(b)(2) In Support Of The Holy See's Second Motion To Dismiss For Insufficient Service Of Process and Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 93 CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Michael W. Mosman. Defendant Holy See shall have until August 31, 2004 to file an answer or motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until September 30, 2004 to file a response to any motion to dismiss filed by defendant. Defendant shall have until October 14, 2004 to file a reply. The court will contact the parties later about whether and when there will be oral argument. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 95 Affidavit of Christine Coers-Mitchell in Support of Motion. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s): Motion for Order To Enlarge Time 94 .)(cib, )
August 17, 2004 Filing 94 Stipulated Motion for Order To Enlarge Time For Holy See To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To The Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule. Filed by Holy See. (cib, )
July 22, 2004 Filing 92 Notice Of Bankruptcy. Filed by The Archdiocese Of Portland In Oregon, Roman Catholic Archbishop Of Portland In Oregon.(cib, )
July 21, 2004 Filing 91 Return of Service executed upon Vatican City, Holy See on 6/25/04. (cib, )
July 15, 2004 Filing 90 Notice of Dismissal of Party Catholic Bishop of Chicago. Filed by William A. Barton appearing on behalf of John V Doe.(mja, )
May 20, 2004 Filing 89 CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Proceedings: Status Conference. Order GRANTING Third Motion for Extension of Time For Service Upon Defendant Holy See(State Of The Vatican City)and Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Service upon defendant Holy See is extended 60 days. Discovery extended from 7/20/2004, to be completed by 11/22/2004. Dispositive Motions extended from 8/20/2004, due by 12/20/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report extended from 7/20/2004, due by 11/22/2004. Pretrial Order extended from 12/1/04, due by 2/1/2005. Kevin K Strever, Jeffrey R Anderson, and Mike Finnegan present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jeffrey S. Lena, Thomas M Christ, James Finn, James C Geoly and Stephen F English present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter or Tape No.: Priscilla Harris. Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls, )
May 13, 2004 Filing 87 CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO DeadlinesMotion for Extension of Time 83 . Status Conference set for 5/20/2004 at 09:00AM in Telephone Conference before Judge Michael W. Mosman. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls, )
May 7, 2004 Filing 88 Return of Service unexecuted upon Archbishop Jean-Louis Tauran Secretary for Relations with States. Filed by John V Doe. (cib, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 86 Amended Complaint. Trial Demanded.Filed by John V Doe against The Archdiocese Of Portland In Oregon, Catholic Bishop of Chicago, Holy See, Order of the Friar Servants of Mary, Roman Catholic Archbishop Of Portland In Oregon.(cib, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 85 Notice Of Suit. Filed by Jeffrey R. Anderson appearing on behalf of John V Doe.(cib, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 84 Memorandum in Support Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines, Motion for Extension of Time 83 . Filed by John V Doe. (cib, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 83 Third Motion for Extension of Time For Service Upon Defendant Holy See(State Of The Vatican City)and Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by John V Doe. (cib, )
February 26, 2004 Filing 82 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/5/04 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita J. Alexander.. (cib, )
February 5, 2004 Filing 81 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Oral Argument before Judge Michael W Mosman. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Jeffrey R Anderson and Kevin K Strever. Counsel Present for Defendant: Jeffrey S Lena and Thomas M Christ. Court Reporter: Bonita Alexander. Order DENYING Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And For Insufficient Service Of Process (#56), as stated on the record, with the qualification Plaintiff has 60 days from the date of this order, to effectuate service of process under the SSIA. (dls, )
January 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER:Record of Order GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to postpone Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Related Doc # 78 ). RESETTING Oral Argument from 1/20/04 at 9:30am to 2/5/2004 at 03:00PM in Portland, Courtroom 14B. by Judge Michael W Mosman. (Related documents(s) 56 ) (dls, )
January 16, 2004 Filing 79 Affidavit of Christine Coers-Mitchell in support of Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to postpone Hearing. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 78 ) (dls, )
January 16, 2004 Filing 78 Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to postpone Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Holy See. (dls, )
December 12, 2003 Filing 77 Certificate of Service. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 75 , 76 ) (dls, )
December 12, 2003 Filing 76 Declaration of Jeffrey S Lena in support of Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And For Insufficient Service of Process. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 75 ) (dls, )
December 12, 2003 Filing 75 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And For Insufficient Service Of Process. Filed by Holy See. (Related motion(s) 56 ) (dls, )
November 5, 2003 Filing 74 Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s) 73 ) (cib, )
November 5, 2003 Filing 73 Memorandum in Opposition To Defendant Holy See's Motion To Dismiss For Insufficient Service Of Process And Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction(Oral Argument Requested). Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s) 56 ) (cib, )
November 5, 2003 Filing 72 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Michael W Mosman. ORDER Granting Motion for Order to Set Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pursuant to Court Order (#70). Discovery to be completed by 7/20/2004. Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 7/20/2004. ADR Conference by 6/18/04 Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2004. (dls, )
November 4, 2003 Filing 71 Affidavit of Kevin K. Strever in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pursuant to Court Order. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s) 70 ) (peg, )
November 4, 2003 Filing 70 Motion for Order to Set Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines Pursuant to Court Order. Filed by John V Doe. (peg, )
October 22, 2003 Filing 69 Notice of Case Reassignment: Case reassigned from Judge John Jelderks to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (gm)
September 11, 2003 Filing 68 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting the Stipulation (Motion) to Enlarge Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Holy See's Motion to Dismiss and to Extend Related Deadlines (Related documents(s) 65 ) and Granting Defendant The Order of Friar Servants of Mary's Motion Joining in Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Holy See's Motion to Dismiss and to Extend Related Deadlines (Related documents(s) 67 ) as follows: Response to dismissal motion due by 11/7/2003. Reply to response due by 12/12/2003. Order: Resetting Defendant Holy See's Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Related documents(s) 56 ) from 10/7/2003 at 1:30PM to the Oral Argument Calendar of 1/20/2004 at 09:30AM in Courtroom 12-B. Order Resetting the following deadline: Answer deadline for Defendants Holy See and The Order of Friar Servants of Mary will be due 45 days after this Court's final ruling on the dismissal motion. Order: Counsel shall confer and promptly submit a motion appropriately extending the discovery and pretrial deadlines in this case. (gm)
September 10, 2003 Filing 67 Motion Joining in Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Holy See's Motion to Dismiss and to Extend Related Deadlines. Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (gm, )
September 8, 2003 Filing 66 Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Stipulated Motion to Extend Time. Filed by Defendant Holy See. (Related document(s) 65 ) (gm)
September 8, 2003 Filing 65 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Holy See's Motion to Dismiss and to Extend Related Deadlines. Filed by John V Doe. (gm, )
August 28, 2003 Filing 64 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon and (The) Roman Catholic Archbishop of Portland in Oregon's Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney (Mario J. Madden) as Counsel of Record (Related Doc # 54 ). Attorney Mario J. Madden is withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon and (The) Roman Catholic Archbishop of Portland in Oregon. Attorney Thomas V. Dulcich remains as sole counsel for these Defendants. (gm)
August 28, 2003 Filing 63 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Setting Defendant Holy See's Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Related documents(s) 56 ) on the Oral Argument Calendar of 10/7/2003 at 01:30PM in Courtroom 12-B. (gm)
August 28, 2003 Filing 62 Certificate of Service. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 56 , 57 , 58 , 59 , 60 , 61 ) (tomg, )
August 28, 2003 Filing 61 Declaration of Cynthia L.V. White In Support. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 56 ) (tomg, )
August 28, 2003 Filing 60 Declaration of Charles J. Reid In Support. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 56 ) (tomg, )
August 28, 2003 Filing 59 Declaration of Byron H. Done In Support. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 56 ) (tomg, )
August 28, 2003 Filing 58 Memorandum in Support Of Motion To Dismiss. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 56 ) (tomg, )
August 28, 2003 Filing 57 Request For Judicial Notice. Filed by Holy See. (Related document(s) 56 ) (tomg, )
August 28, 2003 Filing 56 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And For Insufficient Service Of Process (Oral Argument Requested). Filed by Holy See. (tomg, )
August 27, 2003 Filing 54 Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney. Filed by The Archdiocese Of Portland In Oregon, Roman Catholic Archbishop Of Portland In Oregon. (tomg, )
August 26, 2003 Filing 55 Affidavit of Thomas V. Dulcich In Support. Filed by The Archdiocese Of Portland In Oregon, Roman Catholic Archbishop Of Portland In Oregon. (Related document(s) 54 ) (tomg, )
August 25, 2003 Filing 53 Order Granting Defendant Holy See's Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey S. Lena for Defendant Holy See. Receipt # 452387. Signed 8/25/03 by Judge John Jelderks. (gm)
August 18, 2003 Filing 52 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendant Holy See's Stipulation to an Order to Extend Time for Defendant Holy See to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Related documents(s) 51 ) and Defendant Friar Servents' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant The Order of the Friar Servants of Mary to Enter First Appearance (Related documents(s) 49 ) as follows: Answer deadlines reset to 9/26/2003 for Defendants Holy See and The Order of the Friar Servants of Mary.(gm)
August 15, 2003 Filing 51 Stipulation To An Order To Extend Time For Defendant Holy See To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint. Filed by Holy See. (tomg, )
August 15, 2003 Filing 50 Affidavit of David A. Ernst In Support. Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (Related document(s) 49 ) (tomg, )
August 15, 2003 Filing 49 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (to enter first appearance). Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (tomg, )
May 19, 2003 Filing 48 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting the Stipulation to an Order to Extend Time for Defendant Holy See to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Related documents(s) 47 ) as follows: Answer deadline reset to 8/21/2003 for Defendant Holy See. (gm)
May 16, 2003 Filing 47 Stipulation To An Order To Extend Time For Defendant Holy See To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint. Filed by Holy See. (tomg, )
May 7, 2003 Filing 46 Defendant Holy See's Notice Of Appearance. Filed by Holy See. (tomg, )
April 14, 2003 Filing 45 Notice Of Suit (transmitted by U.S. Department of State to Secretariat of State of the Holy See on March 24, 2003). Filed by John V Doe. (tomg, )
January 31, 2003 Filing 44 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Court Deadlines (Related Doc # 41 ) as follows and as modified: Discovery to be completed by 9/2/2003. Pretrial Order due by 10/3/2003. Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2003. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements completed by 10/3/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 10/3/2003. (gm)
January 31, 2003 Filing 43 Certificate of Service. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s) 41 , 42 ) (gm)
January 31, 2003 Filing 42 Affidavit of Kevin K. Strever in Support. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s) 41 ) (gm, )
January 31, 2003 Filing 41 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by John V Doe. (gm, )
January 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time (of 180 days from the date of this Order) to Effectuate Service Upon Foreign Defendant Holy See (Related Doc # 37 ) Signed on 1/27/03 by Judge John Jelderks. (gm)
January 24, 2003 Filing 39 Supplemental Affidavit of Michael G. Finnegan. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s) 37 ) (tomg, )
January 24, 2003 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support Of Second Motion To Extend Time For Service. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s) 37 ) (tomg, )
January 24, 2003 Filing 37 Second Motion for Extension of Time For Service Upon Defendant Holy See (State Of The Vatican City). Filed by John V Doe. (tomg, )
November 20, 2002 Filing 36 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendant The Order of the Friar Servants of Mary's Fourth Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Enter First Appearance (Answer) (Related Doc # 34 ) as follows: Answer deadline reset to 11/25/02 for Defendant The Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (gm)
November 19, 2002 Filing 35 Affidavit of David A. Ernst in Support of Unoppsed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant the Order of the Friar Servants of Mary to Enter First Appearance Pursuant to FRCP 6(b). Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (Related document(s) 34 ) (kw, )
November 19, 2002 Filing 34 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (filed as Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant the Order of the Friar Servants of Mary to Enter First Appearance Pursuant to FRCP 6(b)). (extension requested to 11/25/02). Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (kw, )
October 18, 2002 Filing 33 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendant The Order of the Friar Servants of Mary's Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Enter First Appearance (Answer) (Related Doc # 32 ) as follows: Answer deadline reset to 11/18/02 for Defendant The Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (gm)
October 18, 2002 Filing 32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time For Defendant The Order Of The Friar Servants Of Mary To Enter First Appearance. Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (tomg, )
October 18, 2002 Filing 31 Affidavit of Scott Brooksby in Support of Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant To Enter First Appearance Pursuant to FRCP 6(b). Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (Related document(s) 28 ) (mja, )
September 19, 2002 Filing 30 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendant The Order of the Friar Servants of Mary's Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Enter First Appearance (Related Doc # 28 ) as follows: Answer deadline reset to 10/18/02 for Defendant The Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (gm)
September 19, 2002 Filing 29 Affidavit of David A. Ernst In Support Of Unopposed Motion. Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (Related document(s) 28 ) (tomg, )
September 19, 2002 Filing 28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Enter First Appearance. Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (tomg, )
September 16, 2002 Filing 27 Order Granting Defendant's Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James C. Geoly for Defendant Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. Receipt #446120. Signed 9/13/02 by Judge John Jelderks. (gm)
September 10, 2002 Filing 26 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Court Deadlines (Related Doc # 24 ) as follows and as modified: Discovery to be completed by 2/3/2003. Pretrial Order due by 3/3/2003. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2003. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements completed by 3/3/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 3/3/2003. (gm)
September 9, 2002 Filing 25 Affidavit of Kevin K. Strever in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Court Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s) 24 ) (ljl, )
September 9, 2002 Filing 24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
August 19, 2002 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed upon The Catholic Bishop Of Chicago on 8/1/02. Filed by John V Doe. (tomg, )
August 5, 2002 Filing 22 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendant (The) Order of the Friar Servants of Mary's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Enter First Appearance (Answer) (Related Doc # 20 ) as follows: Answer deadline reset to 9/18/02 for Defendant (The) Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (gm)
August 5, 2002 Filing 21 Affidavit of David A. Ernst In Support Of Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To Enter First Appearance. Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (Related document(s) 20 ) (tomg, )
August 5, 2002 Filing 20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Enter First Appearance. Filed by Order of the Friar Servants of Mary. (tomg, )
August 5, 2002 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed upon The Order Of The Friar Servants Of Mary on 7/29/02. Filed by John V Doe. (tomg, )
July 30, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (of 180 days from the date of this Order) to Effectuate Service Upon Foreign Defendant Holy See (Related Doc # 15 ). Signed on 7/30/02 by Judge John Jelderks. (gm)
July 29, 2002 Filing 17 Second Affidavit of Jeffrey R. Anderson. Filed by John V Doe. (tomg, )
July 29, 2002 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support Of Motion To Extend Time For Service Upon Defendant Holy See (State Of The Vatican City). Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s) 15 ) (tomg, )
July 29, 2002 Filing 15 Motion for Extension of Time For Service Upon Defendant Holy See (State Of The Vatican City). Filed by John V Doe. (tomg, )
July 22, 2002 Filing 14 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting the Archdiocese Defendants' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File First Appearance (Answer) (Related Doc # 13 ) as follows: Answer deadline reset to 9/18/02 for Defendants Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon and The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Portland in Oregon. (gm)
July 19, 2002 Filing 13 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time To File First Appearance. Filed by The Archdiocese Of Portland In Oregon. (tomg, )
June 19, 2002 Filing 12 CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Archdiocese Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File First Appearance (Answer) (Related Doc # 11 ) as follows: Answer deadline reset to 7/20/02 for Defendants Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon and the Roman Catholic Archbishop of Portland in Oregon. (gm)
June 18, 2002 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File First Appearance. Filed by The Archdiocese Of Portland In Oregon. (tomg, )
June 5, 2002 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed upon The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Portland on 5/30/02. Filed by John V Doe. (mja, )
June 5, 2002 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed upon Archdiocese of Portland on 5/30/02. Filed by John V Doe. (mja, )
April 17, 2002 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment : Case reassigned from Anna J. Brown to John Jelderks. (ljb, )
April 8, 2002 Letters Rogatory sent to Plaintiff's counsel. (ljb, )
April 8, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER:Order Granting Plaintiffs's Motion for Letters Rogatory (Related Doc # 3 ) Signed on 4/8/02 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ljb, )
April 4, 2002 Filing 6 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey R Anderson for John V Doe. Receipt number 443309 Signed 4/4/02 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljb, )
April 3, 2002 Filing 5 Affidavit of Jeffrey R. Anderson. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s) 3 ) (ljb, )
April 3, 2002 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Letters Rogatory. Filed by John V Doe. (Related document(s) 3 ) (ljb, )
April 3, 2002 Filing 3 Motion for Letters Rogatory. Filed by John V Doe. (ljb, )
April 3, 2002 Filing 2 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Anna J. Brown. Discovery to be completed by 8/2/2002. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 9/3/2002. Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2002. (ljb, )
April 3, 2002 Filing 1 Complaint Personal Injury Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 443308 issued. Filed by John V Doe against Archdiocese Of Portland In Oregon, Catholic Bishop of Chicago, Holy See, Order of the Friar Servants of Mary, Roman Catholic Archbishop Of Portland In Oregon. (ljb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Holy See et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of Portland In Oregon
Represented By: Mario J. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Bishop of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy See
Represented By: Thomas M. Christ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Order of the Friar Servants of Mary
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop Of Portland In Oregon
Represented By: Thomas V. Dulcich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John V Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?