Powell's Books, Inc. et al v. Myers et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Powell's Books, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Colette's: Good Food + Hungry Minds, LLC, Bluejay, Inc., St. Johns Booksellers, LLC, Twenty-Third Avenue Books, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Candace Morgan, Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc., Cascade AIDS Project and American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.
Defendant: Hardy Myers, Matt Shirtcliff, John Haroldson, John Foote, Joshua Marquis, Steve Atchison, Paul Frasier, Gary Williams, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, Jack Banta, Marion Weatherford, Ryan Joslin, Tim Colahan, John Sewell, Mark Huddleston, Peter L. Deuel, Stephen D. Campbell, Edwin I. Caleb, David A. Schutt, Douglass Harcleroad, Bernice Barnett, Jason Carlile, Dan Norris, Walter M. Beglau, Elizabeth Ballard, Michael D. Schrunk, John Fisher, Wade D. McLeod, William Bryan Porter, Dean Gushwa, Tim Thompson, Daniel Ousley, Eric J. Nisley, Robert Hermann, Thomas W. Cutsforth and Brad Berry
Case Number: 3:2008cv00501
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland Office
County: Multnomah
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Mosman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2011 Filing 65 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit. USCA Case 09-35153. Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys fees on appeal. We leave for the district court the issue of fees in that court. The determination of the amount of the attorneys fees is transferred to the district court. (sd)
January 4, 2011 Filing 64 Motion for Stay Attorney Fee and Cost Proceedings. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
December 22, 2010 Filing 63 MANDATE of USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal (# 52 ), Notice of Appeal (# 54 ), USCA #09-35153 and 09-35154. The judgment of this Court, entered September 20, 2010, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are awarded to the appellant in the amount of $90.01. The decision of the District Court is REVERSED. (eo)
September 20, 2010 Filing 62 Opinion from the USCA regarding Notice of Appeal 52 and Notice of Appeal 54 . (din)
May 11, 2010 Filing 61 Record on Appeal sent to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals regarding Notice of Appeal (# 54 ), Notice of Appeal (# 52 ), Court of Appeals case number 09-35153. (eo)
May 7, 2009 Filing 60 Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal 54 filed by Candace Morgan, et al on 2/4/09. (tomg)
May 7, 2009 Filing 59 Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal 52 filed by Powell's Books on 2/3/09. (tomg)
March 9, 2009 Filing 58 Transcript of Proceedings Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/23/08 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita J. Shumway.. (cib)
March 9, 2009 Filing 57 Transcript of Proceedings Oral Argument held on 10/3/08 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita J. Shumway.. (cib)
March 6, 2009 Filing 56 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on June 23, 2008 and October 3, 2008 before Judge Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway.. Filed by Candace Morgan, Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc., Cascade AIDS Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.. (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
March 5, 2009 Filing 55 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 10/3/08 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita J. Shumway. Filed by all plaintiffs. (cib)
February 17, 2009 Notification of (Candace Morgan, Planned Parenthood, et al) Notice of Appeal 54 sent to USCA for the 9th Circuit and to counsel along with a copy of the docket sheet. CADS mailed to Court of Appeals. (tomg)
February 17, 2009 Notification of Appeal (Plaintiffs') 52 sent to USCA for the 9th Circuit and to counsel along with a copy of the docket sheet. (CADS mailed to Court of Appeals). (tomg)
February 4, 2009 USCA Appeal Fees re (Candace Morgan, Planned Parenthood, et al) Notice of Appeal 54 : Received Fee in amount of $ 455.00. Receipt number 25200 issued. (tomg)
February 4, 2009 USCA Appeal Fees re (Plaintiffs') Notice of Appeal 52 : Received Fee in amount of $ 455.00. Receipt number 25199 issued. (tomg)
February 4, 2009 Filing 54 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit from Judgment,, 51 . Filed by Candace Morgan, Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc., Cascade AIDS Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.. (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
February 4, 2009 Filing 53 Order. Plaintiff's books as exhibits for the motion for preliminary injunction and the motion for permanent injunction, returned to counsel. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
February 3, 2009 Filing 52 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit of Plaintiffs Powells Books, Inc.; Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd. d/b/a Annie Blooms Books; Dark Horse Comics, Inc.; Colettes: Good Food + Hungry Minds LLC; Bluejay, Inc. d/b/a Paulina Springs Books; St. Johns Booksellers LLC; American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression; Association of American Publishers, Inc.; Freedom to Read Foundation Inc.; and Comic Book Legal Defense Fund. Filed by American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression. (Bamberger, Michael)
January 6, 2009 Filing 51 Judgment. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED as follows:(1) ORS 167.054 and 167.057, as interpreted by the court in its Opinion and Order, are not substantially overbroad under the First and Fourteenth Amendments to the United States Constitution; (2) ORS 167.054 and 167.057, as interpreted by the court in its Opinion and Order, are not unconstitutionally vague under the Fifth and Fourteenth Amendments to the United StatesConstitution; (3) ORS 167.054 and 167.057, as interpreted by the court in its Opinion and Order, are not facially invalid; (4) Plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed with prejudice, plaintiffs taking nothing thereby. Signed on 1/6/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 19, 2008 Filing 50 Proposed Form of Order Submitted (titled Judgment). Filed by all defendants. (Casper, Michael)
December 12, 2008 Filing 49 Record of Order by Michael W. Mosman. Defendant's to prepare the judgment for signature by 12/19/2008. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER: Based on the foregoing, Powell's Books's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Declaration of Unconstitutionality 36 is DENIED. Signed on 12/12/08 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
October 24, 2008 Filing 47 Record Order by Michael W. Mosman. On the court's motion order extending pretrial deadlines. Discovery is to be completed by 1/22/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/23/2009. Pretrial Order is due by 2/23/2009. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
October 3, 2008 Filing 46 MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Permanent Injunction and Declaration of Unconstitutionality, # 36 . Motion is taken under advisement as of 10/3/2008. P.K. Runkles-Pearson, Michael Bamberger present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Michael Casper, Katherine Geoges present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Michael W. Mosman presiding. (Related document(s): Motion for Permanent Injunction 36 .) (da)
September 12, 2008 Filing 45 Reply in Support of to Motion for Permanent Injunction and Declaration of Unconstitutionality 36 Oral Argument requested. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
August 29, 2008 Filing 44 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Permanent Injunction to Motion for Permanent Injunction and Declaration of Unconstitutionality 36 . Filed by all defendants. (Casper, Michael)
August 8, 2008 Filing 43 Supplemental Declaration of Christopher Finan. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Permanent Injunction 36 .) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A# 2 Attachment B) (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: GRATNING Motion for Extension of Time 41 . Supplemental Brief is due by 8/8/2008. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
July 31, 2008 Filing 41 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Supporting Material. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
July 31, 2008 Filing 40 Declaration of DR. MARK NICHOLS in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Declaration of Unconstitutionality and Permanent Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Permanent Injunction 36 .) (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
July 31, 2008 Filing 39 Declaration of CAMELIA HISON in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Declaration of Unconstitutionality and Permanent Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Permanent Injunction 36 .) (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
July 31, 2008 Filing 38 Declaration of DR. RICHARD S. COLMAN in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Declaration of Unconstitutionality and Permanent Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Permanent Injunction 36 .) (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
July 31, 2008 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support of Request for Declaration of Unconstitutionality and Permanent Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Permanent Injunction 36 .) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B) (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
July 31, 2008 Filing 36 Motion for Permanent Injunction and Declaration of Unconstitutionality. ORAL ARGUMENT requested. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
July 7, 2008 Filing 35 Answer to Amended Complaint. Filed by Hardy Myers, Matt Shirtcliff, John Haroldson, John Foote, Joshua Marquis, Steve Atchison, Paul Frasier, Gary Williams, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, Jack Banta, Marion Weatherford, Ryan Joslin, Tim Colahan, John Sewell, Mark Huddleston, Peter L. Deuel, Stephen D. Campbell, Edwin I. Caleb, David A. Schutt, Douglass Harcleroad, Bernice Barnett, Jason Carlile, Dan Norris, Walter M. Beglau, Elizabeth Ballard, Michael D. Schrunk, John Fisher, Wade D. McLeod, William Bryan Porter, Dean Gushwa, Tim Thompson, Daniel Ousley, Eric J. Nisley, Robert Hermann, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Brad Berry. (Georges, Katherine)
June 23, 2008 Filing 34 MINUTES of Proceedings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Order DENYING Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 as stated on the record. Order SETTING Permanent Injunction Hearing for 10/3/2008 at 10:00AM in Portland before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Plaintiffs' brief is due 7/31/2008. Defendants' response is due 8/29/2008. Plaintiffs' reply is due 9/12/2008. Michael Bamberger and P.K. Runkles-Pearson present as counsel for plaintiffs. Katherine Georges and Michael Casper present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Michael W. Mosman presiding. (mjp)
June 16, 2008 Filing 33 Declaration of Andrea Meyer in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion 32 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B) (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
June 16, 2008 Filing 32 Reply in Support to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 . Filed by all plaintiffs. (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
June 5, 2008 Filing 31 Amended Declaration of Allan R. Adler (amended to add missing page 3 only). Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 .) (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
June 2, 2008 Filing 30 Declaration of Michael A. Casper. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition 29 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6) (Casper, Michael)
June 2, 2008 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 . Filed by all defendants. (Casper, Michael)
May 16, 2008 Filing 28 Acknowledgement of Service of Amended Complaint,, 27 (titled Acceptance of Service) Filed by all defendants. (Casper, Michael)
May 14, 2008 Filing 27 Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief.Filed by Bluejay, Inc., St. Johns Booksellers, LLC, Twenty-Third Avenue Books, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Candace Morgan, Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc., Powell's Books, Inc., Cascade AIDS Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Colette's: Good Food + Hungry Minds, LLC against all defendants. (Runkles-Pearson, P.K.)
May 12, 2008 Filing 26 Scheduling Order by Michael W. Mosman. Oral Argument is set for 6/23/2008 at 10:00AM in Portland before Judge Michael W. Mosman, for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (#2). Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time 22 . Response is due by 6/2/2008; Reply is due by 6/16/2008, for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
May 8, 2008 Filing 24 Notice of Association of Attorney.Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
May 6, 2008 Filing 23 Affidavit of Michael A. Casper in Support of Motion. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 22 .) (Casper, Michael)
May 6, 2008 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (titled Unopposed Motion to Extend and Adopt Briefing Schedule). Filed by all defendants. (Casper, Michael)
May 5, 2008 Filing 21 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Bamberger for St. Johns Booksellers, LLC and Twenty-Third Avenue Books. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 20946 issued. Signed on 4/29/08 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib)
May 5, 2008 Filing 20 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel G. Balaban for St. Johns Booksellers, LLC and Twenty-Third Avenue Books. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 20947 issued. Signed on 4/29/08 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib)
April 25, 2008 Filing 19 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to the Honorable Michael W. Mosman. Discovery is to be completed by 8/25/2008. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/22/2008. Pretrial Order is due by 9/22/2008. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 18 Declaration of Brad Smith. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 17 Declaration of Solena Rawdah. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 16 Declaration of Stephanie Griffin. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 15 Declaration of Christopher Finan. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 14 Declaration of Allan R. Adler. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 13 Declaration of Judith Krug. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 12 Declaration of Charles Brownstein. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 11 Declaration of Candace Morgan. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 10 Declaration of David Greenberg. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 9 Declaration of Rebecca Harmon. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 8 Declaration of David Findanque. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 7 Declaration of Michael Powell. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 6 Declaration of William Peters. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 5 Declaration of Ken Lizzi. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 4 Declaration of Jessica L. Lloyd-Rogers. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 3 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (eo)
April 25, 2008 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 20943 issued. Summons issued as to Robert Hermann, Brad Berry, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Eric J. Nisley, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Wade M. McLeod, John Fisher, Michael D. Schrunk, Elizabeth Ballard, Walter M. Beglau, Dan Norris, Bernice Barnett, F. Douglass Harcleroad, David A. Schutt, John Haroldson, John Foote, Joshua Marquis, Steve Atchison, Paul Frasier, Gary Williams, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, Jack Banta, Marion Weatherford, Ryan Joslin, Tim Colahan, John Sewell, Mark Huddleston, Peter L. Deuel, Stephen D. Campbell, Edwin I. Caleb, Matt Shirtcliff, and Hardy Myers. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by St. Johns Booksellers, LLC, Twenty-Third Avenue Books, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc., Powell's Books, Inc., Cascade AIDS Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Colette's: Good Food + Hungry Minds, LLC against all defendants. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell's Books, Inc. et al v. Myers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powell's Books, Inc.
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd.
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dark Horse Comics, Inc.
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colette's: Good Food + Hungry Minds, LLC
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluejay, Inc.
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Johns Booksellers, LLC
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twenty-Third Avenue Books
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Publishers, Inc.
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom to Read Foundation Inc.
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comic Book Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Morgan
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc.
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade AIDS Project
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.
Represented By: P.K. Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardy Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Shirtcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haroldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Marquis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Atchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Dial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Banta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Joslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Colahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter L. Deuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin I. Caleb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Schutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglass Harcleroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Carlile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter M. Beglau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Schrunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade D. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bryan Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Gushwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ousley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J. Nisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Cutsforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?