Merrihew et al v. MML Investor Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Carney, Mary Denson, Edward Reinstein, Karen Van Raden, Karl C. Hallstrom, William Galbraith, Duane Denson, Rebecca Van Raden, Richard Holland, Jane and John Does 1-20, Joanne Casey, Michael Benner, Karla Van Raden, Edward Kuhn, Sara Genta, Dr. John Takacs, Mary Heintz, Laura Casey, Jay McAchran, Genene Helmberger, Ryan McKillop, Kristin Merrihew, Paul Naumann, Tim Merrihew, Bruce Svela, Wayne Van Raden, Gladys Christie, David Christie, Paula Runyan, Ed Casey, Jane Heintz-Svela, Susan Holland, Marguerite Morin, Debbie Holland, Larry Hittle, Jenny Naumann, Dave Carney, Suzanne Benner, Herb McKillop, Donald Dezarn, Diane Kuhn, Patrick Casey, Mike Holland, Don Fast, Richard Helmberger, Tim McAchran, Blake Souvignier, Linda Merrihew and Chad McKillop
Defendant: American Express Financial Advisors, Inc., Umpqua Bank, David P. Grau, Holmes and Company, LLP, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Business Transactions, LLC, Bank of Oswego, Anne Rhodes, Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, National Association, Inc., Washington Mutual Bank, Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC, Bidwell and Company, MML Investor Services, Inc., KBNP Radio, Inc., William Holmes, Businesstransactions.Com, John T. Carr, John Does 21-40, Carr & Schwartz, LLP, West Coast Bank, Private Counsulting Group, Inc., Carr & Schwartz, LLC, Ameritrade Northwest, Inc., Charles Schwab and Company, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, Wel Group, Inc. and Attorney David P. Grau
Case Number: 3:2008cv01223
Filed: October 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland Office
County: Multnomah
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: FINDING AS MOOT Motion for Clarification of February 27, 2009 Order Motion Hearing Held(#77), #78 , see Order of Dismissal (#79). Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order of Dismissal. See order for full text. Signed on 3/4/09 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
March 4, 2009 Filing 78 Motion for Clarification of February 27, 2009 Order Motion Hearing Held,, 77 . Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Daniels, Brad)
February 26, 2009 Filing 77 MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing Held. DENYING Motion to Remand to State Court #24 , DENYING AS MOOT Motion for Joinder #39 , GRANTING Motion to Dismiss #36 , as stated on the record. DENYING AS MOOT Motion to Dismiss #10 . James E Shadduck and Christopher Best present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brad Daniels, Tanya A Durkee, Bergitta K Trelstad, and Curt Roy Hineline present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Grube. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (Related document(s): Motion for Joinder #39 , Motion to Dismiss #10 , Motion to Remand to State Court #24 , Motion to Dismiss #36 .) (dls)
February 26, 2009 Filing 76 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Richard A. Uffelman is substituted as counsel of record.Filed by Bank of Oswego. (Uffelman, Richard)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines #72 . Discovery is extended from 2/17/09, to be completed by 8/17/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is extended from 3/19/09, due by 9/15/2009. Pretrial Order is extended from 3/19/09, due by 9/15/2009. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion to Remand Case to State Court #24 , Motion for Joinder #39 . Oral Argument is set for 2/26/2009 at 02:00PM in Portland before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
February 19, 2009 Filing 73 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal:.Filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Row, Seth)
February 19, 2009 Filing 72 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Best, Christopher)
January 14, 2009 Filing 71 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Bergitta K. Trelstad is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Mark J. Phelps.Filed by Washington Mutual Bank. (Phelps, Mark)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Record of Order. Ameritrade-Bidwell Defendants' filed their sur-reply (#68). Order STRIKING the deadline of 12/11/08 for filing the sur-reply. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #65 . Sur-Reply due 12/11/08. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 4, 2008 Filing 68 Reply in Support of Ameritrade-Bidwell Defendants' to Motion to Dismiss #36 . Filed by Ameritrade Northwest, Inc.. (Ellis, Barnes)
December 3, 2008 Filing 67 Declaration of Nathan Goforth. Filed by Ameritrade Northwest, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave #65 .) (Ellis, Barnes)
December 3, 2008 Filing 66 Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Filed by Ameritrade Northwest, Inc.. (Ellis, Barnes)
December 3, 2008 Filing 65 Motion for Leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Filed by Ameritrade Northwest, Inc.. (Ellis, Barnes)
November 24, 2008 Filing 63 Exhibits Plaintiffs' Exhibit E re Response in Opposition to Motion #54 . Filed by all plaintiffs. (Best, Christopher)
November 24, 2008 Filing 62 Reply to Defendents Joint Response to Motion to Remand Case to State Court #24 . Filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Best, Christopher)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Joinder of Notice of removal By Defendants Ameritrade Northwest, inc., Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC, and Bidwell and Company #49 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #59 . Plaintiffs' deadline for a response to Umpqua Bank's Motion to Dismiss (#10) is extended to 20 days after the court's decision on the Motion to Remand Case to State Court (#24). Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 21, 2008 Filing 59 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Best, Christopher)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order. GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Bidwell and Company. (Ellis, Barnes) (#12), the deadline for an answer is extended to 20 days after the court's decision on the Motion to Remand Case to State Court (#24). Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART #56 , the deadline for an answer is extended to 20 days after the court's decision on the Motion to Remand Case to State Court (#24). The following defendant's joined in the motion: MML Investor Services, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Co., Charles Schwab & Co., Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. f/k/a American Express Financial Advisors, Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, Private Consulting Group, Inc., Bank of Oswego, Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, WaMu (now JP Morgan Cahse Bank, N.A.), West Coast Bank, KBNP Radio, John T. Carr, Carr & Schwartz, LLC, Carr & Schwartz, LLP, David P. Grau, Attorney David P. Grau, PC, Business Transactions, LLC d/b/a Businesstransactions.com, and WEL Group, Inc. This makes the following motions moot: #1, #2, #7, #8, #9, #12, #13, #15, #17, #19, #21, #28, #31, #44, #45, and #48. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
November 19, 2008 Filing 56 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer TO RESPOND. Filed by MML Investor Services, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Hines, Stephanie)
November 19, 2008 Filing 55 Certificate of Service by Tim Merrihew of Response in Opposition to Motion #54 Filed by Tim Merrihew. (Best, Christopher)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David L. Stanton for Charles Schwab and Company, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 23980 issued. Signed on 11/18/08 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib)
November 18, 2008 Filing 54 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #36 Oral Argument requested. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D) (Best, Christopher)
November 13, 2008 Filing 53 Declaration of Stephanie Hines in Support of Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #51 .) (Ellis, Barnes)
November 13, 2008 Filing 52 Supplement Affidavit of Barnes H. Ellis in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Related document(s): Notice #6 .) (Ellis, Barnes)
November 13, 2008 Filing 51 Joint Reply to Motion to Remand Case to State Court #24 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Ellis, Barnes)
November 13, 2008 Filing 50 Affidavit of Dudley W. Gaouette in Support of Motion Notice of Filing for Joinder of Notice of Removal. Filed by Bank of Oswego. (Related document(s): Motion for Joinder #49 .) (Gaouette, Dudley)
November 13, 2008 Filing 49 Motion for Joinder of Notice of removal By Defendants Ameritrade Northwest, inc., Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC, and Bidwell and Company. Filed by Bank of Oswego. (Gaouette, Dudley)
November 10, 2008 Filing 48 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by Washington Mutual Bank. (Phelps, Mark)
November 10, 2008 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance for JPMorgan Chase Bank.Filed by Washington Mutual Bank. (Phelps, Mark)
November 10, 2008 Filing 46 JPMorgan Chase Bank's Corporate Disclosure Statement.Filed by Washington Mutual Bank. (Phelps, Mark) Modified on 11/12/2008 (Brost, Colleen).
November 6, 2008 Filing 45 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Angius, Christopher)
November 6, 2008 Filing 44 Notice re Motion for Extension of Time #1 Withdrawal of Motion.Filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #1 .) (Angius, Christopher)
November 6, 2008 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by West Coast Bank. (Shepherd, Kerry)
November 5, 2008 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Angius, Christopher)
November 4, 2008 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Ellis, Barnes)
November 4, 2008 Filing 40 Memorandum in Support of Ameritrade-Bidwell Defendants' Motion to Require Joinder of Necessary Parties. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Joinder #39 .) (Ellis, Barnes)
November 4, 2008 Filing 39 Motion for Joinder. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Ellis, Barnes)
November 4, 2008 Filing 38 Affidavit of Barnes H. Ellis in Support of Motion To Dismiss. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #36 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit Exhibit 8) (Ellis, Barnes)
November 4, 2008 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support of Ameritrade-Bidwell Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #36 .) (Ellis, Barnes)
November 4, 2008 Filing 36 Motion to Dismiss. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Ellis, Barnes)
November 4, 2008 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Private Counsulting Group, Inc.. (Larsen, Janet)
November 4, 2008 Filing 34 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Garr M. King to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
November 3, 2008 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by KBNP Radio, Inc.. (Vacura, Julie)
November 3, 2008 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by American Express Financial Advisors, Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
October 31, 2008 Filing 31 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by Private Counsulting Group, Inc.. (Larsen, Janet)
October 31, 2008 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance of Janet Knauss Larsen appearing on behalf of Private Counsulting Group, Inc..Filed by on behalf of Private Counsulting Group, Inc.. (Larsen, Janet)
October 31, 2008 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Wel Group, Inc.. (Hutchinson, Thomas)
October 30, 2008 Filing 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Filed by KBNP Radio, Inc.. (Vacura, Julie)
October 29, 2008 Filing 27 Certificate of Service by Tim Merrihew, Linda Merrihew of Notice of Dismissal of Party #25 Without Prejudice of Defendant Anne Rhodes, Only Filed by Tim Merrihew, Linda Merrihew. (Gatti, Daniel)
October 29, 2008 Filing 26 Certificate of Service by Tim Merrihew, Linda Merrihew of Motion to Remand Case to State Court #24 Filed by Tim Merrihew, Linda Merrihew. (Gatti, Daniel)
October 29, 2008 Filing 25 Notice of Dismissal of Party Without Prejudice of Defendant Anne Rhodes, Only.Filed by all plaintiffs. (Gatti, Daniel)
October 29, 2008 Filing 24 Motion to Remand Case to State Court. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit a; Not. Dismiss Anne Rhodes) (Gatti, Daniel)
October 28, 2008 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, National Association, Inc.. (Durkee, Tanya)
October 28, 2008 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by MML Investor Services, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Hines, Stephanie)
October 28, 2008 Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint). Filed by Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, National Association, Inc.. (Durkee, Tanya)
October 28, 2008 Filing 20 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: and Substitution of Attorney of Record.Filed by MML Investor Services, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Fortino, Paul)
October 28, 2008 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by John T. Carr, Carr & Schwartz, LLC(an Oregon limited liability company), Carr & Schwartz, LLP(a domestic registered limited liability partnership). (Watts, Susan)
October 27, 2008 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Umpqua Bank. (Eckert, C.)
October 27, 2008 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Filed by West Coast Bank. (Shepherd, Kerry)
October 27, 2008 Filing 16 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Garr M. King. (eo)
October 27, 2008 Filing 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Filed by American Express Financial Advisors, Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
October 27, 2008 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Charles Schwab and Company, Inc.. (Buchanan, Paul)
October 27, 2008 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Filed by Charles Schwab and Company, Inc.. (Buchanan, Paul)
October 27, 2008 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Bidwell and Company. (Ellis, Barnes)
October 27, 2008 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Umpqua Bank. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #10 .) (Eckert, C.)
October 27, 2008 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Umpqua Bank. (Eckert, C.)
October 27, 2008 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by Wel Group, Inc.. (Hutchinson, Thomas)
October 24, 2008 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Filed by Business Transactions, LLC. (Simmons, Ernest)
October 24, 2008 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Filed by MML Investor Services, Inc., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Baum, Richard)
October 23, 2008 Filing 6 Notice re Notice of Removal, #3 Consent to Removal.Filed by Charles Schwab and Company, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #3 .) (Buchanan, Paul)
October 22, 2008 Filing 2 Motion for Extension of Time to Appear. Filed by David P. Grau. (Mersereau, Peter)
October 22, 2008 Filing 1 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time In Which to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Angius, Christopher)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to the Honorable Anna J. Brown. Discovery is to be completed by 2/17/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/19/2009. Pretrial Order is due by 3/19/2009. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
October 20, 2008 Filing 4 Affidavit of Barnes H. Ellis in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Bidwell and Company, Ameritrade Northwest, Inc., Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #3 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit Exhibit 9#10 Exhibit Exhibit 10#11 Exhibit Exhibit 11#12 Exhibit Exhibit 12#13 Exhibit Exhibit 13#14 Exhibit Exhibit 14#15 Exhibit Exhibit 15#16 Exhibit Exhibit 16#17 Exhibit Exhibit 17#18 Exhibit Exhibit 18) (ecp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2015: #19 Original signature) (dnt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2015: #20 missing page) (dnt).
October 20, 2008 Filing 3 Notice of Removal of Case Number 0808-12503 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 23563 issued.Filed by Bidwell and Company, Ameritrade Northwest, Inc., Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 1#4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 2#5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 3#6 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 4#7 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 5#8 Exhibit Exhibit D) (ecp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2015: #9 Civil cover) (dnt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrihew et al v. MML Investor Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Financial Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Represented By: C. Marie Eckert
Represented By: Jeanne K. Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Grau
Represented By: Barrett C. Mersereau
Represented By: Peter R. Mersereau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holmes and Company, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC
Represented By: Seth H. Row
Represented By: Christopher W. Angius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Transactions, LLC
Represented By: Ernest J. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Oswego
Represented By: Dudley W. Gaouette
Represented By: Richard A. Uffelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, National Association, Inc.
Represented By: Julie M. Engbloom
Represented By: Tanya Durkee Urbach
Represented By: Lee C. Nusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Bergitta K Trelstad
Represented By: Mark J. Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameritrade Advisory Services, LLC
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Barnes H. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bidwell and Company
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Barnes H. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MML Investor Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul T. Fortino
Represented By: Nicholle Y. Winters
Represented By: Richard L. Baum
Represented By: Stephanie K. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBNP Radio, Inc.
Represented By: William L. Larkins, Jr.
Represented By: Julie R. Vacura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Businesstransactions.Com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Carr
Represented By: Daniel L. Keppler
Represented By: Susan E. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 21-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carr & Schwartz, LLP
Represented By: Daniel L. Keppler
Represented By: Susan E. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Bank
Represented By: Kerry J. Shepherd
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Counsulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Janet Knauss Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carr & Schwartz, LLC
Represented By: Daniel L. Keppler
Represented By: Susan E. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameritrade Northwest, Inc.
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Barnes H. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab and Company, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Buchanan
Represented By: David L. Stanton
Represented By: Courtney Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul T. Fortino
Represented By: Nicholle Y. Winters
Represented By: Richard L. Baum
Represented By: Stephanie K. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wel Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Wilson
Represented By: Thomas L. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney David P. Grau
Represented By: Peter R. Mersereau
Represented By: Barrett C. Mersereau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Carney
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Denson
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Reinstein
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Van Raden
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl C. Hallstrom
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Galbraith
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Denson
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Van Raden
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Holland
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane and John Does 1-20
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Casey
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Benner
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Van Raden
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Kuhn
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Genta
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. John Takacs
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Heintz
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Casey
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay McAchran
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genene Helmberger
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan McKillop
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Merrihew
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Naumann
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Merrihew
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Svela
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Van Raden
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Christie
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Christie
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Runyan
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Casey
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Heintz-Svela
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Holland
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Morin
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Holland
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Hittle
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Naumann
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Carney
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Benner
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb McKillop
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dezarn
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Kuhn
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Casey
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Holland
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Fast
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Helmberger
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim McAchran
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Souvignier
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Merrihew
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad McKillop
Represented By: Christopher R. Best
Represented By: James E. Shadduck
Represented By: Daniel Jon Gatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?