Chung v. Strategic Decisions Group
Plaintiff: Laura Chung
Defendant: Strategic Decisions Group
Case Number: 3:2008cv01480
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Multnomah
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 33 ; and Adopting Findings and Recommendation 55 . Signed on 1/4/10 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (mkk)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Findings & Recommendation: Motion for Summary Judgment 33 should be granted. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 12/14/2009. Signed on 11/25/2009 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation, # 23 , and Granting Motion to Dismiss, # 6 , and Granting Motion to Strike, # 18 . Signed on 4/23/2009 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (da)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Strike Declaration of Laura Chung in Support of Her Response in Opposition to Motion 13 18 should be granted, and Motion to Dismiss 6 should be granted without prejudice and plaintiff should be allowed leave to amend to allege that she applied for a position as an employee. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 4/20/2009. Signed on 4/3/2909 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chung v. Strategic Decisions Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Chung
Represented By: Glenn N. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Decisions Group
Represented By: Carter M. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?