Young v. Intel Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Matthew Robert Young
Defendant: Intel Corporation and Steve Jobs
Case Number: 3:2008cv01496
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Malheur
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit dismissing Appeal re Notice of Appeal 22 . (ljl)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notification from USCA 9th Circuit of appeal number CA 09-35790 for Notice of Appeal 22 filed by Matthew Robert young on 8/27/09, including Time Schedule Order. (tomg)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Court of Appeals notified re: Notice of Appeal 22 . Copy of notice and docket sheet mailed to appellant. (tomg)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit from Judgment 21 . Filed by Matthew Robert Young. (ljl)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Court's Order # 20 , This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed on July 29, 2009 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (kt)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on July 29, 2009 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (kt)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Amended Complaint.Filed by Matthew Robert Young against Intel Corporation. (ljl)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Amended Complaint.Filed by Matthew Robert Young against Intel Corporation, Steve Jobs. (Plaintiff lists Steve Jobs as a Third Party Defendant on his Amended Complaint.) (ecp)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MANDATE from USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 09-35164 10 . (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order) (tomg)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. On 5/6/2009 the Court issued an Order directing Plaintiff to file his amended complaint by 6/12/2009. On 5/7/2009 the Court received Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 14 seeking until 6/21/2009 to file his amended complaint. In the exercise of discretion, the Court grants Plaintiff until 6/30/2009 to file his Amended Complaint subject to the same conditions as set forth in the Court's Order of 5/6/2009. (sm)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Matthew Robert Young. (ljl)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Matthew Robert Young. (pvh)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court acknowledges receipt of an Order from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals dismissing Plaintiff's appeal in this matter. This Court previously set a deadline of 5/11/2009 for the filing of an Amended Complaint to cure the deficiencies as set out in the Opinion and Order of 1/12/2009. Because plaintiff may have deferred the filing of such amended complaint due to his appeal, the Court is extending the deadline for the filing of the amended complaint until 6/12/2009. Failure to file the amended complaint as now ordered shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (sm)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit dismissing Appeal CA 09-35164 10 : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (tomg)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notification from USCA 9th Circuit of appeal number CA 09-35164 for Notice of Appeal 10 filed by Matthew Robert Young on 2/18/09, including Time Schedule Order. (tomg)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Notification of Appeal 10 sent to USCA for the 9th Circuit and to counsel along with a copy of the docket sheet. (tomg)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit from Order on motion to recuse 7 , entered on 2/2/2009 Filing fee in amount of $ 455 collected. No fee collected. IFP granted on 1/13/2009 5 . Filed by Matthew Robert Young. (ecp)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 8 . Plaintiff's Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 5/11/2009, or this matter will be dismissed on that date pursuant to the Court's Opinion and Order issued 1/13/2009. (sm)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Matthew Robert Young. (ljl)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Denying Motion to Recuse 6 . (see 3 page Order).(copy of order sent to Plaintiff). Signed on 1/29/09 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (ljl)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to Recuse. Filed by Matthew Robert Young. (ecp)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Opinion and Order - The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 1 and DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice.Plaintiff may file an amended complaint to cure the deficiencies noted above no later than February 12, 2009. The Court advises Plaintiff that failure to file an amended complaint by February 12, 2009, shall result in the dismissal ofthis proceeding with prejudice. Signed on 1/12/2009 by Judge Anna J. Brown.(See formal Opinion and Order, 9-pages) (ecp)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Declaration and Affidavit of Mailing. Filed by Matthew Robert Young. (ecp)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes.Filed by Matthew Robert Young against Intel Corporation, Steve Jobs. (ecp)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Matthew Robert Young. (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Intel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Robert Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Jobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?