Latif et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Mashaal Rana, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Adama Bah, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Stephen Durga Persaud, Amir Meshal, Halime Sat, Abdullatif Muthanna, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Steven William Washburn, Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed, Salah Ali Ahmed, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Saleh A. Omar and Steven Washburn
Defendant: Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice and Federal Bureau of Investigation
Amicus Curiae: The Constitution Project
Case Number: 3:2010cv00750
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 376 MANDATE Issued regarding ( #375 USCA Opinion for the 9th Circuit, USCA #17-35634, re Notice of Appeal #362 . The decision of the District Court is: AFFIRMED. (jtj)
October 21, 2019 Filing 375 USCA Opinion for the 9th Circuit, USCA #17-35634, re Notice of Appeal #362 . The decision of the District Court is: AFFIRMED. (Attachments: #1 Post Judgment Form) (jtj)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal #362 . The government's unopposed motion to extend time to file an opposition to the plaintiffs' motion to seal, filed August 21, 2019 (Dkt. 76), is GRANTED. Any opposition shall be filed on or before September 9, 2019. (jtj)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal #362 . Appellants' motion to file document under seal and submit sealed document, filed August 9, 2019 (Dkt. #70 ), is GRANTED. Appellants' motion to file motion for extension of time under seal, filed August 9, 2019 (Dkt #71 ), is GRANTED. Appellants' motion for an extension of time to respond to the court's August 2, 2019 order, filed August 9, 2019 (Dkt. #72 ), is GRANTED. The deadline is extended to August 16, 2019. (jtj)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal #362 . Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahman Kariye's unopposed motion to be dismissed from this appeal under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) (Dkt. 64) is GRANTED. This order constitutes the mandate as to Plaintiff-Appellant Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahman Kariye. (jtj)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal, #362 . The supplemental brief #55 submitted by appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. (jtj)
January 24, 2019 Filing 370 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Former Assistant United States Attorney James E. Cox, Jr. Filed by All Defendants. (Gowie, Renata)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal #362 . The government's January 16, 2019 motion (Docket Entry No. #53 ) to stay this courts January 15, 2019 order is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: 1. The January 15, 2019 order is stayed for 14 days from entry of this order or until Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice, whichever is the shorter. In the event such funding is not restored within 14 days from entry of this order, the government may request a further stay from this court. 2. Counsel for the government shall notify this court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice. At that point, all deadlines for the filing of supplemental briefing set forth in the January 15, 2019 order shall be extended commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. (jtj)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal, #362 . The parties are directed to submit supplemental briefs addressing the following issues: 1. Whether, in Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015), and Sessions v. Dimaya, 138 S. Ct. 1204 (2018), the Supreme Court overruled the principle that "[a] plaintiff who engages in some conduct that is clearly proscribed cannot complain of the vagueness of the law as applied to the conduct of others." Holder v. Humanitarian Law Project, 561 U.S. 1, 18-19 (2010) (quoting Hoffman Estates v. Flipside, Hoffman Estates, Inc., 455 U.S. 489, 495 (1982)). See Henry v. Spearman, 899 F.3d 703 (9th Cir. 2018), and Copeland v. Vance, 893 F.3d 101 (2d Cir. 2018); and 2. Whether the plaintiffs may challenge an unpublished government policy as void for vagueness under the Due Process Clause of the Fifth Amendment. See, e.g., Gilmore v. Gonzales, 435 F.3d 1125, 1135-36 (9th Cir. 2006). The government's supplemental brief shall be no longer than 12 pages or 3360 words and shall be filed no later than 21 days after the entry of this order. The appellants supplemental brief shall be no longer than 12 pages or 3360 words and shall be filed no later than 21 days after filing of the government's brief. Submission of this case is vacated effective the date of this order. (jtj)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal #362 . Appellees' unopposed motion (DE 24 ) to file an oversized answering brief of 1,363 additional words is granted. The unopposed motion (DE 24 ) to file the unredacted answering brief under seal is granted. The opposed motion (DE 24 ) to submit classified supplemental excerpts of record ex parte and in camera is granted, without prejudice to raising in the reply brief the issue of whether those documents should be considered by the merits panel. The Clerk shall publicly file the motion, and shall file the unredacted answering brief under seal. Appellees shall submit for public filing a redacted answering brief within 14 days after the date of this order. No paper copies of the redacted brief will be required. The classified supplemental excerpts will not be filed on the docket, but will be made available to the merits panel upon request. The optional reply brief remains due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. (jtj)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal #362 . The opening brief #13 submitted by Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV and Amir Meshal is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record #11 , #16 submitted by Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV and Amir Meshal. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. (jtj)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35634 re Notice of Appeal #362 . The appellants' motion (Docket Entry No. #10 ) to file the oversized opening brief submitted at Docket Entry No. #13 is granted. The appellants' unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. #12 ) to file Volume 4 of the excerpts of record under seal is granted. The Clerk shall publicly file the motion, the opening brief, and Volumes 1 through 3 of the excerpts of record, and shall file Volume 4 under seal. The answering brief is due within 30 days after the filing of the opening brief submitted at Docket Entry No. #13 . The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. (jtj)
September 22, 2017 Filing 364 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on March 17, 2014 before Judge Anna J. Brown, Court Reporter Amanda LeGore, telephone number 503-326-8184. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 9/29/2017. Redaction Request due 10/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2017. (LeGore, Amanda)
August 24, 2017 Filing 363 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 3/17/2014 before Judge Anna J. Brown. Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. regarding Notice of Appeal, #362 . Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. Transcript is due by 9/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Attachment List of Designated Transcripts) (Shamsi, Hina)
August 9, 2017 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #362 . Case Appealed to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 17-35634 assigned. (jtj)
August 7, 2017 Filing 362 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit Filing fee $505 collected; Agency Tracking ID 0979-5106446: . Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2017 Filing 361 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Catherine Wagner, Alan Schlosser, Julia Harumi Mass, and Mitchell Hurley Filed by All Plaintiffs (Shamsi, Hina)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' Consent Motion (#359 ) for an Order Setting the Deadline to Seek an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. In light of the complexity of this case, the numerous Plaintiffs, and the largely joint nature of the representation of the Plaintiffs, the Court finds good cause to address attorneys' fees in a comprehensive manner after final judgment as to all Plaintiffs and after all appeals are exhausted. Accordingly, to the extent that any Plaintiff(s) intend to seek an award of attorneys' fees, the Court directs such Plaintiffs to file a single, comprehensive motion for attorneys' fees no later than 30 days after the entry of final judgment as to all Plaintiffs and the exhaustion of all appeals. (jy)
June 28, 2017 Filing 359 Consent Motion for an Order Setting the Deadline to Seek an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina)
June 9, 2017 Filing 358 Final Judgment. Signed on 6/9/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
May 12, 2017 Filing 357 Joint Notice of Filing Proposed Form of Judgment Filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed Form of Judgment) (Powell, Amy)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 OPINION AND ORDER. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion #( #348 ) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, which the Court construes as a Motion for Summary Judgment, and DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion #( #352 ) for Leave to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery. The Court directs the parties to confer and to submit to the Court no later than May 12, 2017, a proposed form of judgment that summarizes the Court's disposition of all issues litigated to date and that separately identifies those as to which the Court concludes it lacks jurisdiction to proceed. After the Court enters its concluding judgment, the Court will then consider any petition(s) for attorneys' fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 4/21/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (pvh)
March 6, 2017 Filing 355 Response in Opposition to Motion for Discovery and/or Inspection Regarding Jurisdiction #352 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
March 6, 2017 Filing 354 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #348 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
February 10, 2017 Filing 353 Declaration of Hugh Handeyside . Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. (Related document(s): Motion For Discovery/Inspection #352 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
February 10, 2017 Filing 352 Motion for Discovery and/or Inspection Regarding Jurisdiction. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. (Shamsi, Hina)
February 10, 2017 Filing 351 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #348 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. (Shamsi, Hina)
January 18, 2017 Filing 350 Declaration of Timothy P. Groh in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #348 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
January 18, 2017 Filing 349 Supplemental Declaration of Deborah O. Moore in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #348 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
January 18, 2017 Filing 348 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Terrorist Screening Center, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
December 20, 2016 Filing 347 Stipulation re Scheduling,,,, 346 - Stipulations Regarding Jurisdiction by Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. Filed by Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court largely agrees with the parties' proposals in their Joint Status Report #345 . Accordingly, the Court orders as follows: The parties' joint statement of agreed facts as to this Court's ongoing jurisdiction is due no later than December 20, 2016. Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction and memorandum in support (which may not exceed 35 pages in length) are due no later than January 18, 2017. Plaintiffs' response memorandum (which may not exceed 35 pages in length) and anticipated jurisdictional discovery motion and memorandum in support (which may not exceed 10 pages in length) are due no later than February 13, 2017. Defendants' reply memorandum in support of the motion to dismiss (which may not exceed 20 pages) and response memorandum to Plaintiffs' jurisdictional discovery motion (which may not exceed 10 pages) are due no later than March 6, 2017. The Court directs the parties to ensure the pleadings related to Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs' anticipated jurisdiction discovery motion are filed separately in order to ensure a clear record. (rr)
December 12, 2016 Filing 345 Joint Status Report . Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal. (Shamsi, Hina)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court grants the joint request #343 of the parties for additional time to continue their conferral regarding jurisdictional issues, and the Court directs the parties to file no later than Noon on December 12, 2016, an updated Joint Status Report with a proposed schedule for next steps to move this matter forward. (bb)
November 29, 2016 Filing 343 Joint Status Report . Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court GRANTS the parties' request to file a supplemental status report on or before 11/29/16. (bb)
November 15, 2016 Filing 341 Joint Status Report . Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 25, 2016 Filing 340 Joint Status Report . Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. (Shamsi, Hina)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Motion for Extension of Time #338 . Joint Status Report to include a proposed briefing schedule to address the Court's jurisdiction to adjudicate Plaintiffs' remaining claims is now due 10/25/16. (bb)
October 19, 2016 Filing 338 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. (Shamsi, Hina)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Order - Based on the Court's Opinion and Order #321 and this Order, the Court now GRANTS Defendants' Cross-Motions #241 , #242 , #247 , #248 , #249 , #250 for Partial Summary Judgment regarding individual Plaintiffs and DENIES Plaintiffs' individual Renewed Motions #210 , #212 , #214 , #216 , #218 , #220 for Partial Summary Judgment. Consistent with the Court's March 28, 2016, Order #321 , the Court directs the parties to submit a single, joint status report no later than October 20, 2016, with a proposed expedited briefing schedule for the Court to consider Defendants' argument that the revisions in the DHS TRIP procedures "effectively abrogate the Ninth Circuit's holdings that this Court has jurisdiction to continue to adjudicate Plaintiffs' remaining claims." Opinion and Order #321 at 61-62; Latif, 2016 WL 1239925, at *20. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 10/6/2016 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
September 23, 2016 Filing 336 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Alexandra Smith Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal (Shamsi, Hina)
August 29, 2016 Filing 335 Notice of Lodging Ex Parte, In Camera Materials Filed by All Defendants (Powell, Amy)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Notwithstanding Plaintiffs' Opposition #333 , which the Court has fully considered, the Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion #331 for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Materials. Defendants' supplemental memorandum is due no later than August 29, 2016. The Court is unable to provide any additional explanation on the record. (bb)
July 25, 2016 Filing 333 Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to file supplemental submission #331 . Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. (Shamsi, Hina)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court notes Plaintiffs seek to file a response to Defendants' Motion #331 for Extension of Time. The Court directs Plaintiffs to file their response no later than July 25, 2016, at which time the Court will take Defendants' Motion under advisement. (bb)
July 19, 2016 Filing 331 Motion for Extension of Time to file supplemental submission. Filed by All Defendants. (Singer, Samuel)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court makes this record to give notice to Plaintiffs that the Court has by separate Ex Parte Order filed with the Classified Information Security Officer directed Defendants to make a supplemental filing, ex parte and under seal if necessary, no later than August 1, 2016, regarding the materials referenced in Defendants' Notice #328 of Lodging Ex Parte, In Camera Materials. After the Court considers that filing, the Court will determine whether the record is then sufficient for the Court to resolve the parties' pending cross-motions and will inform the parties accordingly. (bb)
May 26, 2016 Filing 329 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Second Supplemental Memorandum. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud. (Shamsi, Hina)
May 5, 2016 Filing 328 Notice of Lodging Ex Parte, In Camera Materials Filed by All Defendants (Bowen, Brigham)
May 5, 2016 Filing 327 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Steinbach) (Bowen, Brigham)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion (#325) for an Extension of Time to File Supplemental Materials. No later than 5/05/2016, the Court directs Defendants to submit to the Court as to each Plaintiff the following: (1) a summary of any material information (including material exculpatory or inculpatory information) that Defendants withheld from the notice letters sent to each Plaintiff and (2) an explanation of the justification for withholding that information, including why Defendants could not make additional disclosures. Plaintiffs' response due no later than 5/26/2016. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (dls)
April 29, 2016 Filing 325 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Materials. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
April 12, 2016 Filing 324 Notice of the Death of a Party Filed by Steven William Washburn (Shamsi, Hina)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Motion for Extension of Time #322 to File Supplemental Materials. No later than 5/02/2016, the Court directs Defendants to submit to the Court as to each Plaintiff the following: (1) a summary of any material information (including material exculpatory or inculpatory information) that Defendants withheld from the notice letters sent to each Plaintiff and (2) an explanation of the justification for withholding that information, including why Defendants could not make additional disclosures. Plaintiffs' response due no later than 5/23/2016. (bb)
April 8, 2016 Filing 322 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Materials. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants Combined Cross-Motion #251 for Partial Summary Judgment; DENIES Plaintiffs Renewed Combined Motion #206 for Partial Summary Judgment; and DEFERS RULING on Defendants Cross-Motions (#241, #242, #247, #248, #249, #250) for Partial Summary Judgment regarding individual Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs individual Renewed Motions (#210, #212, #214, #216, #218, #220) for Partial Summary Judgment until Defendants supplement the record with sufficient information to rule on the individual cross-motions. No later than 4/18/2016, the Court directs Defendants to submit to the Court as to each Plaintiff the following: (1) a summary of any material information (including material exculpatory or inculpatory information) that Defendants withheld from the notice letters sent to each Plaintiff and (2) an explanation of the justification for withholding that information, including why Defendants could not make additional disclosures. Plaintiffs' response due no later than 5/9/2016. Signed on 03/28/2016 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 62 page Opinion and Order for full text. (bb)
January 8, 2016 Filing 320 Supplement in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shamsi, Hina)
January 8, 2016 Filing 319 Supplement Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
January 7, 2016 Filing 318 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on December 9, 2015 before Judge Anna J. Brown, Court Reporter Amanda LeGore, telephone number 503-326-8184. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 1/19/2016. Redaction Request due 2/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2016. (LeGore, Amanda)
December 18, 2015 Filing 317 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Joel P. Leonard is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Justine Fischer Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud (Leonard, Joel)
December 9, 2015 Filing 316 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument heard on all pending motions. Motion for Partial Closure of Oral Argument hearing #313 denied as moot. Court directed the parties to each file, no later than 1/8/2016, a supplemental memorandum (not to exceed 10 pages not including the caption) that is limited to specifying how the parties expect a judicial review on the substantive decision made by the TSA Administrator to occur, in what forum, and in what context. The Court further directed the parties to advise the Court of their proposals for next steps in this action in the event the Court grants any party's motion in whole or in part. Hina Shamsi, Ahilan Arulanantham, Hugh Handyside, William Genego present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brigham Bowen, Amy Powell present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion #313 for Partial Closure of Oral Argument and hereby advises counsel the Court will take argument on this Motion as the first order of business on 12/9/15. (bb)
December 4, 2015 Filing 314 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Partial Closure of Oral Argument Hearing #313 . Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
December 2, 2015 Filing 313 Motion for Partial Closure of Oral Argument Hearing. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
October 26, 2015 Filing 312 Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shamsi, Hina)
October 19, 2015 Filing 311 Redacted Reply re: Persaud (redacted public version) to Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Persaud #248 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 310 Reply re: Persaud (filed under seal) to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Persaud #244 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 309 Redacted Reply re: Knaeble (redacted public version) to Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Knaeble #250 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 308 Reply re: Knaeble (filed under seal) to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Knaeble #246 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 307 Reply re: Kariye to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kariye #241 . Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
October 19, 2015 Filing 306 Reply re: Meshal (redacted public version) to Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Meshal #247 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 305 Reply re: Meshal (filed under seal) to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Meshal #243 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 304 Reply re: All Plaintiffs to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition (All Plaintiffs) #251 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of EAD John Giacalone) (Powell, Amy)
October 19, 2015 Filing 303 Reply re: Washburn (redacted public version) to Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Washburn #249 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 302 Reply re: Washburn (filed under seal) to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Washburn #245 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 301 Reply re: Kashem (redacted public version) to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kashem #242 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 19, 2015 Filing 300 Reply re: Kashem (filed under seal) to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kashem #242 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Consent Motion #298 for Extension of Time and to File Excess Pages. Defendants' reply memoranda must be filed no later than October 19, 2015. Defendants' combined reply memorandum must not exceed 45 pages. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm)
October 13, 2015 Filing 298 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Summary Judgment Memoranda, Consent Motion to File Excess Pages . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Oral Argument on pending motions is SET for 12/09/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion #294 for Extension of Time to File Reply Memoranda in Support of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. As noted in its Order 258 granting in part Plaintiff's Motion #255 to Revise Case Management Schedule, the Court anticipated the possibility that Defendants would require additional time to respond to Plaintiffs' proffered expert testimony. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' alternative request for leave to file surreply memoranda before oral argument with leave to renew at oral argument. If after the benefit of oral argument the Court determines supplemental briefing will be helpful, the Court will provide the parties with an opportunity to do so at that time. Accordingly, Defendants must file their Reply Memoranda in Support of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment no later than October 14, 2015. The Court STRIKES the oral argument currently scheduled for October 19, 2015. The Clerk will contact the parties at a later date to re-schedule a firm date for oral argument. (bb)
September 15, 2015 Filing 295 Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memoranda in Support of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment #294 . Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
September 14, 2015 Filing 294 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memoranda in Support of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER: The Court concurs with and, therefore, grants the parties' Consent Motion #292 to Unseal Documents and directs the Clerk to unseal in full the documents identified in the Motion. (bb)
August 26, 2015 Filing 292 Consent Motion to Unseal Documents and Information Relevant to Plaintiff Kariye. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye. (Wagner, Catherine)
August 10, 2015 Filing 291 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Jennifer Pasquarella Filed by Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed, Salah Ali Ahmed, Adama Bah, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Saleh A. Omar, Mashaal Rana, Halime Sat, Steven William Washburn (Wilker, Steven)
August 10, 2015 Filing 290 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Catherine A. Wagner (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: cawagner. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Catherine A. Wagner for all Plaintiffs except Plaintiff Stephen Persaud. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4232605 issued. Signed on 8/10/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
August 7, 2015 Filing 288 Response in Opposition (Redacted( to Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Persaud #248 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud. (Genego, William)
August 7, 2015 Filing 287 Response in Opposition to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Persaud #244 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud. (Genego, William)
August 7, 2015 Filing 286 Notice of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiff Persaud's Unredacted Opposition to Defs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply In Support of His Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud (Genego, William)
August 7, 2015 Filing 285 Response in Opposition (Redacted) to Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Washburn #249 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 284 Response in Opposition to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Washburn #245 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 283 Notice of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiff Washburn's Unredacted Opposition to Defts' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of His Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Steven William Washburn (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 282 Response in Opposition (Redacted) to Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Meshal #247 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Amir Meshal. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 281 Response in Opposition to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Meshal #243 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Amir Meshal. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 280 Notice of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiff Meshal's Unredacted Opposition to Defts' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of His Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Amir Meshal (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 279 Response in Opposition (Redacted) to Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Knaeble #250 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 278 Response in Opposition to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Knaeble #246 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 277 Notice of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiff Knaeble's Unredacted Opposition to Defts' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of His Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 276 Response in Opposition (Redacted) to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kashem #242 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Faisal Nabin Kashem. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 275 Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kashem #242 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Faisal Nabin Kashem. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 274 Notice of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiff Kashem's Unredacted Opposition to Defts' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of His Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Faisal Nabin Kashem (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 273 Response in Opposition (Redacted) to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kariye #241 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 272 Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kariye #241 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye. (Shamsi, Hina) Modified on 9/1/2015 to unseal document per Order 293 (ecp).
August 7, 2015 Filing 271 Notice of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiff Kariye's Unredacted Opposition to Defts' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of His Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 270 Declaration of Amir Meshal in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Steven William Washburn. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #267 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 269 Declaration of James Austin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #267 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 268 Declaration of Marc Sageman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #267 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 267 Response in Opposition to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition (All Plaintiffs) #251 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 266 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Catherine A. Wagner . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4232605. Filed by Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed, Salah Ali Ahmed, Adama Bah, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Saleh A. Omar, Mashaal Rana, Halime Sat, Steven William Washburn. (Wilker, Steven)
August 7, 2015 Filing 265 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference held. The Court received input from the parties as to whether or not to have 3:15-cv-1343-SI US v Kariye reassigned to this judicial officer. The Court will make a joint recommendation to the Case Management Committee and advise the parties. Hina Shamsi, Steven Wilker, Catherine Wagner, Ahilan Arulanantham present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brigham Bowen, Amy Powell, Samuel Singer present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. A telephonic Scheduling Conference is SET for 8/7/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Parties were emailed the conference call in number. (bb)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court GRANTS the Consent Motion #262 for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs Memoranda in Opposition to Defendants Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs Reply Memoranda in Support of their Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Motions for Summary Judgment are now due 8/7/15. Defendants Reply Memoranda in Support of their Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment are now due 9/23/15. Oral argument remains set on October 19, 2015. (bb)
July 23, 2015 Filing 262 Consent Motion for Extension of Time Re Briefing Deadlines. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' Consent Motion #260 to Extend Briefing Deadlines. Plaintiff's Memoranda in Opposition to Defendants' Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Reply Memoranda in Support of their Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Motions for Summary Judgment are due 7/24/15. Defendants' Reply Memoranda in Support of their Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment are due 9/2/15. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (mr)
July 10, 2015 Filing 260 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Response Brief. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown Oral Argument on all pending motions is SET for 10/19/2015 at 01:30 PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. After a thorough review of the extensive briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion (#255) to Revise Case Management Schedule, the Court GRANTS in part Plaintiff's Motion as follows: The Court concludes, in the exercise of its case-management discretion, that Plaintiffs should be permitted to make their record in opposition to Defendants' Motions #241-#251 for Summary Judgment, including the proffer of expert evidentiary arguments to explain their opposition. Because Plaintiffs did not anticipate their asserted need to make such a record in time to meet the current deadlines in the Court's Case Management Schedule, the Court also concludes the existing schedule should be modified reasonably to permit Plaintiffs to complete that record. The Court, however, declines on this scheduling Motion to make any ruling as to admissibility of the to-be-proffered declarations from Plaintiffs' retained experts for the purpose of resisting Defendants' Motion, and Defendants may challenge the admissibility of this evidence and, if necessary, supplement their record and arguments in light of these submissions. Accordingly, the Court makes the following changes to the existing Case Management Schedule: No later than June 24, 2015, Plaintiffs must disclose to Defendants the identities and curriculum vitae of all expert witnesses on whom they intend to rely in opposition to Defendants' Motion. No later than July 20, 2015, Plaintiffs must file their Memoranda in Opposition to Defendants' Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Reply Memoranda in Support of their Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Motions for Summary Judgment, including any substantive declarations from their expert witnesses. If Defendants require additional time to prepare their reply memoranda in light of Plaintiffs' proffer of expert declarations, then the Court will consider any motion for an extension of time in due course. Otherwise, Defendants must file their Reply Memoranda in Support of their Combined and Plaintiff-Specific Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment no later than August 27, 2015. These changes also necessitate the rescheduling of the oral argument previously set for August 20, 2015, which the Court now STRIKES. The Clerk will contact the parties in due course to reset oral argument on the parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment for sometime in September 2015. (bb)
June 17, 2015 Filing 257 Reply to Motion to Revise Case Management Schedule #255 . Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
June 16, 2015 Filing 256 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Revise Case Management Schedule #255 . Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
June 11, 2015 Filing 255 Motion to Revise Case Management Schedule. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
May 28, 2015 Filing 254 Declaration of Michael Steinbach . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #251 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 253 Declaration of G. Clayton Grigg. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #251 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 252 Declaration of Deborah O. Moore . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #251 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 251 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition (All Plaintiffs). Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 250 Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Knaeble. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
May 28, 2015 Filing 249 Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Washburn. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
May 28, 2015 Filing 248 Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Persaud. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
May 28, 2015 Filing 247 Redacted Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Meshal. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
May 28, 2015 Filing 246 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Knaeble. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
May 28, 2015 Filing 245 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Washburn. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
May 28, 2015 Filing 244 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Persaud. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
May 28, 2015 Filing 243 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion - Meshal. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
May 28, 2015 Filing 242 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kashem. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 241 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - (Redacted) Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kariye. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 240 Brief - Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kashem. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 239 Brief - Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition - Kariye. Filed by All Defendants. (Bowen, Brigham) Modified on 9/1/2015 to unseal document per Order 293 (ecp).
May 28, 2015 Filing 238 Notice re Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 Notice of Filing Under Seal - Washburn Cross-Motion and Opposition Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 237 Notice re Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 Notice of Filing Under Seal - Persaud Cross-Motion and Opposition Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 236 Notice re Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 Notice of Filing Under Seal - Meshal Cross-Motion and Opposition Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 235 Notice re Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 Notice of Filing Under Seal - Knaeble Cross-Motion and Opposition Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 234 Notice re Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 Notice of Filing Under Seal - Kashem Cross-Motion and Opposition Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 28, 2015 Filing 233 Notice re Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 Notice of Filing Under Seal - Kariye Cross-Motion and Opposition Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice (Related document(s): Order on motion for protective order #182 , Order on Motion - Miscellaneous,, 174 .) (Bowen, Brigham)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion #230 to Consolidate Memoranda. Defendants' consolidated memorandum in support of Defendants' expected cross-motion for summary judgment and Defendants' memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion #206 for Partial Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than May 28, 2015, and must not exceed 60 pages. Defendants' consolidated memoranda as to each individual Plaintiff shall be filed no later than May 28, 20125, and must not exceed 15 pages each. Plaintiffs may file similar consolidated responses to Defendants' expected motions as to each individual Plaintiff and replies in support of Plaintiffs' Motions no later than June 22, 2015. (bb)
May 21, 2015 Filing 231 Notice of Errata Filed by All Defendants (Singer, Samuel)
May 21, 2015 Filing 230 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Memoranda in Support of Summary Judgment Submissions. Filed by All Defendants. (Singer, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 229 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Christopher Egelson as Counsel For Plaintiffs Filed by Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed, Salah Ali Ahmed, Adama Bah, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Saleh A. Omar, Mashaal Rana, Halime Sat, Steven William Washburn (Wilker, Steven)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 JUDGMENT: Based on the Court's Opinions and Orders (#110, #136) issuedAugust 28, 2013, and June 24, 2014, respectively, granting partial summary judgment in Plaintiffs' favor; the Court's Case-Management Order (#152) issued October 3, 2014; and Defendants' October 10, 2014, disclosure that the subset ofPlaintiffs listed below are not currently on the No-Fly List, the Court ENTERS Judgment in favor of Plaintiffs Ayman Latif, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Abdullatif Muthanna, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Salah Ali Ahmed, and Mashaal Rana on Claims One and Three of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint consistent with the Courts Orders (#110, #136, #152). See order for full text. Signed on 4/24/15 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (dls)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER: The Court ENTERS a non-final Judgment on Claims One and Three in Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint in favor of Plaintiffs Ayman Latif, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Abdullatif Muthanna, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Salah Ali Ahmed, and Mashaal Rana, who are not on the No-Fly List. The Court also DISMISSES without prejudice Claim Two as to these Plaintiffs, who are not presently on the No-Fly List. Signed on 4/24/15 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (dls)
April 17, 2015 Filing 226 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Steven Washburn. Filed by Steven William Washburn. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #218 .) (ecp)
April 17, 2015 Filing 225 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Stephen Persaud.. Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #220 .) (ecp)
April 17, 2015 Filing 224 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Amir Meshal. Filed by Amir Meshal. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #216 .) (ecp)
April 17, 2015 Filing 223 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Raymond Knaeble. Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #214 .) (ecp)
April 17, 2015 Filing 222 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Faisal Kashem.. Filed by Faisal Nabin Kashem. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #212 .) (ecp)
April 17, 2015 Filing 221 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Mohamed Kariye. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #210 .) (ecp) Modified on 9/1/2015 to unseal document per Order 293 (ecp).
April 17, 2015 Filing 220 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Stephen Persaud. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud. (Genego, William)
April 17, 2015 Filing 219 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Steven Washburn. Filed by Steven William Washburn. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #218 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 218 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Steven Washburn. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 217 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Amir Meshal. Filed by Amir Meshal. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #216 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 216 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Amir Meshal. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Amir Meshal. (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 215 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Raymond Knaeble. Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #214 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 214 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Raymond Knaeble. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV. (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 213 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Faisal Kashem. Filed by Faisal Nabin Kashem. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #212 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 212 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Faisal Kashem. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Faisal Nabin Kashem. (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 211 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Mohamed Kariye. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #210 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 210 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Mohamed Kariye (CORRECTED ENTRY). Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye. (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 209 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed by Mohamed Kariye. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye. (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 208 Declaration of Hugh Handeyside in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed and Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #206 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2)) (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 207 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed and Combined Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #206 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 206 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed and Combined on Behalf of Plaintiffs on No Fly List. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Amir Meshal, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 205 Redacted Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud. (Genego, William)
April 17, 2015 Filing 204 Notice of Under Seal Filing of Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud (Genego, William)
April 17, 2015 Filing 203 Notice of Filing Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Steven William Washburn (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 202 Notice of Filing Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Amir Meshal (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 201 Notice of Filing Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 200 Notice of Filing Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Faisal Nabin Kashem (Shamsi, Hina)
April 17, 2015 Filing 199 Notice of Filing Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye (Shamsi, Hina)
April 14, 2015 Filing 198 Concise Statement re Scheduling,,,, 195 Regarding Disposition of Claims for Individuals Not on the No Fly List. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Mashaal Rana. (Shamsi, Hina)
April 13, 2015 Filing 197 Notice re: Revisions to DHS TRIP Procedures Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice (Bowen, Brigham)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. After the Court has reviewed the parties Summary Judgment motions and cross-motions to be filed and has determined oral argument is necessary, Oral Argument will be SET for 8/20/2015 at 01:30PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel are directed to secure this date on their calendar. (bb)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court acknowledges receipt of the parties' Supplemental Joint Filing Regarding Disposition of Claims #194 in which the parties offer extensive disputed analysis as to whether the Court should enter a judgment at this time as to the claims of those Plaintiffs who are no longer on the No Fly List. The Court concludes there is insufficient time between now and the April 13, 2015, telephone conference for the Court to consider adequately the parties' arguments on this issue and, therefore, the Court strikes that telephone conference. The Court is taking under advisement the question whether a judgment should enter now and, if so, in what form, and the Court will notify the parties if additional briefing or argument will be helpful to the Court. In the meantime, the Court requests counsel for the Plaintiffs who are no longer on the No Fly List to file no later than April 17, 2015, a statement for the record confirming that, other than a future petition for attorneys' fees and costs on behalf of these Plaintiffs, there are not any additional claims to be litigated on behalf of these particular Plaintiffs in this action. (bb)
April 6, 2015 Filing 194 Joint Concise Statement Supplementing Joint Filing Regarding Disposition of Claims for Individuals Not on the No Fly List. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Mashaal Rana, Steven William Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Hugh Handeyside in Support of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit A to Handeyside Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Handeyside Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Handeyside Declaration) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER: GRANTING Defendants' consent Motion (#192) to Revise Case Management Schedule #192 . Defendants' Response to Combined Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion and separate Responses to Plaintiff-Specific Summary Judgment Motions are due 5/28/15. Defendants' Combined Cross-Motions and Defendants' separate Plaintiff-Specific Cross-Motions are due 5/28/15. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (dls)
March 26, 2015 Filing 192 Consent Motion to Revise Case Management Schedule. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Filing (#181) Regarding Disposition of Claims. The Court has prepared its own proposed form of Judgment attached hereto as Exhibit A for the parties' consideration. See order for full text. A single joint filing due no later than 5 court days before the telephone conference. Status Conference is set for 4/13/2015 at 01:30PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel received the conference call information via email. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment draft judgment) (dls)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER: The Court has completed its consideration of the parties' Consent Motion (#189) to Change Case Management Schedule and grants the Motion. See Order for full text and complete deadlines. Dispositive Motions are due by 4/17/2015. Responses to Dispositive Motions are due by 5/18/2015. Replies to Dispositive Motions are due by 6/22/2015. Replies are due by 7/16/2015. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (dls)
March 23, 2015 Filing 189 Consent Motion to Revise Case Management Schedule. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina)
March 17, 2015 Filing 188 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibits re Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Steven Washburn #179 . Filed by Steven William Washburn. (ecp)
March 17, 2015 Filing 187 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibits re Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Amir Meshal #178 . Filed by Amir Meshal. (ecp)
March 17, 2015 Filing 186 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibits re Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Raymond Knaeble #177 . Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV. (ecp)
March 17, 2015 Filing 185 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibits re Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Faisal Kashem #176 . Filed by Faisal Nabin Kashem. (ecp)
March 17, 2015 Filing 184 Exhibit re Joint Concise Statement #175 of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahman Kariye. Filed by Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye. (ecp) Modified on 9/1/2015 to unseal document per Order 293 (ecp).
March 17, 2015 Filing 183 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibit re Joint Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Stephen Persaud #180 . Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud. (ecp)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 03/16/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
March 13, 2015 Filing 181 Joint Concise Statement re Order #168 --- Joint Filing Regarding Disposition of Claims. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Plaintiffs' Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit 2 (Defendants' Proposed Order)) (Bowen, Brigham)
March 13, 2015 Filing 180 Joint Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Stephen Persaud. Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Genego, William)
March 13, 2015 Filing 179 Joint Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Steven Washburn. Filed by Steven William Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 13, 2015 Filing 178 Joint Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Amir Meshal. Filed by Amir Meshal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 13, 2015 Filing 177 Joint Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Raymond Knaeble. Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 13, 2015 Filing 176 Joint Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Faisal Kashem. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 13, 2015 Filing 175 Joint Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to Plaintiff Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahman Kariye. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has considered the parties' Consent Motion #172 to File Under Seal Unredacted Exhibits to Plaintiff-Specific Joint Statements of Agreed Facts. Without attempting to resolve the parties' disagreement as to whether and to what extent public disclosure of proposed redacted material may stigmatize Plaintiffs or raise security concerns, the Court is satisfied in the exercise of its discretion that good cause exists for the parties to proceed as proposed in the Consent Motion. Accordingly, the Court grants the Motion. (bb)
March 13, 2015 Filing 173 Joint Concise Statement of Agreed Facts Relevant to All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina)
March 13, 2015 Filing 172 Consent Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Exhibits to Plaintiff-Specific Joint Statements of Agreed Facts. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina)
March 13, 2015 Filing 171 Joint Motion for Protective Order (Renewed). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has received the parties' proposed form of Stipulated Protective Order #169 . For the reasons in the attached Order, the Court declines to sign the order in its current form and DENIES the request. The Court directs the parties to confer further and to submit a new form of stipulated protective order in which they propose the requisite "good cause" findings. (bb)
February 25, 2015 Filing 169 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Shamsi, Hina)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See 10-page order attached. Signed on 2/13/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (mr)
February 6, 2015 Filing 167 Joint Status Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Exhibit A, #2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit B) (Shamsi, Hina)
January 29, 2015 Filing 166 Notice of Appearance of Samuel M. Singer appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Singer, Samuel)
January 22, 2015 Filing 165 Status Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Motion (Consent) #163 to Modify Schedule. General deadline to complete DHS TRIP review process is extended to 1/22/2015; deadline to complete DHS TRIP review process for Mr. Persaud is extended to 01/28/2015. Joint Status Report is now due 02/06/2015. (bb)
January 15, 2015 Filing 163 Consent Motion to Modify Case Management Schedule. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
December 31, 2014 Filing 162 MANDATE of USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 14-36027, re Notice of Appeal #156 . The motion filed by the appellants on December 18, 2014 for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b); 9th Cir. R. 27-9.1. This order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court. (dsg)
December 22, 2014 Filing 161 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney William J. Genego (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: wjgenego. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of William J. Genego for Stephen Durga Persaud. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3947287 issued. Signed on 12/22/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
December 19, 2014 Filing 159 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William J. Genego . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3947287. Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud. (Fischer, Justine)
December 19, 2014 Filing 158 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Justine Fischer is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Steven M. Wilker Hina Shamst and High Handeyside; Ahilan Arulanantham and Jennifer Pasquarella; Alan Schlosser and Julia Harumi Mass; Mitchell Hurley, Christopher Egleson and Justin Bell; and Alexandra Freedman Smith; and Reem Salahi Filed by Stephen Durga Persaud (Fischer, Justine)
December 19, 2014 Filing 157 Status Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Bowen, Brigham)
December 3, 2014 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #156 . Case Appealed to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 14-36027 assigned. (dsg)
December 2, 2014 Filing 156 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) . Filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Representation Statement) (Kirschner, Adam)
December 2, 2014 Filing 155 Notice of Appearance of Adam D. Kirschner appearing on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice Filed by on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice (Kirschner, Adam)
October 27, 2014 Filing 154 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on October 3, 2014 before Judge Anna J. Brown, Court Reporter Amanda M. LeGore, telephone number 503-326-8184. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 11/6/2014. Redaction Request due 11/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2015. (LeGore, Amanda)
October 10, 2014 Filing 153 Status Report by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter to the ACLU) (Powell, Amy)
October 3, 2014 Filing 152 MINUTES of Proceedings: Having fully considered the parties' respective case-management proposals #148 following the Court's 6/24/2014,Opinion and Order #136 and having conducted a Rule 16 Case Management Conference with counsel on 10/03/2014, the Court, in the exercise of its case-management discretion, issues this Case-Management Order. No later than 10/10/2014, Defendant shall identify to the Court and Plaintiffs which Plaintiffs, if any, will not be precluded as of that date from boarding a commercial aircraft flying over United States airspace. Defendants shall, no later than 11/14/2014, complete an interim substantive review of the grounds for precluding all remaining Plaintiffs from flying over United States airspace in order to determine whether any additional Plaintiffs may thereafter be permitted to board such aircraft. No later than 12/19/2014, Defendants shall file a Status Report updating the Court and Plaintiffs of Defendants' progress in reconsidering each remaining Plaintiff's DHS TRIP applications. No later than 1/16/2015, Defendants shall have completed their final substantive reconsideration of all remaining Plaintiffs' DHS TRIP redress inquiries pursuant to procedures fully compliant with the Court's June 24, 2014,Opinion and Order, and this Order. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report no later than 1/31/2015, informing the Court of their proposed process and schedule for adjudicating those remaining claims. See attached Order for full text. Hina Shamsi, Hugh Haneyside, Steven Wilker present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Diane Kelleher, Brigham Bowen present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb)
October 1, 2014 Filing 151 Notice of Appearance of Brigham J. Bowen appearing on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice Filed by on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice (Bowen, Brigham)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Rule 16 Conference is SET for 10/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER regarding Status Report #148 . The Court acknowledges receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report #148 . The Court will provide the parties with further direction in due course. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (mr)
September 3, 2014 Filing 148 Joint Status Report by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court GRANTS the parties' email request to extend the deadline to 9/3/2014 for filing the parties' Joint Status Report. (sm)
August 7, 2014 Filing 146 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Kevin Diaz Filed by All Plaintiffs (Wilker, Steven)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court acknowledges receipt of the Parties' Joint Status Report #144 . The Court is considering the parties' proposals and will give counsel direction in due course. In the meantime, the Court STRIKES the status conference set for 8/12/14 and will reset it at a later date with directions as to how the parties may prepare for the conference. (bb)
August 4, 2014 Filing 144 Joint Status Report by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Status Conference set for 08/12/2014 at 2:00 PM is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY TO 11:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
July 2, 2014 Filing 142 Notification of CM/ECF Account: Attorney Hugh Handeyside (appearing Pro Hac Vice). (sss)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hugh Handeyside for all Plaintiffs. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3742267 issued. Signed on 7/1/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sss)
July 1, 2014 Filing 140 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hugh Handeyside . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3742267. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilker, Steven)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #138 to File Status Report. Joint Status Report is due by 8/4/2014. Status Conference is SET for 8/12/2014 at 02:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Per docket #136, primary counsel for the parties should plan to attend in person. (bb)
June 30, 2014 Filing 138 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a status report. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
June 24, 2014 Filing 137 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Alexandra Smith is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Laura Schauer Ives Filed by Ayman Latif (Smith, Alexandra)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Opinion and Order: The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion #85 for Partial Summary Judgment and GRANTS Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion #91 for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims One and Three in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, #83 . The Court directs the parties to confer as to the next steps in this litigation and to file no later than July 14, 2014, a Joint Status Report with their respective proposals and schedules. The Court will schedule a Status Conference thereafter at which primary counsel for the parties should plan to attend in person. Signed on 06/24/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 65 page Opinion and Order for full text. (bb)
June 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra F. Smith for Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif,Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed,Abdullatif Muthanna,Stephen Durga Persaud, Mashaal Rana, Steven William Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3698025 issued. Signed on 6/1/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
May 29, 2014 Filing 134 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexandra Freedman Smith . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3698025. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilker, Steven)
April 30, 2014 Filing 133 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Lily Farel Filed by All Defendants (Farel, Lily)
April 18, 2014 Filing 132 Fifth Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 25, 2014 Filing 131 Fourth Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 17, 2014 Filing 130 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #91 . Motions are taken under advisement as of 3/17/2014. Hina Shamsi, Steven Wilker, Kevin Diaz present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Lily Farel, Amy Powell present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb)
February 10, 2014 Filing 129 Third Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shamsi, Hina)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. In light of the supplemental briefs and supplemental authority regarding Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #91 , continued Oral Argument is SET for 3/17/2014 at 01:30 PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
January 23, 2014 Filing 127 Second Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Shamsi, Hina)
January 15, 2014 Filing 126 Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shamsi, Hina)
January 9, 2014 Filing 125 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Adama Bah, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn (Choudhury, Nusrat)
December 2, 2013 Filing 124 Supplemental Brief Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed, Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,, #91 , Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
November 15, 2013 Filing 123 Supplemental Brief Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,, #91 , Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 .) (Powell, Amy)
November 15, 2013 Filing 122 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Defendants (Risner, Scott)
November 5, 2013 Filing 121 Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related documents: Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #91 , Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 .) (Shamsi, Hina)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report #118 of the parties and acknowledges Defendants' filing of its Supplemental Brief #119 related to the Court's further consideration of Defendants' Motion #85 for Partial Summary Judgment. In their Joint Status Report, the parties propose a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Response Brief (November 5, 2013), Defendants' Reply Brief, if any (November 15, 2013), and Plaintiffs' Reply Brief, if any (December 2, 2013). The Court adopts this proposed supplemental briefing schedule, but notes Plaintiffs are permitted to reply only if Defendants choose to reply. Once the briefing is complete, the Court will inform the parties whether oral argument would be helpful to the Court. (bb)
October 25, 2013 Filing 119 Supplemental Brief . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,, #91 , Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 .) (Risner, Scott)
October 22, 2013 Filing 118 Joint Status Report . Filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Risner, Scott)
October 4, 2013 Filing 117 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Ben Wizner Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn (Choudhury, Nusrat)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Consent Motion for Stay of Supplemental Briefing in Light of Lapse of Appropriations #115 . Counsel for Defendants shall confer with counsel for Plaintiffs and submit to the Court a proposal (with dates) as to how the parties wish to proceed within 7 days from the date Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice. (bb)
October 1, 2013 Filing 115 Consent Motion for Stay of Supplemental Briefing in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Risner, Scott)
September 26, 2013 Filing 114 Joint Stipulation re Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #91 , Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 by Salah Ali Ahmed, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice, Steven William Washburn. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice, Steven William Washburn. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
September 16, 2013 Filing 113 Joint Status Report by Salah Ali Ahmed, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice, Steven William Washburn. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice, Steven William Washburn. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time #111 to File Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report is due by 9/16/2013. (bb)
September 3, 2013 Filing 111 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Risner, Scott)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Opinion and Order: The Court GRANTS in part Plaintiffs Cross-Motion #91 as to Plaintiffs liberty interests in international air travel and reputation, DENIES in part Defendants Motion #85 as to the same issue, and DEFERS ruling on the remaining parts of the pending Cross-Motions. The Court also directs the parties to confer and to submit a joint status report no later than September 9, 2013, setting out their recommendation as to the most effective process to better develop the record so that the Court may complete its consideration of the still-pending Motions (#91, #85) and specifically setting out any additional issues that the parties believe need to be resolved on the existing Cross-Motions in light of the Court's rulings herein. Signed on 08/28/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The pending Motions #85 and #91 were taken under advisement on 7/3/13 upon receipt of Defendants' response to the Court's request at oral argument. (bb)
July 16, 2013 Filing 108 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on June 21, 2013, before Judge Anna J. Brown, Court Reporter Jill L. Erwin, telephone number (503)326-8191. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 7/26/2013. Redaction Request due 8/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2013. (Erwin, Jill)
July 3, 2013 Filing 107 Notice re Motion Hearing Held, 106 Response to the Court's Inquiry During Summary Judgment Hearing Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Motion Hearing Held, 106 .) (Farel, Lily)
June 21, 2013 Filing 106 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #91 . Motions are taken under advisement as of 6/21/2013. Nusrat Choudhury, Hina Shamsi, Steve Wilker, Kevin Diaz, Ahilan Arulanantham, present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Scott Risner, Lily Farel, present as counsel for defendant(s). Rita Siemion present (Amicus Brief). Court Reporter: Jill Erwin. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb) Modified on 7/10/2013 to correct court reporter (bb).
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court notes Plaintiffs failed to file their amended Memoranda as proposed after the Court granted their Unopposed Motion #98 to amend same on 4/5/13. In light of the fact that Replies #102 , #104 to both pending Motions #85 , #91 in this matter have been filed, however, the Court deems Plaintiffs' amended Memoranda as having been timely filed on 4/5/13. Counsel also are reminded that the Local Rules require all motions to be accompanied by a separately filed memorandum in support. (bb)
May 10, 2013 Filing 104 Reply to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #91 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
April 26, 2013 Filing 103 Response in Opposition to Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #91 . Filed by All Defendants. (Risner, Scott)
April 26, 2013 Filing 102 Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 . Filed by All Defendants. (Risner, Scott)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 , Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #91 and The Constitution Project's Amicus Curiae Brief is SET for 6/21/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Plaintiffs' Memoranda of Points and Authorities #98 . Counsel are directed to provide the Court with two copies, three-hole punched. (bb)
April 2, 2013 Filing 99 Amicus Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by The Constitution Project. (Siemion, Rita)
April 1, 2013 Filing 98 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Memoranda of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) (Choudhury, Nusrat)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has completed its consideration of The Constitution Project's Motion #96 for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs; Cross-motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court notes the conditional consent of the parties to the participation of The Constitution Project provided the Court permits the described additional, optional briefing by the parties. Because the Court anticipates setting oral argument no earlier than mid-June, the Court concludes the additional proposed briefing will not delay its preparation and, therefore, grants the Motion #96 as follows: 1. The Constitution Project may filed its proposed Amicus Curiae Brief in the record of this case; 2. Defendants now have until April 26, 2013, to file their opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion #91 for Partial Summary Judgment and to file any brief responsive to The Constitution Project's Amicus Brief; 3. Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their Cross-Motion is now due May 10, 2013. (bb)
March 29, 2013 Filing 96 Unopposed Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by Constitution Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Siemion, Rita)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Record on the Parties' Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment #93 . (bb)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rita M. Siemion for Constitution Project. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 51324 issued. Signed on 3/27/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
March 26, 2013 Filing 93 Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Record on the Parties Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Choudhury, Nusrat)
March 22, 2013 Filing 92 Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Salah Ali Ahmed, #2 Declaration of Nagib Ali Ghaleb, #3 Declaration of Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahman Kariye, #4 Declaration of Faisal Nabin Kashem, #5 Declaration of Raymond Earl Knaeble IV, #6 Declaration of Allah R. Rana, #7 Declaration of Mashaal Rana, #8 Declaration of Nauman Rana, #9 Declaration of Ibraheim Mashal, #10 Declaration of Amir Meshal, #11 Declaration of Elias Mustafa Mohamed, #12 Declaration of Stephen Persaud, #13 Declaration of Steven William Washburn, #14 Declaration of Nusrat J. Choudhury, #15 Exhibit A to Choudhury Declaration, #16 Exhibit B to Choudhury Declaration, #17 Exhibit C to Choudhury Declaration, #18 Exhibit D to Choudhury Declaration, #19 Exhibit E to Choudhury Declaration, #20 Exhibit F to Choudhury Declaration, #21 Exhibit G to Choudhury Declaration, #22 Exhibit H to Choudhury Declaration, #23 Exhibit I to Choudhury Declaration, #24 Exhibit J to Choudhury Declaration, #25 Exhibit K to Choudhury Declaration, #26 Exhibit L to Choudhury Declaration) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 22, 2013 Filing 91 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Salah Ali Ahmed, #3 Declaration of Nagib Ali Ghaleb, #4 Declaration of Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahman Kariye, #5 Declaration of Faisal Nabin Kashem, #6 Declaration of Raymond Earl Knaeble IV, #7 Declaration of Allah R. Rana, #8 Declaration of Mashaal Rana, #9 Declaration of Nauman Rana, #10 Declaration of Ibraheim Mashal, #11 Declaration of Amir Meshal, #12 Declaration of Elias Mustafa Mohamed, #13 Declaration of Stephen Persaud, #14 Declaration of Steven William Washburn, #15 Declaration of Nusrat J. Choudhury, #16 Exhibit A to Choudhury Declaration, #17 Exhibit B to Choudhury Declaration, #18 Exhibit C to Choudhury Declaration, #19 Exhibit D to Choudhury Declaration, #20 Exhibit E to Choudhury Declaration, #21 Exhibit F to Choudhury Declaration, #22 Exhibit G to Choudhury Declaration, #23 Exhibit H Choudhury Declaration, #24 Exhibit I to Choudhury Declaration, #25 Exhibit J to Choudhury Declaration, #26 Exhibit K to Choudhury Declaration, #27 Exhibit L to Choudhury Declaration) (Shamsi, Hina)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has reviewed the Application for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice of Rita M. Siemion who seeks to file as amicus curiae a brief on behalf of The Constitution Project. In the Application, Ms. Siemion explains why she presently does not carry professional liability insurance. Ms. Siemion does not explain, however, whether The Constitution Project consents to her representation without such insurance, a fact the Court finds important to resolving whether she should be admitted pro hac vice in this case. Accordingly, the Court holds this Application in abeyance pending a further submission by Ms. Siemion addressing this question. In addition, to the extent any party to this matter has any position on this Application, the party should make an appropriate filing to express the same no later than March 25, 2013. (bb)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Motion for Extension of Time #88 . Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' separately filed Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and supporting submission are now due 03/22/2013. Defendants' Reply in support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and separately filed Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are due 4/12/2013. Plaintiffs' reply in support of their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due 04/26/2013. Motion is taken under advisement as of 4/26/2013. (bb)
March 8, 2013 Filing 88 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and memorandum in opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Choudhury, Nusrat)
February 19, 2013 Filing 87 Certificate of Compliance with LR 7-1(a). Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 .) (Risner, Scott)
February 13, 2013 Filing 86 Notice re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 of Intent to Lodge Ex Parte In Camera Material Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #85 .) (Farel, Lily)
February 13, 2013 Filing 85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Cindy A. Coppola, #3 Attachment to Coppola Declaration) (Farel, Lily)
January 31, 2013 Filing 84 Joint Stipulation (Joint Statement of Stipulated Facts) by Salah Ali Ahmed, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice, Steven William Washburn. Filed by Salah Ali Ahmed, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Stephen Durga Persaud, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice, Steven William Washburn. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
January 11, 2013 Filing 83 Third Amended Complaint . Filed by Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Salah Ali Ahmed, Ayman Latif, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Stephen Durga Persaud, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Abdullatif Muthanna, Steven William Washburn against All Defendants. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
January 11, 2013 Filing 82 Notice of Appearance of Lily S. Farel appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Farel, Lily)
January 11, 2013 Filing 81 Notice of Appearance of Scott A. Risner appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Risner, Scott)
December 19, 2012 Filing 80 MINUTES of Proceedings: Scheduling Conference. Third Amended Complaint due 01/11/2013. Joint Statement of Agreed Facts due 02/03/2013. Defendants' Motion(s) against the Third Amended Complaint due 02/13/2013. Plaintiffs' Opposition and separately filed cross-motion are due 03/15/2013. Defendants' Reply and separately filed opposition are due 04/05/2013. Plaintiffs' Reply is due 04/19/2013. The Court will schedule Oral Argument on these motions in due course. Other case management issues will be addressed after resolution of these motions. See attached Order for full text. Hini Shamsi, Nusrat Choudhury, Steven Wilker, Kevin Diaz present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Diane Kelleher, Amy Powell, James Cox present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bridget Montero. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb) Modified on 12/20/2012 to correct typos (bb).
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. A Scheduling Conference is SET for 12/19/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel may appear by telephone by e-mailing the courtroom deputy with their contact information. (bb)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hina Shamsi for Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed,Hina Shamsi for Salah Ali Ahmed,Hina Shamsi for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Hina Shamsi for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Hina Shamsi for Faisal Nabin Kashem,Hina Shamsi for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Hina Shamsi for Ayman Latif,Hina Shamsi for Ibraheim Y. Mashal,Hina Shamsi for Amir Meshal,Hina Shamsi for Elias Mustafa Mohamed,Hina Shamsi for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Hina Shamsi for Abdullatif Muthanna,Hina Shamsi for Saleh A. Omar,Hina Shamsi for Stephen Durga Persaud,Hina Shamsi for Steven William Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 49952 issued. Signed on 12/11/2012 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
December 10, 2012 Filing 77 Joint Status Report and Case Management Plan. Filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Choudhury, Nusrat)
November 29, 2012 Filing 76 The Mandate #75 having been filed, the Court directs the parties to submit a jointly proposed case management plan and schedule no later than December 10, 2012, after which the Court will convene a Rule 16 Conference. In the meantime, counsel shall also inform the Courtroom Deputy of their availability for the Rule 16 Conference on dates after December 10, 2012. (bb)
November 19, 2012 Filing 75 MANDATE of USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 11-35407, re Notice of Appeal, #71 . The decision of the District Court is Reversed and Remanded. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Opinion) (cp)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record: Docket #73 was entered in the wrong case and should be disregarded by the parties. (sm)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty: When due, the Administrative Record should be submitted in CD Format only. No paper copy is necessary. (sp)
May 13, 2011 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal, #71 Case Appealed to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 11-35407 assigned. (sd)
May 13, 2011 USCA Appeal Fees re Notice of Appeal, #71 : Received Fee in amount of $ 455. Receipt number 40492 issued. (msk)
May 12, 2011 Filing 72 Representation Statement re Notice of Appeal, #71 . Filed by Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed, Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Saleh A. Omar, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Wizner, Ben)
May 12, 2011 Filing 71 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit from Judgment #70 . Filed by Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed, Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Saleh A. Omar, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Wizner, Ben)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Judgment. Based on the Court's Opinion and Order #69 issued May 3, 2011, the Court DISMISSES this matter. Signed on 05/05/2011 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See 2 page Judgment. (bb)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion #43 to Dismiss this action for failure to join an indispensable party and for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed on 05/03/2011 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See 16 page Opinion and Order for full text. (bb)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. In light of Defendants' Notice (#66) of Withdrawal of Certain Arguments and Materials, the Court directs Classified Information Officer Scooter Slade to retrieve from the Court's custody all materials Defendants submitted ex parte and in camera. IT IS SO ORDERED. (bb)
March 4, 2011 Filing 67 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Motion for Summary Judgment #43 . Filed by Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed, Salah Ali Ahmed, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Faisal Nabin Kashem, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Ibraheim Y. Mashal, Amir Meshal, Elias Mustafa Mohamed, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Saleh A. Omar, Stephen Durga Persaud, Steven William Washburn. (Wizner, Ben)
February 24, 2011 Filing 66 Notice re Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment #43 of Withdrawal of Certain Arguments and Materials Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment #43 .) (Kelleher, Diane)
February 18, 2011 Filing 65 Supplemental Reply by Defendants in Further Support to Motion to Dismiss Motion for Summary Judgment #43 . Filed by All Defendants. (Kelleher, Diane)
February 4, 2011 Filing 64 Second Amended Complaint.Filed by Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Saleh A. Omar, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Ayman Latif, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Steven Washburn against All Defendants. (Wizner, Ben)
January 31, 2011 Filing 63 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on January 21, 2011 before Judge Anna J. Brown, Court Reporter Amanda M. LeGore, telephone number 503-326-8184. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 2/10/2011. Redaction Request due 2/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2011. (LeGore, Amanda)
January 21, 2011 Filing 62 MINUTES of Proceedings: The Court heard oral argument on that portion of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (#43) that asserts the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action pursuant to 49 USC Section 46110. At the conclusion of the hearing and in lieu of ruling on the jurisdictional aspects of Defendants' Motion on the existing record, the Court granted Plaintiffs leave to file no later than February 4, 2011, a Second Amended Complaint that is a plain and concise statement of their intended claims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a) and that sets forth the jurisdictional and elemental bases for such claims. Defendants may file no later than February 18, 2011, a final memorandum in support of the jurisdictional challenges raised in their Motion (#43). Plaintiffs may file no later than March 4, 2011, their final memorandum in opposition to dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court will then take the jurisdictional challenge under advisement on March 4, 2011. In the meantime, the remainder of Defendants' Motion (#43) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (#51) remain pending. Ben Wizner, Kevin Diaz, Nusrat Choudhury, Steven Wilker present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Amy Powell, Diane Kelleher present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Egleson for Adama Bah, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Abdullatif Muthanna,Saleh A. Omar, Halime Sat,and Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 38153 issued. Signed on 1/20/2011 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin H. Bell for Adama Bah, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Ayman Latif,Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna, Saleh A. Omar, Halime Sat, and Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 38155 issued. Signed on 1/20/2011 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell P. Hurley for Adama Bah,Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Ayman Latif, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Abdullatif Muthanna, Saleh A. Omar, Halime Sat, Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 38154 issued. Signed on 1/20/2011 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
January 20, 2011 Filing 58 Joint Notice re Motion to Strike #51 Agreement Regarding Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike or to Compel Disclosure Filed by All Parties (Related document(s): Motion to Strike #51 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Choudhury, Nusrat)
January 14, 2011 Filing 57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher M. Egleson. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilker, Steven)
January 14, 2011 Filing 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin H. Bell. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilker, Steven)
January 14, 2011 Filing 55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mitchell P. Hurley. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilker, Steven)
January 7, 2011 Filing 54 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike or Compel Disclosure of Defendants' Ex Parte Submissions #51 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Christopher Piehota, #2 Exhibit B - January 4, 20100 Letter to Wizner) (Powell, Amy)
January 7, 2011 Filing 53 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Reply Memorandum). Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment #43 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kelleher, Diane)
December 15, 2010 Filing 52 Memorandum in Support. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike #51 .) (Choudhury, Nusrat)
December 15, 2010 Filing 51 Motion to Strike or Compel Disclosure of Defendants' Ex Parte Submissions. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
December 15, 2010 Filing 50 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Motion for Summary Judgment #43 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wizner, Ben)
December 13, 2010 Filing 49 Notice re Notice #42 of Filing Filed by All Defendants (Related document(s): Notice #42 .) (Kelleher, Diane)
November 29, 2010 Filing 48 MINUTES of Proceedings: R16 Conference. The Court first will address Defendants' jurisdictional and dismissal challenges raised in their Motion to Dismiss and briefed at pages 15-20 of their supporting Memorandum (#44). Plaintiffs' opposition to this portion of Defendants' combined Motions (#43) is due no later than December 15, 2010. Defendants' reply is due no later than January 7, 2011. Oral Argument is set for 1/21/2011, at 1:30 p.m. No later than December 15, 2010, Plaintiffs shall file their Motion and separate supporting Memorandum challenging Defendants' support of their alternative Motion for Summary Judgment with material to which Plaintiffs do not have access. Defendants' opposition is due no later than January 7, 2011. No reply permitted. Oral Argument is SET for 01/21/2011, at 1:30 p.m. See attached. Ben Wizner, Kevin Diaz, Nusrat Choudhury, Steven Wilker present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Amy Powell present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb) Modified on 11/30/2010 to correct dates from 2010 to 2011 (bb).
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. A Telephonic Status Conference is SET for 11/29/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel to e-mail the courtroom deputy with their phone numbers. The Court will initiate the call. (bb)
November 23, 2010 Filing 46 Notice of Filing Substitute Copies of Declarations Submitted in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Giuliano (Cleaner Copy), #2 Declaration of Sharon Raya (Cleaner Copy)) (Powell, Amy)
November 17, 2010 Filing 45 Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment #43 .) (Powell, Amy)
November 17, 2010 Filing 44 Memorandum in Support. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment #43 .) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Christopher Piehota, #2 Attachment Declaration of Mark Giuliano, #3 Attachment Declaration of James Kennedy, #4 Exhibit A to Kennedy Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Kennedy Declaration, #6 Attachment Declaration of Kevin McAleenan, #7 Attachment Declaration of Sharon Raya) (Powell, Amy)
November 17, 2010 Filing 43 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
November 17, 2010 Filing 42 Notice of Lodging Ex Parte, In Camera Material Filed by All Defendants (Powell, Amy)
November 17, 2010 Filing 41 Joint Stipulation Statement of Stipulated Facts by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
November 16, 2010 Filing 40 Unopposed Motion for Status Conference (Expedited Consideration Requested). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration and Exhibit) (Choudhury, Nusrat)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion #37 to Exceed Page Limit in Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants may file a 60 page memorandum in support of their summary judgment motion. (bb)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court acknowledges Plaintiffs' Notice #33 of Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs' Motion #18 for a Preliminary Injunction and Amended Motion #20 for a Preliminary Injunction are WITHDRAWN. (bb)
November 10, 2010 Filing 37 Unopposed Motion to File Excess Pages. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
November 4, 2010 Filing 36 Joint Status Report. Filed by All Parties. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Parties' Joint Motion #34 for a Scheduling Order. Government's Dispositive Motion due 11/17/2010; Plaintiff's separate response due 12/17/2010; Government's Reply due 1/11/2011. Plaintiff's separate cross-motion due 12/17/2010; Government's separate response due 1/11/2011; Plaintiff's separate reply due 1/25/2011. Oral Argument to be set at a later date. Remaining case management dates to be set when motions resolved. (bb)
October 25, 2010 Filing 34 Joint Motion for a Scheduling Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
October 20, 2010 Filing 33 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #18 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #20 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
October 15, 2010 Filing 32 Report : Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent Not to Seek Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion #30 for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction #20 . Response is due by 10/21/2010. Reply is due by 11/4/2010. Motion is taken under advisement as of 11/4/2010. Joint Status Report is due by 11/4/2010. (bb)
October 7, 2010 Filing 30 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Prelimination Injunction. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (Kelleher, Diane)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has completed its review of the Parties' Joint Status Report #28 . Before the Court adopts a schedule for the filing of dispositive motions and before the parties file any dispositive motions, the Court concludes it is necessary for Plaintiffs to decide whether they will seek leave to amend their Complaint and the Court decides, after an appropriate response from Defendants, whether the proposed amendments will be permitted (so that any dispositive motions that are filed deal with all of the issues). Accordingly, Plaintiffs must file no later than October 15, 2010, any motion for leave to amend their Complaint after conferring with Defendants. If Plaintiffs determine before then that they are not going to seek to amend the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall notify the Court and Defendants' counsel, and the Court will then set the schedule for dispositive motions, including any cross-motions for summary judgment. If Plaintffs do file a motion for leave to amend, the Court will set the dispositive motion schedule after the status of Plaintiffs' pleadings are settled. IT IS SO ORDERED. (bb)
September 23, 2010 Filing 28 Joint Status Report by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Oral Argument on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for October 21, 2010 is STRICKEN. (bb)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has completed its consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time #25 to file their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court GRANTS the Motion as follows: Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is now due October 14, 2010; Plaintiff's Reply is now due October 28, 2010; and the Court will set a telephone conference with counsel thereafter to schedule any needed hearing on Plaintiff's Motion. The Court directs the parties to submit an updated Joint Status Report on October 28, 2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. (bb)
September 21, 2010 Filing 25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction #20 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelleher, Diane)
August 25, 2010 Filing 24 MINUTES of Proceedings: Scheduling Conference. Joint Status Report is due 9/23/2010. Response to Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 9/23/2010; Reply due 10/7/2010. Oral Argument is set for 10/21/2010 at 02:00 PM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Ben Wizner, Kevin Diaz, Steven Wilker present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Amy Powell, Diane Kelleher, Jennifer Daskal present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb)
August 18, 2010 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance of James E. Cox, Jr appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Cox, James)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. A Telephonic Conference on the Joint Motion (#17) for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines and Request for Entryof a Scheduling Order is SET for 8/25/2010 at 01:00 PM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel to e-mail the courtroom deputy with their phone numbers. The Court will initiate the call. (bb)
August 16, 2010 Filing 21 Corrected Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #18 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #20 .) (Choudhury, Nusrat)
August 16, 2010 Filing 20 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Choudhury, Nusrat)
August 16, 2010 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #18 .) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abdul Hakeim Ahmed Thabet, #2 Declaration of Abdullatif Muthanna, #3 Declaration of Ayman Latif, #4 Declaration of Ben Wizner, #5 Declaration of Elias Mustafa Mohamed, #6 Declaration of Faisal Kashem, #7 Declaration of Raymond Earl Knaeble IV, #8 Declaration of Saleh A. Omar, #9 Declaration of Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, #10 Declaration of Steven William Washburn) (Wizner, Ben)
August 16, 2010 Filing 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wizner, Ben)
August 12, 2010 Filing 17 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines and Request for Entry of a Scheduling Order. Filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelleher, Diane)
August 10, 2010 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Amy Elizabeth Powell appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy)
August 6, 2010 Filing 15 First Amended Complaint.Filed by Adama Bah, Halime Sat, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Saleh A. Omar, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Ayman Latif, Steven Washburn, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna against All Defendants. (Wizner, Ben)
August 3, 2010 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Diane Kelleher appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Kelleher, Diane)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order -Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ben Wizner for Adama Bah,Ben Wizner for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Ben Wizner for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Ben Wizner for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Ben Wizner for Ayman Latif,Ben Wizner for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Ben Wizner for Abdullatif Muthanna,Ben Wizner for Saleh A. Omar,Ben Wizner for Halime Sat,Ben Wizner for Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 34539 issued. Signed on 7/14/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan L. Schlosser for Adama Bah,Alan L. Schlosser for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Alan L. Schlosser for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Alan L. Schlosser for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Alan L. Schlosser for Ayman Latif,Alan L. Schlosser for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Alan L. Schlosser for Abdullatif Muthanna,Alan L. Schlosser for Saleh A. Omar,Alan L. Schlosser for Halime Sat,Alan L. Schlosser for Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 34531 issued. Signed on 7/14/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura Schauer Ives for Adama Bah,Laura Schauer Ives for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Laura Schauer Ives for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Laura Schauer Ives for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Laura Schauer Ives for Ayman Latif,Laura Schauer Ives for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Laura Schauer Ives for Abdullatif Muthanna,Laura Schauer Ives for Saleh A. Omar,Laura Schauer Ives for Halime Sat,Laura Schauer Ives for Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 34537 issued. Signed on 7/14/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Reem Salahi for Adama Bah,Reem Salahi for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Reem Salahi for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Reem Salahi for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Reem Salahi for Ayman Latif,Reem Salahi for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Reem Salahi for Abdullatif Muthanna,Reem Salahi for Saleh A. Omar,Reem Salahi for Halime Sat,Reem Salahi for Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 34533 issued. Signed on 7/14/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order -Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Pasquarella for Adama Bah,Jennifer Pasquarella for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Jennifer Pasquarella for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Jennifer Pasquarella for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Jennifer Pasquarella for Ayman Latif,Jennifer Pasquarella for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Jennifer Pasquarella for Abdullatif Muthanna,Jennifer Pasquarella for Saleh A. Omar,Jennifer Pasquarella for Halime Sat,Jennifer Pasquarella for Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 34534 issued. Signed on 7/14/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order -Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julia Harumi Mass for Adama Bah,Julia Harumi Mass for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Julia Harumi Mass for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Julia Harumi Mass for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Julia Harumi Mass for Ayman Latif,Julia Harumi Mass for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Julia Harumi Mass for Abdullatif Muthanna,Julia Harumi Mass for Saleh A. Omar,Julia Harumi Mass for Halime Sat,Julia Harumi Mass for Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 34529 issued. Signed on 7/14/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Adama Bah,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Ayman Latif,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Abdullatif Muthanna,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Saleh A. Omar,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Halime Sat,Nusrat Jahan Choudhury for Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 34540 issued. Signed on 7/14/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ahilan Arulanantham for Adama Bah,Ahilan Arulanantham for Nagib Ali Ghaleb,Ahilan Arulanantham for Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye,Ahilan Arulanantham for Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV,Ahilan Arulanantham for Ayman Latif,Ahilan Arulanantham for Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed,Ahilan Arulanantham for Abdullatif Muthanna,Ahilan Arulanantham for Saleh A. Omar,Ahilan Arulanantham for Halime Sat,Ahilan Arulanantham for Steven Washburn. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 34535 issued. Signed on 7/14/2010 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 9, 2010 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service upon Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 7/7/2010 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilker, Steven)
July 9, 2010 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon United States Department of Justice served on 7/7/2010 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilker, Steven)
July 9, 2010 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service upon Terrorist Screening Center served on 7/7/2010 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilker, Steven)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. Discovery is to be completed by 10/28/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/29/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 11/29/2010. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (eo)
June 30, 2010 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 34302. Summons issued as to Eric H. Holder, Jr.; Robert S. Mueller, III; and Timothy J. Healy.Filed by Adama Bah, Halime Sat, Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV, Saleh A. Omar, Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye, Ayman Latif, Steven Washburn, Nagib Ali Ghaleb, Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed, Abdullatif Muthanna against Federal Bureau of Investigation, Terrorist Screening Center, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2014: #2 summons) (dnt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latif et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mashaal Rana
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Earl Knaeble, IV
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayman Latif
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagib Ali Ghaleb
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibraheim Y. Mashal
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adama Bah
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Sheikh Abdirahm Kariye
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Durga Persaud
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: William J. Genego
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Justine Fischer
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Joel P. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Meshal
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halime Sat
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullatif Muthanna
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Mohamed Ahmed Mohamed
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Mustafa Mohamed
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven William Washburn
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Hakeim Thabet Ahmed
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah Ali Ahmed
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faisal Nabin Kashem
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saleh A. Omar
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Washburn
Represented By: Christopher M. Egleson
Represented By: Catherine A. Wagner
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alan L. Schlosser
Represented By: Kevin Diaz
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Justin H. Bell
Represented By: Jennifer Pasquarella
Represented By: Ahilan Arulanantham
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Reem Salahi
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrorist Screening Center
Represented By: Samuel M. Singer
Represented By: Scott A. Risner
Represented By: Adam D. Kirschner
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Powell
Represented By: James E. Cox, Jr.
Represented By: Brigham J. Bowen
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: Lily S. Farel
Represented By: James Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Samuel M. Singer
Represented By: Scott A. Risner
Represented By: Adam D. Kirschner
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Powell
Represented By: James E. Cox, Jr.
Represented By: Brigham J. Bowen
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: Lily S. Farel
Represented By: James Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Samuel M. Singer
Represented By: Scott A. Risner
Represented By: Adam D. Kirschner
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Powell
Represented By: James E. Cox, Jr.
Represented By: Brigham J. Bowen
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Represented By: Lily S. Farel
Represented By: James Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Constitution Project
Represented By: Devin N. Robinson
Represented By: Rita M. Siemion
Represented By: Alexandra F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?