Multibank 2009-1 RES-ADC Venture, LLC v. PineCrest at Neskowin, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Multibank 2009-1 RES-ADC Venture, LLC
Defendant: PineCrest at Neskowin, LLC, Unit Owners Association of Pinecrest, Michael D. Freeman and Melanie S. Freeman
Counter Defendant: PineCrest at Neskowin, LLC, Unit Owners Association of Pinecrest, Michael D. Freeman, Melanie S. Freeman and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Counter Claimant: Unit Owners Association of Pinecrest, PineCrest at Neskowin, LLC, Michael D. Freeman, Melanie S. Freeman and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
ThirdParty Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00853
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Judgment of Dismissal. Signed on 09/10/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: Order Granting Stipulation and Joint Motion to Dismiss 139 . Signed on 09/09/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION AND ORDER: The Court, therefore, GRANTS Plaintiff Multibank's Motion for Summary Judgment as herein specified. See 5-page supplemental opinion and order attached. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (mr)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: The Court GRANTS FDIC's Motion 84 for Partial Summary Judgment joined by Multibank 88 , GRANTS Plaintiff Multibank's Motion 89 for Summary Judgment joined by FDIC 84 , and DENIES Defendant's Motion 92 Summary Judgment. See attached 23 page Opinion and Order for full text. Signed on 04/10/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion 35 for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Third Amended Affirmative Defenses. Defendants shall file the final version of their First Amended Answer and Third Amended Affirmative Defenses in a form consistent with this Opinion and Order no later than March 16, 2012, and any pleadings responsive to Defendants amended pleading must be filed no later than March 26, 2012. To assist the Court insetting a reasonable case-management schedule, the parties shall submit no later than April 6, 2012, their jointly proposed schedule. Signed on 03/08/2012 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 24 page Opinion and Order. (bb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Multibank 2009-1 RES-ADC Venture, LLC v. PineCrest at Neskowin, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PineCrest at Neskowin, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Unit Owners Association of Pinecrest
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Michael D. Freeman
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Melanie S. Freeman
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: William A. Drew
Represented By: Joel P. Leonard
Represented By: John D. Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PineCrest at Neskowin, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Owners Association of Pinecrest
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Freeman
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie S. Freeman
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Unit Owners Association of Pinecrest
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: PineCrest at Neskowin, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael D. Freeman
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Melanie S. Freeman
Represented By: Paul R. J. Connolly
Represented By: Kevin J. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John D. Ostrander
Represented By: Joel P. Leonard
Represented By: William A. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multibank 2009-1 RES-ADC Venture, LLC
Represented By: Stephen H. Galloway
Represented By: Christine A. Kosydar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John D. Ostrander
Represented By: Joel P. Leonard
Represented By: William A. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?