Erickson v. Blake Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lars Erickson
Defendant: Michael John Blake
Case Number: 3:2011cv01129
Filed: September 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Simon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2012 Filing 24 Bill of Costs . Filed by Michael John Blake. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Bill of Costs) (Joncus, Stephen)
April 26, 2012 Filing 23 Declaration of Stephen Joncus . Filed by Michael John Blake. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 22 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7) (Joncus, Stephen)
April 26, 2012 Filing 22 Motion for Attorney Fees . Filed by Michael John Blake. (Joncus, Stephen)
April 16, 2012 Filing 21 Copyright Report: Closing Report submitted pursuant to Title 17 Sec. 508(a). Sent to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Washington, D.C.. (sm)
April 12, 2012 Filing 20 Judgment. Signed on 4/12/12 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 16, 2012 Filing 19 Order - Plaintiff is given leave to file an Amended Complaint if he believes that an amendment can cure the deficiencies identified in the Opinion and Order. Amended Complaint is due by 3/28/2012. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 14, 2012 Filing 18 Opinion and Order - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 10 is GRANTED. Signed on 3/14/12 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (mja).
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order 16 . The pretrial deadlines are stayed pending the Court's ruling on the Motion to dismiss 10 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 6, 2012 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion to Vacate The Scheduling Order Discovery order, 3 . Filed by Michael John Blake. (Joncus, Stephen)
January 23, 2012 Filing 15 Supplement Blake's Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief. Filed by Michael John Blake. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 14 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
January 10, 2012 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Response to Unopposed Motion For The Court To Consider Defendant's Motion To Dismiss On The Filed Papers 10 . Filed by Lars Erickson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment exhibit) (mja)
January 9, 2012 Filing 13 Declaration of Stephen Joncus in Support of Blake's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Michael John Blake. (Related document(s): Supplement 12 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Joncus, Stephen)
January 9, 2012 Filing 12 Supplement Blake's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Michael John Blake. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous 10 .) (Joncus, Stephen)
December 9, 2011 Filing 11 MINUTES of Telephone Conference: Order - Defendant's Unopposed Motion For The Court To Consider Defendant's Motion To Dismiss On The Filed Papers 10 is DEFERRED. Additional brief may be submitted by 1/9/2012. Response due 1/23/2012. Lars Erickson (pro se) present for plaintiff. Stephen J. Joncus present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
December 8, 2011 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion For The Court To Consider Defendant's Motion To Dismiss On The Filed Papers. Filed by Michael John Blake. (Joncus, Stephen)
December 6, 2011 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Plaintiff (pro se) on 12/6/2011. (mja)
December 6, 2011 Filing 8 Order - Defendant's Motion for a Rule 16 Status Conference 7 is GRANTED. Setting a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for 12/9/2011 at 9:30AM. The Court will initiate the call to the parties. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 2, 2011 Filing 7 Motion for Order [Corrected] Defendant's Request For A Rule 16 Status Conference. Filed by Michael John Blake. (Joncus, Stephen)
December 2, 2011 Filing 6 Request for A Rule 16 Status Conference. Filed by Michael John Blake. (Joncus, Stephen)
November 3, 2011 Filing 5 Notification of e-mail service of Discovery order # 3 . The Clerk's Office has emailed counsel at the addresses provided on the docket sheet from the District of Nebraska with a copy of the Discovery Order and the requirements for attorney admission. (eo)
October 7, 2011 Filing 4 Notice of Service Filed by Michael John Blake (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Joncus, Stephen) Modified exhibit names to remove duplicate text on 10/11/2011 (sd).
October 7, 2011 Filing 3 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon. Discovery is to be completed by 2/6/2012. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/5/2012. Pretrial Order is due by 3/5/2012. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sd)
September 26, 2011 Filing 2 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Case Transfer 1 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record:Transfer Documents were inadvertently stamped with a CR code instead of a CV code with the case number. Please be advised that the correct case number is actually 3:11-cv-01129-SI. (sd)
September 19, 2011 Filing 1 Original File, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Nebraska containing documents numbered 1 - 28. Transfer Court Case Number: 8:11-CV-127. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Docket for Nebraska Case 11-CV-127, # 2 Attachment Doc. 1 Complaint, # 3 Exhibit A and B attached to Complaint, # 4 Attachment Doc. 3 Report of Copyright Infringement, # 5 Attachment Doc. 4 and 5 Summons Requested, Summons Issued for Michael John Blake, # 6 Attachment Doc. 6 Summons Returned Executed, # 7 Attachment Doc.7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, # 8 Attachment Doc. 9 Scheduling Letter, # 9 Attachment Doc. 10 Application/Order admitting pro hac vice Attorney Stephen J. Joncus for Defendant M.J. Blake, # 10 Attachment Doc. 11 Motion to Dismiss, # 11 Attachment Doc. 12 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 12 attachment Doc. 13 Index in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 13 Doc. 13-1 attachments to Doc. 13, # 14 Attachment Doc. 14 Application/Order admitting pro hac vice Attorney Brooks Rice for Defendant M. J. Blake, # 15 Attachment Doc. 16 Notice of Appearance by Attorney Brooks Rice, # 16 Attachment Doc. 17 Application/Order admitting pro hac vice Amy E. Mitchell for Defendant M. J. Blake, # 17 Attachment Doc. 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Reply, # 18 Attachment Doc. 20 Notice of Appearance by Attorney Amy E. Mitchell for Defendant M. J. Blake, # 19 Attachment Doc. 21 Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 20 Attachment Doc. 22 Plaintiff's Index in Support of Brief in Response, # 21 Exhibit 1 attached to Doc. 22, # 22 Attachment Doc. 23 Index of Evidence in Support of Brief 21 and Index 22, # 23 Attachment Doc. 24 Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 24 Attachment Doc. 25 Defendant's Index in Support of Reply Brief 24, # 25 Exhibit 1 attached to 25, # 26 Attachment Transmittal Letter to USDC Oregon, # 27 Attachment Doc. 28 Report on the determination filed on 8/10/11 regarding Copyright Infringement) (msk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson v. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael John Blake
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lars Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?