Kelley et al v. Morton et al

Counter Claimant: City of Fairview, Officer Joe Kaiser and Officer Michael Morton
Defendant: City of Fairview, Officer Joe Kaiser and Officer Michael Morton
Counter Defendant: Sandra Kelley, Chance McKinney, Stevie McKinney and Stormy McKinney
Plaintiff: Sandra Kelley, Chance McKinney, Stevie McKinney and Stormy McKinney
Case Number: 3:2012cv01647
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Motion to Dismiss defendant Joe Kaiser 20 . Signed on 8/29/13 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr)
September 17, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Stewarts Findings and Recommendation 61 . Accordingly, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants Motion 34 for Partial Summary Judgment as stated in the attached Order. Signed on 09/17/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
February 24, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Dismissing Estate of Larry McKinney with prejudice. Signed on 02/23/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley et al v. Morton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: City of Fairview
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Officer Joe Kaiser
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Officer Michael Morton
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairview
Represented By: Leslie Anne Edenhofer
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Joe Kaiser
Represented By: Leslie Anne Edenhofer
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michael Morton
Represented By: Leslie Anne Edenhofer
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sandra Kelley
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Represented By: Sara K. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Chance McKinney
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Represented By: Sara K. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stevie McKinney
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Represented By: Sara K. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stormy McKinney
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Represented By: Sara K. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Kelley
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Represented By: Sara K. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chance McKinney
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Represented By: Sara K. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevie McKinney
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Represented By: Sara K. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormy McKinney
Represented By: Michelle R. Burrows
Represented By: Sara K. Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.