Lyden v. Nike Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert M. Lyden
Defendant: Nike Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00662
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's motion to dismiss 8 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: claim three for negligent interference with economic relations is dismissed with prejudice; claims two, five and six for intentional int erference with economic relations, fraud, and unjust enrichment are dismissed; and claim four for conversion may proceed. Additionally, the motion to strike 8 is denied as moot, and motion to stay 9 is denied. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of this order. See 13-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 10/22/2013 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
November 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff's amended complaint 20 is dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 8. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint within 14 days of this order. See 4-page opinion & order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
June 6, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's motion to dismiss 28 is granted. Plaintiff's second, third, and fourth claims are dismissed with prejudice. See 12-page opinion & order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
September 15, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 44 is denied. See 4-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 9/15/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyden v. Nike Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Lyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.