Fikre v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Plaintiff: Yonas Fikre
Defendant: Jason Dundas, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Timothy Healy, Eric Holder, John Kerry, Robert S. Mueller, III, David Noordeloos and State Department
Case Number: 3:2013cv00899
Filed: May 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 OPINION AND ORDER: I GRANT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 146 and DISMISSPlaintiff's Seventh Amended Complaint 145 in its entirety, with prejudice. Signed on 8/12/20 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiff's Motion (# 125 ) to Amend. Plaintiff may amend his Complaint to remove previously resolved claims, to plead additional factual allegations related to Plaintiff's due -process claims, and to add the DHS Secretary and the TSA Administrator as defendants. Plaintiff may not, however, add the CBP Commissioner as a defendant or add any new claims. The Court directs Plaintiff to file his Sixth AmendedComplaint consiste nt with this Opinion and Order no later than May 20, 2019. As the Court indicated in its Scheduling Order (# 124 ) issued February 26, 2019, Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Sixth Amended Complaint is due no later than June 19, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 5/8/19 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached order for further details. (jy)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order. On October 6, 2016, Plaintiff filed a Notice 106 in which he stated he does not object to this Court dismissing this action as to the Individual Capacity Defendants. Accordingly, on this record the Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice as to Individual Capacity Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed on 10/24/2016 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached Order. (bb)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Opinion and Order: The Court GRANTS Official Capacity Defendants Motion 90 to Dismiss and DISMISSES with prejudice Plaintiffs Fifth Amended Complaint as to Plaintiffs claims against Official Capacity Defendants. The Court also DENIES as moot Official Capacity Defendants Unopposed Motion 91 to Stay Plaintiffs Due Process Claims. After more than three years of litigation the record still reflects none of Individual Capacity Defendants identified in Plaintiffs FAC have been served . Accordingly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), the Court directs Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than October 14, 2016, why this action should not be dismissed as to Individual Capacity Defendants. Signed on 09/28/2016 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 47 page Opinion and Order. (bb)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Opinion and Order: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Official Capacity Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 69 as stated in the attached 49 page Opinion and Order. Plaintiff has leave to amend claim sixteen only as to injunctive relief and claim seventeen no later than 11/27/2015. Signed on 11/4/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Opinion and Order: The Court GRANTS the Official Capacity Defendants Motion 21 to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction; DISMISSES with prejudice Claim One; DISMISSES without prejudice Claims Two, Five, and Six with leave to file a Second Amended Complaint consistent with this Opinion and Order no later than June 27, 2014; and directs these Defendants to file their responsive pleading to the Second Amended Complaint no later than July 25, 2014. Signed on 05/29/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 30 page Opinion and Order for full text. (bb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fikre v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mueller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Noordeloos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonas Fikre
Represented By: Gadeir I. Abbas
Represented By: Thomas H. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?