Howard v. Maximus, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Melvin J. Howard |
Defendant: |
Maximus, Inc., Steve Kitcher and Joanne Platt |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv01111 |
Filed: |
July 2, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Oregon |
Office: |
Portland (3) Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Janice M. Stewart |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 6, 2014 |
Filing
48
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS that portion of Magistrate Judge Stewarts Findings and Recommendation 42 in which she recommends the Court GRANT Defendant Maximus Inc.s Motion 36 to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and DISMISSES this matter with prejudice. Signed on 08/06/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 5 page Order for full text. (bb)
|
February 5, 2014 |
Filing
31
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS that portion of Magistrate Judge Stewarts Findings and Recommendation 27 in which she recommends the Court GRANT Defendant's Motion 20 to Dismiss Plaintiffs § 1983 claims with prejudice and Plaintiffs RICO and Piercing the Corporate Veil claims. The Court, however, DISMISSES Plaintiffs RICO and Piercing the Corporate Veil claims without prejudice. The Court also GRANTS leave to Plaintiff to file an amended complaint no later than February 24, 2 014, only as to his RICO and Piercing the Corporate Veil claims to attempt to cure the deficiencies set out in the Findings and Recommendations. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, the Magistrate Judge shall review the amended complaint to de termine whether Plaintiff has cured the deficiencies. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint and cure the deficiencies by February 24, 2014, the Court will dismiss this matter with prejudice. See attached 7 page Order for full text. Signed on 02/05/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?