Deering v. Galena Biopharma, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael E. Deering
Defendant: Mark J. Ahn, Ryan M. Dunlap, Galena Biopharma, Inc. and Mark W. Schwartz
Case Number: 3:2014cv00367
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis J. Hubel
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Order Granting Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Signed on 11/21/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00367-SI, 3:14-cv-00389-SI, 3:14-cv-00410-SI, 3:14-cv-00435-SI, 3:14-cv-00558-SI (mja)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Opinion and Order Awarding Attorney's Fees - In the Derivative Action, the motion for attorney's fees and incentive awards (Derivative Action ECF 117) is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' counsel in the Derivative Action is awarded $4. 5 million in attorney's fees plus $153,081.02 for expenses. Derivative Plaintiffs Klein and Rathore are each awarded $5,000 as an incentive award, to be paid out of the award of attorney's fees, per the parties' stipulation. In the Securities Action, the motion for attorney's fees, expenses, and incentive awards (Securities Action ECF 176 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Class Counsel in the Securities Action is awarded $4.5 million in attorney's fees plus $112 ,534.65 for expenses. The four named representatives are each awarded $5,000 as an incentive award, to be paid out of the Settlement Fund, per the parties' stipulation. Signed on 6/24/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00367-SI, 3:14-cv-00389-SI, 3:14-cv-00410-SI, 3:14-cv-00435-SI, 3:14-cv-00558-SI (mja)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Opinion and Order - The motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Rudolph Nisi, Sanford Hillsberg, Steven Kriegsman, Stephen Galliker, and Richard Chin (Dkt. 80 ); the motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Mark J. Ahn (Dkt. 81 ); the motion to dismiss f iled by Defendants Mark Schwartz, Ryan Dunlap, Remy Bernarda, and Galena (Dkt. 82 ); the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Lidingo and Kamilla Bjorlin (Dkt. 136 ); and the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants DreamTeam and Michael McCarthy (Dk t. 138 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set forth herein. Plaintiffs have leave to file an amended complaint within 28 days from the date of this Opinion and Order. Signed on 8/5/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00367-SI, 3:14-cv-00389-SI, 3:14-cv-00410-SI, 3:14-cv-00435-SI, 3:14-cv-00558-SI (mja)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deering v. Galena Biopharma, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Ahn
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Lois O. Rosenbaum
Represented By: James P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan M. Dunlap
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Lois O. Rosenbaum
Represented By: James P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galena Biopharma, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Lois O. Rosenbaum
Represented By: James P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark W. Schwartz
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Lois O. Rosenbaum
Represented By: James P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Deering
Represented By: Justine Fischer
Represented By: David C. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?