Werbowksky v. Hillsberg et al
Plaintiff: |
Elanor Werbowksky |
Defendant: |
Mark J. Ahn, Richard Chin, Galena Biopharma, Inc., Stephen S. Galliker, Sanford Hillsberg, Steven A. Kriegsman and Rudolph Nisi |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00382 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Oregon |
Office: |
Portland (3) Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Dennis J. Hubel |
Nature of Suit: |
Stockholder's Suits |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 24, 2016 |
Filing
140
Opinion and Order Awarding Attorney's Fees - In the Derivative Action, the motion for attorney's fees and incentive awards (Derivative Action ECF 117 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' counsel in the Derivative Action is awarded $ 4.5 million in attorney's fees plus $153,081.02 for expenses. Derivative Plaintiffs Klein and Rathore are each awarded $5,000 as an incentive award, to be paid out of the award of attorney's fees, per the parties' stipulation . In the Securities Action, the motion for attorney's fees, expenses, and incentive awards (Securities Action ECF 176) is GRANTED IN PART. Class Counsel in the Securities Action is awarded $4.5 million in attorney's fees plus $112 ,534.65 for expenses. The four named representatives are each awarded $5,000 as an incentive award, to be paid out of the Settlement Fund, per the parties' stipulation. Signed on 6/24/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00382-SI, 3:14-cv-00514-SI, 3:14-cv-00516-SI, 3:15-cv-01465-SI (mja)
|
February 4, 2015 |
Filing
76
Opinion and Order - The Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 52 ) and Defendant Ahn's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 60 ) are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth in this Opinion and Order. Plaintiffs shall have 30 days from the date of this Opinion and Order to file an amended complaint. Signed on 2/4/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00382-SI, 3:14-cv-00514-SI, 3:14-cv-00516-SI (mja)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing
48
Opinion and Order - Galena's motion for reconsideration (Dkt. 45 ) is DENIED. Signed on 10/30/2014 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00382-SI, 3:14-cv-00514-SI, 3:14-cv-00516-SI (mja)
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
44
Opinion and Order - Galena's motion to stay (Dkt. 38 ) is DENIED. Signed on 10/22/2014 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00382-SI, 3:14-cv-00514-SI, 3:14-cv-00516-SI (mja)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?