Richardson et al v. Shubert et al
Plaintiff: I.R., James Powell, Kelly J. Richardson and S.P.
Defendant: Carlos Crutch, Kristin Lemon, Danielle Santili-Day, Emilie Schubert, Jennie Smith, Ginger VanWinkle, Lindsey VerNooy and Erin Wirtz
Case Number: 3:2014cv01027
Filed: June 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER. The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge You's Findings & Recommendation 168 . Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 157 is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 9/7/2017 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (pvh)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: ADOPTING Magistrate Judge Stewart's Findings & Recommendation 112 . Accordingly, Arizona Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 95 is granted as to the claims against Arizona Defendants after receipt of the Oregon court order on June 27, 2012, and is otherwise denied. It Is So Ordered. Signed on 12/28/15 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jlr)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Stewart's Findings & Recommendation 84 . Accordingly, Oregon Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment 58 is denied as to the Fourteenth Amendment claim based on Defendant Wirtz' ;s and Defendant Smith's prosecutorial conduct which resulted in issuance of the initial protective order by the Oregon court on June 26, 2012. The Motion is otherwise granted. See 2-page order attached. Signed on 8/3/2015 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Stewart's Findings & Recommendation 40 . Accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 28 is denied. See 2-page order attached. Signed on 12/29/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson et al v. Shubert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Crutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Santili-Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilie Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger VanWinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey VerNooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Wirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.R.
Represented By: Michael Henderson
Represented By: Mikel R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Powell
Represented By: Michael Henderson
Represented By: Mikel R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly J. Richardson
Represented By: Michael Henderson
Represented By: Mikel R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.P.
Represented By: Michael Henderson
Represented By: Mikel R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?