Rentmeester v. Nike, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jacobus Rentmeester
Defendant: Nike, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00113
Filed: January 22, 2015
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Mosman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2015 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Katherine C. Lubin (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: kclubin. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss)
January 28, 2015 13 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine C. Lubin for Jacobus Rentmeester. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3980545 issued. Signed on 1/28/2015 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
January 28, 2015 12 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Dean M. Harvey (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: dmharvey. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss)
January 28, 2015 11 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dean M. Harvey for Jacobus Rentmeester. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3980528 issued. Signed on 1/28/2015 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
January 28, 2015 10 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Eric B. Fastiff (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: ebfastiff. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss)
January 28, 2015 9 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric B. Fastiff for Jacobus Rentmeester. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3980507 issued. Signed on 1/28/2015 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
January 26, 2015 8 Affidavit of Service of Complaint,, 1 upon Nike, Inc. served on 1/23/2015 Filed by Jacobus Rentmeester. (Hoesly, Cody)
January 23, 2015 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nike, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dsg)
January 23, 2015 6 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (dsg)
January 23, 2015 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/26/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/22/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 6/22/2015. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dsg)
January 22, 2015 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine C. Lubin . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3980545. Filed by Jacobus Rentmeester. (Hoesly, Cody)
January 22, 2015 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dean M. Harvey . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3980528. Filed by Jacobus Rentmeester. (Hoesly, Cody)
January 22, 2015 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric B. Fastiff . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3980507. Filed by Jacobus Rentmeester. (Hoesly, Cody)
January 22, 2015 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3980376 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA0001937374--Jordan Photo--Jacobus Rentmeester. Filed by Jacobus Rentmeester against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (Hoesly, Cody) (Main Document replaced on 1/22/2015. Counsel contacted the Clerk's Office and indicated that a non-final draft had been inadvertently filed during case opening. The draft has been replaced with the final version.) (eo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rentmeester v. Nike, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike, Inc.
Represented By: Eric C. Beach
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacobus Rentmeester
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Dean M. Harvey
Represented By: Cody B. Hoesly
Represented By: Katherine C. Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?