Doe et al v. Lake Oswego School District et al
Plaintiff: Child Doe, Jane Doe and John Doe
Defendant: Heather Beck, Lake Oswego School District, Ian Lamont, Ashley Nordlum, Kayla Nordlum, Jennifer Schiele, Unknown Staff and Suzanne Young
Case Number: 3:2015cv00385
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 OPINION AND ORDER. I ADOPT in part and REJECT in part Judge You's F & R 142 . Accordingly, I make the following rulings on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 82 , 83 , and 85 : (1) Ms. Young's Motion for Summary Judgm ent 82 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is DENIED in regards to Plaintiffs' Fourth Claim but GRANTED in regards to every other claim. (2) District Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 83 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is DENIED in regards to Plaintiffs' Fourth Claim but GRANTED in regards to every other claim. (3) The Nordlums' Motion for Summary Judgment 85 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is DENIED in regards to: (1) Plaintiffs' Fourth Claim; (2) Plaintiffs' First and Seventh Claims against Kayla; and (3) Plaintiffs' Sixth Claim against Kayla for damages to S.A. In regards to all other claims, the motion is GRANTED. (4) Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 89 is DENIED. Additionally, I make the following rulings on the parties' other pending requests and motions: (1) The request to substitute the District as a defendant in place of individual defendants is DENIED. (2) The reque st to strike Plaintiffs' prayer for punitive damages is DENIED. (3) The request to strike any reference to "unknown" defendants, "Staff 1," and "Staff 2" is GRANTED. (4) Ms. Young's Motion to Strike 159 is DENIED. (5) Plaintiffs' Motion to File Supplemental Evidence 162 is GRANTED. Signed on 5/25/2017 by Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman. (pvh)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Stewarts recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 54 as my own opinion. Signed on 9/16/15 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Stewarts recommendation and I ADOPT the Amended F&R 47 as my own opinion. Signed on 8/20/15 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Lake Oswego School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Oswego School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Nordlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Nordlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Schiele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Child Doe
Represented By: Leta E. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Leta E. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Leta E. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?