Lorenz et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Cindy Kay Lorenz and David Bryan Lorenz
Defendant: Decision One Mortgage Company LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Gregory P. Dolinajec, Pilar C. French, Lane Powell P.C., Robert E. Maloney, Jr, Mortgage Electronic Registration Company, Northwest Trustee Services, RCO Legal PC, Teresa M. Shill and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00680
Filed: April 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Simon
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION and ORDER - Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Dkts. 60 , 61 , 62 , and 63 ) are GRANTED. Because Plaintiffs have failed to cure the deficiencies in their First Amended Complaint previo usly identified by the Court and because it is clear to the Court that these deficiencies cannot be cured by further amendment, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' Third Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 64 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 10/5/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Opinion and Order - Defendants' three Motions to Dismiss, Dkts. 31 , 40 , and 42 , and Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, Dkt. 45 , are GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint not later than 21 days from the date o f this Opinion and Order. If Plaintiffs choose timely to file a Second Amended Complaint but fail to cure the deficiencies identified in this Opinion and Order, the Court will dismiss this case with prejudice and without leave to file a third amended complaint. Signed on 7/24/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 20 ) is DENIED. To the extent that Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal for Relief from Stay Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal (Dkt. 15 ) is properly considered to be a motion for immediate relief, it is DENIED for the same reasons. Signed on 5/4/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorenz et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decision One Mortgage Company LLC
Represented By: Skyler M. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Robert E. Maloney, Jr.
Represented By: Skyler M. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory P. Dolinajec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilar C. French
Represented By: Skyler M. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Powell P.C.
Represented By: Skyler M. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Maloney, Jr
Represented By: Skyler M. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Company
Represented By: Skyler M. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services
Represented By: Teresa M. Shill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCO Legal PC
Represented By: Teresa M. Shill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa M. Shill
Represented By: Teresa M. Shill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Skyler M. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Kay Lorenz
Represented By: Troy Garrett Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bryan Lorenz
Represented By: Troy Garrett Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?