adidas America, Inc. et al v. Skechers USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas AG and adidas America, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Skechers USA, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv01741 |
Filed: |
September 14, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon |
Office: |
Portland (3) Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John Jelderks |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 3, 2017 |
Filing
184
OPINION & ORDER: With respect to the parties' substantive trademark disputes, the Court rules as follows: The Court DENIES Skechers's motions for summary judgment regarding adidas's trademark infringement claims as to all of the disputed footwear. The Court GRANTS adidas's motions for summary judgment on Skechers's functionality affirmative defense as to the Stan Smith TradeDress and on Skechers's descriptive fair use defense as to the Supernova Mark. The Cou rt also GRANTS adidas's unopposed motion that the parties' 1995 Agreement is valid and has not been superseded.The Court makes the following rulings regarding the parties' remedy disputes: The Court GRANTS in part adidas's moti on that Skechers cannot reduce its profits using overhead costs that it did not actually incur. The Court RESERVES ruling on adidass motions that Skechers cannot deduct income tax expenses from its profits. The Court GRANTS adidas's motions that Skechers cannot reduce its profits by using a royalty rate theory or its likelihood of confusionsurvey results. Lastly, the Court DENIES Skechers's motion that adidas cannot claim reasonable royalty rate damages. Signed on 8/3/2017 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Related documents: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum 132 and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum 151 ). (jp)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing
83
OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's motions to strike 49 and 71 are denied. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction 6 is GRANTED. See 41-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 2/12/2016 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: adidas America, Inc. et al v. Skechers USA, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Adidas International Marketing B.V. |
Represented By: |
Stephen M. Feldman |
Represented By: |
R. Charles Henn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: adidas AG |
Represented By: |
Stephen M. Feldman |
Represented By: |
R. Charles Henn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: adidas America, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Stephen M. Feldman |
Represented By: |
R. Charles Henn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Skechers USA, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Lane Powell, PC |
Represented By: |
Parna A. Mehrbani |
Represented By: |
Daniel M. Petrocelli |
Represented By: |
Jordan Raphael |
Represented By: |
Mark A. Samuels |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?