Securities and Exchange Commission v. Aequitas Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Aequitas Capital Management, Inc., Aequitas Commercial Finance, LLC, Aequitas Holdings, LLC, Aequitas Investment Management, LLC, Aequitas Management, LLC, N. Scott Gillis, Robert J. Jesenik and Brian A. Oliver
Intervenor Plaintiff: Marita Ashmore, Michael Ashmore, Leon Brown, Celia Casas, Marva Fabien, Edward Goodman, Lenetta Goodman, Carolyn Harris, Majid Majidian, Debby Newcomb, John Newcomb, Stanley Okamoto, Parthasarathy Raguram, James Ringle, Phil Ringle, Jody Savara, Elisabeth Secan, John Steinberg, Pamela Steinberg, Honghua Yang and Jin Yang
Intervenor: Mary Ann Beardsley, Warren Beardsley, Mani Rahnama, Nazanin Rahnama, Nima Rahnama, Tom Smith, United Recovery Group For Equality, Deborah Whitman, Randy Whitman, Alan Whitney and Mary Ann Whitney
Interested Party: Lawrence P. Ciuffitelli, Comvest Capital III, L.P., Angela Julien, Greg Julien, James MacDonald, Susan MacDonald, Andrew Nowak, R.F. MacDonald Co., William Ramstein, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Interested Non-Party: Comvest Capital III, L.P. and Comvest Freedom Administration, LLC
Notice Party: Bruce Forman and Weider Health and Fitness
Receiver: Ronald F. Greenspan
Case Number: 3:2016cv00438
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S MOTION TO SELL PERSONAL PROPERTY TO SILVERMINE MEDIA HOLDINGS, LLC, FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS, INTERESTS, CLAIMS AND ENCUMBRANCES (Syncronex, LLC): The Motion 600 is Granted and the Purchase Agreement is approved in its entirety. The Final Hearing to approve the sale, scheduled for 6/12/2018 at 10:00AM, is cancelled. Signed on 5/17/18 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 564 . Weider/Forman's Motion for Entry of Judgment, to Certify Prior Orders for Appeal, and to Stay Prior Orders Pending Appeal 552 is Denied. Signed on 3/14/18 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER: The Court declines to modify or set aside any part of the Opinion & Order 470 . Signed on 12/11/17 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation 336 . Defendant Gillis's Motion to Dismiss 172 is Denied. Signed on 4/20/17 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting the parties' Stipulated Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 . Signed on 3/15/16 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (gm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Aequitas Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aequitas Capital Management, Inc.
Represented By: Sara C. Cotton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Eden
Represented By: Troy D. Greenfield
Represented By: Ivan B. Knauer
Represented By: Brian M. Nichilo
Represented By: Joel A. Parker
Represented By: Lawrence R. Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aequitas Commercial Finance, LLC
Represented By: Sara C. Cotton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Eden
Represented By: Troy D. Greenfield
Represented By: Ivan B. Knauer
Represented By: Brian M. Nichilo
Represented By: Joel A. Parker
Represented By: Lawrence R. Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aequitas Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Sara C. Cotton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Eden
Represented By: Troy D. Greenfield
Represented By: Ivan B. Knauer
Represented By: Brian M. Nichilo
Represented By: Joel A. Parker
Represented By: Lawrence R. Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aequitas Investment Management, LLC
Represented By: Sara C. Cotton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Eden
Represented By: Troy D. Greenfield
Represented By: Ivan B. Knauer
Represented By: Brian M. Nichilo
Represented By: Joel A. Parker
Represented By: Lawrence R. Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aequitas Management, LLC
Represented By: Sara C. Cotton
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Eden
Represented By: Troy D. Greenfield
Represented By: Ivan B. Knauer
Represented By: Brian M. Nichilo
Represented By: Joel A. Parker
Represented By: Lawrence R. Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Scott Gillis
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Ashley M. Simonsen
Represented By: William Douglas Sprague
Represented By: B. Scott Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Jesenik
Represented By: Daniel M. Bruggebrew
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Marc J. Fagel
Represented By: Deena B. Klaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian A. Oliver
Represented By: Larisa A. Meisenheimer
Represented By: Michael B. Merchant
Represented By: Jahan P. Raissi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marita Ashmore
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Michael Ashmore
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Leon Brown
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Celia Casas
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marva Fabien
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Edward Goodman
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lenetta Goodman
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carolyn Harris
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Majid Majidian
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Debby Newcomb
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: John Newcomb
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stanley Okamoto
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Parthasarathy Raguram
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: James Ringle
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Phil Ringle
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jody Savara
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Elisabeth Secan
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: John Steinberg
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Pamela Steinberg
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Honghua Yang
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jin Yang
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria D. Blachly
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mary Ann Beardsley
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Warren Beardsley
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mani Rahnama
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Nazanin Rahnama
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Nima Rahnama
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Tom Smith
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United Recovery Group For Equality
Represented By: Teresa H. Pearson
Represented By: Dennis P. Rawlinson
Represented By: Joshua M. Sasaki
Represented By: Justin C. Sawyer
Represented By: Jeanne K. Sinnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Deborah Whitman
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Randy Whitman
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alan Whitney
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mary Ann Whitney
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Esler
Represented By: Christopher J. Kayser
Represented By: John W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lawrence P. Ciuffitelli
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Comvest Capital III, L.P.
Represented By: Jeff S. Pitzer
Represented By: David A. Wender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Angela Julien
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Greg Julien
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: James MacDonald
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Susan MacDonald
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Andrew Nowak
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: R.F. MacDonald Co.
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William Ramstein
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Dechert LLP
Represented By: Brian E. Greer
Represented By: Mary J Heston
Represented By: Milo Petranovich
Represented By: Neil A. Steiner
Represented By: John M. Timperio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Dechert LLP
Represented By: Brian E. Greer
Represented By: Mary J Heston
Represented By: Milo Petranovich
Represented By: Neil A. Steiner
Represented By: John M. Timperio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested non-party: Comvest Capital III, L.P.
Represented By: Jeff S. Pitzer
Represented By: David A. Wender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested non-party: Comvest Freedom Administration, LLC
Represented By: Jeff S. Pitzer
Represented By: David A. Wender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice party: Bruce Forman
Represented By: Benjamin C. Seiken
Represented By: Mark Shinderman
Represented By: Delilah G. Vinzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice party: Weider Health and Fitness
Represented By: Mark Shinderman
Represented By: Delilah G. Vinzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Ronald F. Greenspan
Represented By: Steven K. Blackhurst
Represented By: Joel A. Parker
Represented By: Lawrence R. Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Sheila E. O'Callaghan
Represented By: Wade M. Rhyne
Represented By: Brent D. Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?