Ciuffitelli et al v. Deloitte & Touche LLP et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence P. Ciuffitelli, Angela Julien, Greg Julien, James MacDonald, Susan MacDonald, Andrew Nowak, R.F. MacDonald Co. and William Ramstein
Defendant: Deloitte & Touche LLP, EisnerAmper LLP, Sidley Austin LLP and Tonkon Torp LLP
Case Number: 3:2016cv00580
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 - Diversity: Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation 665 and finds Lake Avenue is the appropriate party to receive Northern Lights' pro-rata distribution from the Settlements. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED: February 16, 2021 by United States District Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (pjg) Modified filed date on 2/18/2021 (pjg).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER: the Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendations 619 , and therefore, 1. The Class is certified as a class action for purposes of these Settlements. The Class Representatives are appointed as class repr esentatives for the Class. Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter P.C. are appointed as Lead Class Counsel and Banks Law Office, P.C. should be appointed as additional Class Counsel; 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement 592 is granted; 3. The terms of the stipulated settlement agreements for each of: a) the Tonkon Settlement [334-1; 590-1]; b) the Integrity Settlement [538-1]; and c) the Global Settlement [574-1] are i ncorporated into the final orders and are approved. Tonkon's and Integrity's Motions for Joinder in Class Representatives' Request for Entry of a Limited Judgment of Dismissal [595, 601] are granted; 4. The Plan of Allocation is appro ved; 5. Final Judgments as submitted to the Court and substantially as contemplated in each of the stipulations of settlement for each of: a) the Tonkon Settlement; b) the Integrity Settlement; and c) the Global Settlement, will be entered; 6. The parties to the proceedings, the parties to the Settlements and the Claims Administrator will perform their respective obligations under the Settlements and final Order; 7. Class Counsel's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs [596 , 610], are granted; 8. Class Counsel is awarded a total attorneys' fees of $57,922,600 out of the common fund. The Claims Administrator is ordered to pay the awarded attorneys' fees from the common fund as provided in the stipulatio ns of settlement; 9. Class Counsel is awarded costs of $208,884.66. The Claims Administrator is ordered to pay the awarded costs to Class Counsel from the common fund as provided in the stipulations of settlement; 10. Each of the individual Cl ass Representatives (Lawrence Ciuffitelli, Greg Julien, Angela Julien, James MacDonald, Susan MacDonald, William Ramstein, Greg Warrick, and Susan Warrick), are awarded an incentive award of $10,000 from the common fund (a total of $80,000 ), for their service in prosecuting this Action. The Claims Administrator is ordered to pay these incentive awards to the Class Representatives from the common fund following the Effective Date of the Settlements; 11. The Court finds that during the course of this Action, all parties and their respective counsel at all times complied with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11; 12. The Court reserves continuing and exclusive jurisdiction over the Settlements, including all future proceedings, if any, concerning the administration, consummation, and enforcement of the settlement agreements. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 16th day of December, 2019, by United States District Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (pjg)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER by Judge Hernandez -- The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings & Recommendations 579 , 580 and 581 , and therefore, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Global Settlement 573 , and Plaintiffs ' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement with Integrity Bank 537 are granted. In a May 29, 2019, Order 566 , the Court previously granted Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement with Tonko n Torp 350 . Contemporaneously with this Order, the Court enters formal Orders Preliminarily Approving of the three settlements which were previously docketed as proposed orders at ECF 389-2, 537-1, and 573-1. The terms of those Orders are effective upon filing and govern all aspects of the settlement going forward. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 7th day of August, 2019, by United States District Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (peg)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 579 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Preliminarily Approving Tonkon Torp LLP Settlement and Providing Notice - (1) The Settlement Hearing shall be held before the Honorable John V. Acosta on Tuesday, November 26, 2019, at 9 a.m., at the Mark 0. Hatfield Court house, United States District Court for the District of Oregon, 1000 SW Third Ave., Portland, OR 97204. (2) Pending final determination of whether the Settlement should be approved or further order of the Court, the Court hereby stays all litigation of claims and related discovery between the Class and Tonkon in the Action, except as provided in the Stipulation and as necessary to carry out the terms and conditions of the Stipulation. (3) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will refer its Findings and R ecommendation to a district judge. Objections, ifany, are due within fourteen (14) days. If no objections are filed, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, a response is due within fourteen (14 ) days. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. Dated this 15th day of July, 2019, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg) Modified on 7/16/2019 (peg). Modified on 7/16/2019 (peg).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER - The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings & Recommendation 481 , and therefore, Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Partial Settlement and Notice 350 is GRANTED. It is further Ordered that: (1) the "Class" as defined in Exhibit 1 (ECF 389-1) is provisionally certified; (2) the Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice (ECF 389-2) shall be entered; (3) the Plan of Allocation (ECF 389-3) is approved; (4) the Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action (ECF 389-4) and the Summary Notice (ECF 389-5) are approved; (5) the Claims Administrator is approved; (6) the Court appoints Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Schlacter P.S. as Class Co-Lead counsel; and (7) the Proposed Schedule of Events set forth in the AmendedMotion is to be followed. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 29th day of May, 2019, by United States District Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (peg)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 466 OPINION and ORDER - Upon careful review, I agree with Judge Acosta's analysis, and I affirm his Order (ECF #421) denying Deloitte's Motion to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Financial Condition and Damages Documents. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 21st day of February, 2019, by Chief United States District Judge Michael W. Mosman. (peg)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 OPINION AND ORDER: The Intervenors' Motion (ECF No. 196 ) for Protective Order is DENIED. Signed on 3/1/2017 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (kms)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 OPINION AND ORDER: The Moving Defendants' motions (ECF Nos. 160 , 171 , and 175 ) for protective order are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed on 2/21/2017 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (kms)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 OPINION and ORDER - For the reasons stated, the Accounting Firms' motions for protective order 139 and 143 are GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 28th day of November, 2016, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ciuffitelli et al v. Deloitte & Touche LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence P. Ciuffitelli
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Julien
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Julien
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James MacDonald
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan MacDonald
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Nowak
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.F. MacDonald Co.
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ramstein
Represented By: Robert S. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jacob S. Gill
Represented By: Keith A. Ketterling
Represented By: Darlene D. Pasieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte & Touche LLP
Represented By: Gary I. Grenley
Represented By: Gavin M. Masuda
Represented By: Paul H. Trinchero
Represented By: Peter A. Wald
Represented By: Robert C. Weaver, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EisnerAmper LLP
Represented By: Linda T. Coberly
Represented By: William P. Ferranti
Represented By: Catherine W. Joyce
Represented By: Joanna R. Travalini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidley Austin LLP
Represented By: Bruce A. Abbott
Represented By: Brad D. Brian
Represented By: Zachary M. Briers
Represented By: Chad M. Colton
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonkon Torp LLP
Represented By: B. John Casey
Represented By: Adam W. Holbrook
Represented By: Philip S. Van Der Weele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?