Nike USA, Inc. v. Berian Featured Case
Plaintiff: Nike USA, Inc.
Defendant: Boris Berian
Case Number: 3:2016cv00743
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Stacie F. Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2016 Filing 18 Reply in Further Support to Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Related Discovery 13 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Nike USA, Inc.. (Ramfjord, Per)
June 7, 2016 Filing 17 Declaration of John Evans in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Nike's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause. Filed by Boris Berian. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, 6 .) (Ferranti, William)
June 6, 2016 Filing 16 Scheduling Order: Oral Argument on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction 6 and Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Related Discovery 13 is set for 6/7/2016 at 02:00PM in Portland Courtroom 14B before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
June 5, 2016 Filing 15 Declaration of Merhawi Keflezighi in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Nike's Motion to Expedite. Filed by Boris Berian. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 14 .) (Ferranti, William)
June 5, 2016 Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Related Discovery 13 . Filed by Boris Berian. (Ferranti, William)
June 3, 2016 Filing 13 Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Related Discovery. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Nike USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Ramfjord, Per)
June 2, 2016 Filing 12 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Vincent C. Ewing (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: vcewing. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vincent C. Ewing for Boris Berian. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4628538 issued. Signed on 6/2/2016 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
June 2, 2016 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Vincent C. Ewing . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4628538. Filed by Boris Berian. (Ferranti, William)
June 2, 2016 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of William P. Ferranti appearing on behalf of Boris Berian Filed by on behalf of Boris Berian (Ferranti, William)
June 1, 2016 Filing 8 Declaration of Ben Cesar In Support of Motion for TRO. Filed by Nike USA, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 6 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8) (Ramfjord, Per)
June 1, 2016 Filing 7 Declaration of Per A. Ramfjord in Support of Motion for TRO. Filed by Nike USA, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 6 .) (Ramfjord, Per)
June 1, 2016 Filing 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Nike USA, Inc. (Ramfjord, Per). Added Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 6/6/2016. (mr)
June 1, 2016 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service upon Boris Berian served on 5/20/2016 Filed by Nike USA, Inc.. (Ramfjord, Per)
May 2, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Boris Berian. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dsg)
May 2, 2016 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/30/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/29/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 9/29/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
April 29, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Nike USA, Inc.. (Ramfjord, Per)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4588414 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nike USA, Inc. against Nike USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Ramfjord, Per)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nike USA, Inc. v. Berian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Berian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nike USA, Inc.
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?