Rambow v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Melissa Lynn Rambow
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2016cv00796
Filed: May 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Granting the Stipulated Application for Supplement Fees Pursuant to EAJA 36 . $2,000.00 is awarded to Plaintiff. Signed on 3/13/18 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 28 . Plaintiff is awarded $14,874.56 pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act 28 U.S.C. § 2412. In addition, Plaintiff is awarded $9.00 for postage expenses, and $5.00 in photocopying costs pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920. Signed on 3/2/18 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION AND ORDER - The Findings and Recommendation (ECF 21 ) is ADOPTED IN PART, as discussed in this Opinion and Order. The Commissioner's decision that Plaintiff is not disabled is REVERSED AND REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Opinion and Order. Signed on 9/26/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rambow v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Lynn Rambow
Represented By: Nancy J. Meserow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?