United States of America v. Rivercliff Farm, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Multnomah County, New Century Properties LTD, Rivercliff Farm, Inc., Annette C. Talmage and Ronald B. Talmage
Case Number: 3:2016cv01248
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Simon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Opinion and Order - Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (ECF 52 ) is GRANTED. Within two weeks from the date of this Opinion and Order, Plaintiff shall file a proposed judgment resolving all claims asserted in this litigation among all parties. Signed on 8/7/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Opinion and Order - The Court DENIES Proposed Intervenors' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Intervene (ECF 43 ). Signed on 11/10/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Opinion and Order - The Court DENIES the Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs under Rule 24, (ECF 20 ). Signed on 9/2/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order Restricting use of and Access to River Cliff Property. Signed on 8/8/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order Restricting Use of and Access to River Cliff Property. Signed on 7/20/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Temporary Restraining Order Restricting Use of and Access to River Cliff Property. Signed on 7/8/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rivercliff Farm, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multnomah County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Properties LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivercliff Farm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette C. Talmage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald B. Talmage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lindsay L. Clayton
Represented By: Jennifer Y. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?