U.S. Bank National Association v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: John Doe, Terance Edwards, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, LSI Title Company Of Oregon, LLC and West Coast Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01307
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPINION and ORDER - Upon review, I agree with Judge Acosta's recommendation and I ADOPT Findings and Recommendation 117 , except as noted. I GRANT in part and DENY in part Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney Fees 101 and Bill of Costs 103 . Plaintiff is awarded $27,150.20 in attorney fees and $1,367.00 in costs.IT IS SO ORDERED.DATED this 31st day of May, 2019, by Chief United States District Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/31/19.) (peg)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Acostas recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 74 in full. I GRANT in part and DENY in part Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 56 . Signed on 9/26/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Opinion and Order re Findings & Recommendation: Motion for Entry of Default 50 should be denied 63 . Upon review, I agree with Judge Acosta's recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 63 as my own opinion. The Motion 50 is DENIED. Signed on 6/18/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION and ORDER - Upon review, I agree with Judge Acostas recommendations and ADOPT the F&R 27 as my own opinion. Accordingly, I GRANT in part and DENY in part U.S. Banks Motion to Dismiss 4 , and GRANT Attorney Defendants Motion to Dismiss 9 . However, I also give Mr. Edwards leave to amend his first counterclaim to assert additional facts supporting his securitization theory. Mr. Edwardss second counterclaim is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED.DATED this 3rd day of August, 2017, by Chief United States District Judge Michael W. Mosman. (copy mailed to defendant Edwards) (peg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terance Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Title Company Of Oregon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Kimberly Hood Couillard
Represented By: Jaimie A. Fender
Represented By: Craig A. Peterson
Represented By: Brandon J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?